Charles Johnson - Adversary Proceeding
Bankruptcy Case Pennsylvania Western Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 96-02478
District Judge M. Bruce McCullough, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 4, 2019 at 10:33 AM EST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Patricia Johnson Beegle, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lorraine W. Mervan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Lorraine W. Mervan +1 412 343 0970
No Logo Peggy Lynn Ferber, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lorraine W. Mervan

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Lorraine W. Mervan +1 412 343 0970
v.
No Logo Charles Johnson, Defendant
Nature of Suit 424 - (Obj/Revocation Discharge 727
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/27/1997, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Adversary Case (96-2478) Closed. 20yr Record. (96-22320) (cric)
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/12/1996, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Disposition of Adversary (96-2478) Granting [1-3] Complaint NOS 456 Declaratory Judgment Granting [1-2] Complaint NOS 426 Dischargeability 523 Granting [1-1] Complaint NOS 424 Objection To Discharge (727) by Default (csus)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/12/1996, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Judgment For Plaintiff Patricia Johnson Beegle, Plaintiff Peggy Lynn Ferber Against Defendant Charles Johnson signed 12/12/96 granting Complaint to Determine the Dischargeability of Debt. cm: All parties (csus) (Entered: 12/12/1996)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/1/1996, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Summons, Complaint and First Pretrial was Served 10/31/96 on Charles Johnson. (csus) (Entered: 11/01/1996)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/29/1996, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          1 Summons(es) Issued on Charles Johnson Answer due 11/29/96 for Charles Johnson ;Pre-Trial Conference Set For 10:30 12/12/96 at 1603 Federal Bldg., Pittsburgh (ddau) (Entered: 10/29/1996)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/28/1996, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Complaint (96-2478) Patricia Johnson Beegle vs. Charles Johnson . NOS 424 Objection To Discharge (727), NOS 426 Dischargeability 523, NOS 456 Declaratory Judgment . ( Filing Fee $ 120.00 Receipt # 16747) (csus) (Entered: 10/28/1996)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 2 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?