Darwish v. Pompeo
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Western District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-01370
District Judge Lawrence J. Vilardo, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 2, 2019 at 2:06 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mohammed Darwish, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldberg & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Julie Ann Goldberg +1 718 432 1022 +1 718 432 1044 uscis@goldbergimmigration.com
v.
No Logo Andrew Lipkind, Defendant
No Logo Denise C Hochul, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, , , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, , Daniel Barrie Moar +1 716 843 5833 +1 716 551 3196 daniel.moar@usdoj.gov
No Logo James Light, Defendant
No Logo Kirstjen Nielsen, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, , , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, , Daniel Barrie Moar +1 716 843 5833 +1 716 551 3196 daniel.moar@usdoj.gov
No Logo Lee Francis Cissna, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, , , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, , Daniel Barrie Moar +1 716 843 5833 +1 716 551 3196 daniel.moar@usdoj.gov
Pompeo, Michael Richard Pompeo, Michael Richard, Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael Pompeo"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, , , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, , Daniel Barrie Moar +1 716 843 5833 +1 716 551 3196 daniel.moar@usdoj.gov
Rosenstein, Rod J. Rosenstein, Rod J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Rod Rosenstein"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, , , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, , Daniel Barrie Moar +1 716 843 5833 +1 716 551 3196 daniel.moar@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Homeland Security United States Department of Homeland Security, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. Department of Homeland Security"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, , , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, , Daniel Barrie Moar +1 716 843 5833 +1 716 551 3196 daniel.moar@usdoj.gov
United States Department of State United States Department of State, Defendant
Officially listed as "U.S. Department of State"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, , , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, , Daniel Barrie Moar +1 716 843 5833 +1 716 551 3196 daniel.moar@usdoj.gov
United States Citizenship and Immigration Services United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, , , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, , Daniel Barrie Moar +1 716 843 5833 +1 716 551 3196 daniel.moar@usdoj.gov
United States Department of Justice United States Department of Justice, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, , , ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, , Daniel Barrie Moar +1 716 843 5833 +1 716 551 3196 daniel.moar@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1361
Nature of Suit 465 - Immigration: Other Immigration Actions
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
TEXT ORDER granting 20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 14 MOTION to Dismiss. Response due by 12/19/2018. Reply due by 1/4/2019. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 12/17/2018. (CMD) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 14 MOTION to Dismiss by Mohammed Darwish.(Goldberg, Julie) (Entered: 12/14/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      REPLY/RESPONSE to re 13 Order to Show Cause filed by Mohammed Darwish. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Passport Application Denial)(Goldberg, Julie) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kirstjen Nielsen, Michael Pompeo, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State, filed by Mohammed Darwish.(Goldberg, Julie) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Mohammed Darwish. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-N)(Goldberg, Julie) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo: Show Cause Hearing held on 12/7/2018. AUSA Moar advised he does not represent defendants, James Light and Andrew Lipkind, who were added to case by Amended Complaint filed earlier today. Parties to submit additional briefing: Plaintiff's response due by 12/14/2018. Defendant's reply due by 12/21/2018. Court reserved decision. Appearances: For plaintiff: Julie A. Goldberg. For defendants: AUSA Daniel B. Moar. Also present, Fauzia K. Mattingly, Assistant Chief Counsel for Department of Homeland Security. (Court Reporter Ann M. Sawyer.) (CMD) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              TEXT ORDER re 13 Order to Show Cause. At plaintiff's request, the Show Cause Hearing set for 12/6/2018 is ADJOURNED to 12/7/2018 at 12:30 PM in U.S. Courthouse, 2 Niagara Square, Buffalo, New York 14202-3350 before Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 12/5/2018. (CMD) (Entered: 12/05/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Hearing set for 12/6/2018 08:30 AM in US Courthouse, 2 Niagara Square, Buffalo, NY 14202-3350 before Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 12/4/2018. (AMD) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Answer due date updated as to All Defendants. (KLH)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    E-Filing Notification regarding docket entries #4-12: Incorrect event used to electronically file document. For future reference, use Summons Returned Executed as to USA event. Clerk updated answer due date for all defendants. No action required. (KLH)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      MOTION to Dismiss by Lee Francis Cissna, Denise C Hochul, Kirstjen Nielsen, Michael Pompeo, Rod Rosenstein, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Justice. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support)(Moar, Daniel) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mohammed Darwish. Michael Pompeo served on 11/30/2018, answer due 12/21/2018. (Goldberg, Julie) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mohammed Darwish. Lee Francis Cissna served on 11/30/2018, answer due 12/21/2018. (Goldberg, Julie) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mohammed Darwish. Kirstjen Nielsen served on 11/30/2018, answer due 12/21/2018. (Goldberg, Julie) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mohammed Darwish. Rod Rosenstein served on 11/30/2018, answer due 12/21/2018. (Goldberg, Julie) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mohammed Darwish. Denise C Hochul served on 11/30/2018, answer due 12/21/2018. (Goldberg, Julie) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mohammed Darwish. U.S. Department of State served on 11/30/2018, answer due 12/21/2018. (Goldberg, Julie) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mohammed Darwish. U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 11/30/2018, answer due 12/21/2018. (Goldberg, Julie) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mohammed Darwish. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 11/30/2018, answer due 12/21/2018. (Goldberg, Julie) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mohammed Darwish. United States Department of Justice served on 11/30/2018, answer due 12/21/2018. (Goldberg, Julie) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to chambers of on-line civil opening. (KLH)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (KLH)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Summons Issued as to Lee Francis Cissna, Denise C Hochul, Kirstjen Nielsen, Michael Pompeo, Rod Rosenstein, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Department of State, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, United States Department of Justice. (KLH) (Entered: 11/30/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                COMPLAINT against Lee Francis Cissna, Department of Homeland Security, Department of Justice, Department of State, Denise C Hochul, Kirstjen Nielsen, Michael Pompeo, Rod Rosenstein, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services $ 400 receipt number 0209-3291395, filed by Mohammed Darwish. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons for Defendant Pompeo, # 3 Proposed Summons for Defendant Cissna, # 4 Proposed Summons for Defendant Nielsen, # 5 Proposed Summons for Defendant Rosenstein, # 6 Proposed Summons for Defendant Hochul, # 7 Proposed Summons for Defendant DOS, # 8 Proposed Summons for Defendant DHS, # 9 Proposed Summons for Defendant USCIS, # 10 Proposed Summons for Defendant DOJ)(Goldberg, Julie) (Entered: 11/29/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Mohammed Darwish. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-P)(Goldberg, Julie) (Entered: 11/29/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 10 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?