Rodriguez v. Willamette Hay Industries, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 6:16-cv-01625
District Judge Ann L. Aiken, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 2, 2019 at 6:52 PM EST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Fernando Rodriguez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Northwest Workers' Justice Project

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Bonnie E. Allen-Sailer +1 503 525 8454 +1 503 946 3029 bonnie@nwjp.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich +1 503 525 8454 +1 503 946 3029 corinna@nwjp.org
No Logo Willamette Hay Industries, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by eechlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Laurie J. Hart +1 541 754 0303 +1 541 754 1455 laurie@eechlaw.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 2(a)
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
60-DAY ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court having been informed by counsel for the parties that this action has been settled, IT IS ORDERED that, pursuant to LR 41-1, this action is dismissed with prejudice and without costs and with leave, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to have this order of dismissal set aside and the action reinstated if the settlement is not consummated. Pending motions, if any, are denied as moot. All pretrial deadlines and any trial date are stricken. By Clerk of Court Mary L. Moran. (ck) (Entered: 05/19/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER: Granting Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 10 . Discovery is to be completed by 7/13/2017. Dispositive Motions are due by 8/10/2017. Pretrial Order is due by 9/14/2017. Ordered on 4/18/2017 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (rdr) (Entered: 04/18/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Joint ADR Report . Filed by Fernando Rodriguez, Willamette Hay Industries, LLC.(Allen-Sailer, Bonnie) (Entered: 04/14/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Declaration of Bonnie Allen-Sailer in Support of Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines. Filed by Fernando Rodriguez. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 10 .) (Allen-Sailer, Bonnie) (Entered: 04/14/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines . Filed by Fernando Rodriguez, Willamette Hay Industries, LLC. (Allen-Sailer, Bonnie) (Entered: 04/14/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 6 . Discovery is to be completed by 4/14/2017. Dispositive Motions are due by 5/12/2017. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/12/2017. Pretrial Order is due by 6/16/2017. Ordered on 12/16/2016 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (rr) (Entered: 12/16/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement . Filed by Fernando Rodriguez. (Allen-Sailer, Bonnie) (Entered: 12/12/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Declaration of Bonnie Allen-Sailer In Support of Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines. Filed by Fernando Rodriguez. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 6 .) (Allen-Sailer, Bonnie) (Entered: 12/09/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines . Filed by Fernando Rodriguez, Willamette Hay Industries, LLC. (Allen-Sailer, Bonnie) (Entered: 12/09/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by All Defendants. (Hart, Laurie) (Entered: 10/20/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Answer to 1 Complaint, Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, Counterclaim Willamette Hay Industries, LLC. Filed by Willamette Hay Industries, LLC. (Hart, Laurie) (Entered: 10/20/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Summons Issued Electronically as to Willamette Hay Industries, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (ljb) (Entered: 08/16/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Ann L. Aiken and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 12/14/2016. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/13/2017. Pretrial Order is due by 1/13/2017. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (ljb) (Entered: 08/16/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4714615 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Fernando Rodriguez against Willamette Hay Industries, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons). (Allen-Sailer, Bonnie) (Entered: 08/11/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 10 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?