United States v. Eberle
Criminal Case Maryland District Court, Case No. 8:18-cr-00605
District Judge Paula Xinis, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 2, 2019 at 12:20 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Ray Daniel McKenzie +1 301 344 0106 +1 301 344 4516 ray.mckenzie@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Robert Jacob Eberle, Defendant

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MOTION and ORDER Unsealing Indictment as to Robert Jacob Eberle. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 12/14/2018. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    MOTION and ORDER to Seal Case as to Robert Jacob Eberle. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. DiGirolamo on 12/10/2018. (km4s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      INDICTMENT as to Robert Jacob Eberle (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3. (km4s, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 12/17/2018 (kns, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 12/11/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 7 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?