National Labor Relations Board v. Jackson
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-02857
District Judge George Levi Russell, III, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 2, 2019 at 4:47 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo National Labor Relations Board, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by National Labor Relations Board

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Barbara Elizabeth Duvall +1 410 962 2915 +1 410 962 2198 barbara.duvall@nlrb.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Sean Robert Marshall +1 410 962 2785 +1 410 962 2198 sean.marshall@nlrb.gov
v.
No Logo Ashley Jackson, Defendant
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 160(1)
Nature of Suit 720 - Labor: Labor/Management Relations
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 7 National Labor Relations Boards' Motion to Withdraw Application. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 11/21/2016. (krs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/21/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    MOTION to Withdraw by National Labor Relations Board (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Duvall, Barbara) (Entered: 11/17/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      AFFIDAVIT of Service for Order and Subpoena served on Ashley Jackson on 10/31/2016, filed by National Labor Relations Board. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Duvall, Barbara) (Entered: 11/07/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER granting 1 Application for an Order Requiring Compliance with Administrative Subpoena Ad Testificandum. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 10/26/2016. (krs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/26/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          Show Cause Hearing held on 10/25/2016 before Judge George Levi Russell, III. (FTR: N, Mitter) (nrms, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            AFFIDAVIT of Service for show cause order; application; memo; exhibits served on Ashley Jackson on September 20, 2016, filed by National Labor Relations Board. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (proof of delivery))(Duvall, Barbara) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 9/12/2016. (krs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/13/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                APPLICATION for Order Requiring Compliance with Administrative Subpoena Ad Testificandum by National Labor Relations Board. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3, # 5 Exhibit 4, # 6 Memo in Support, # 7 Certificate of Service, # 8 Text of Proposed Order Show Cause, # 9 Certificate of Service, # 10 Text of Proposed Order Compliance, # 11 Certificate of Service, # 12 Civil Cover Sheet)(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/12/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 12 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?