LINDER v. TRUMP'S CASTLE
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:93-cv-00371-JEI

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo GRETA LINDER, Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JEFFREY M. SHEPPARD +1 609 646 2123 +1 609 646 4077 mutchkolaw@comcast.net
Trump's Castle Associates, LP Trump's Castle Associates, LP, Appellee
Officially listed as "TRUMP'S CASTLE ASSOCIATES"

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Schwartz, Tobia, Stanziale, Sedita & Campisano

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JENNIFER STONE +1 973 746 6000
Trump's Castle Associates, LP Trump's Castle Associates, LP, Debtor
Officially listed as "TRUMP'S CASTLE ASSOCIATES"

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space JEFFREY M. SHEPPARD +1 609 646 2123 +1 609 646 4077 mutchkolaw@comcast.net
Office Camden
Filed 1/28/1993
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 422 - Bankruptcy Appeals, Rule 28 U.S.C. ยง 158
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1334 Bankruptcy Appeal
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition District Court Reversed Decision in Whole or Part
County Atlantic
Terminated 6/2/1993
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 6/7/1993, Entered: 6/8/1993 OrderCourt Filing
AMENDED OPINION ( signed by Judge Joseph E. Irenas ) (femp)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 6/2/1993, Entered: 6/2/1993 Terminated Case
    Case closed (femp)
      LREF
      Blank 4 Filed: 5/28/1993, Entered: 6/1/1993 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER that the decision of the bankruptcy court is reversed and the case is remanded for further proceedings. ( signed by Judge Joseph E. Irenas ) (femp)
        LREF
        Blank 3 Filed: 5/28/1993, Entered: 6/1/1993 OrderCourt Filing
        OPINION ( signed by Judge Joseph E. Irenas ) (femp)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 4/19/1993, Entered: 4/19/1993 Motion Hearing
          Motion hearing re: (dv)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 2/19/1993, Entered: 2/19/1993 Remark
            Additional transcripts of the Bankruptcy record regarding bankruptcy appeal submitted. ( 2 sets 394, 395 ) (femp)
              LREF
              Blank 2 Filed: 2/3/1993, Entered: 2/3/1993 Remark
              allocation and scheduling form filed. (femp)
                LREF
                Blank 1 Filed: 1/28/1993, Entered: 2/3/1993 Bankruptcy Appeal
                NOTICE of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court of Order Dated: 12/21/92 by GRETA LINDER (femp)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 1/28/1993, Entered: 2/3/1993 Designation of Record on Appeal
                  DESIGNATED record on appeal received. Hearing on bankruptcy appeal set for 4/2/93 ; (femp)
                    LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 33 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?