City of Fort Lauderdale, Florida v. Purdue Pharma L.P.
Federal Court Proceeding Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 1:18-op-46329
District Judge Dan Aaron Polster, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 15, 2019 at 5:35 PM DT (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1962
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Fort Lauderdale, Florida. Watson Laboratories Inc. waiver sent on 1/3/2019, answer due 3/4/2019 filed on behalf of City of Fort Lauderdale, Florida (Dearman, Mark) (Entered: 01/08/2019)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Fort Lauderdale, Florida. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver sent on 1/3/2019, answer due 3/4/2019 filed on behalf of City of Fort Lauderdale, Florida (Dearman, Mark) (Entered: 01/08/2019)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Fort Lauderdale, Florida. Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. waiver sent on 1/3/2019, answer due 3/4/2019 filed on behalf of City of Fort Lauderdale, Florida (Dearman, Mark) (Entered: 01/08/2019)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Fort Lauderdale, Florida. Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc. waiver sent on 1/3/2019, answer due 3/4/2019 filed on behalf of City of Fort Lauderdale, Florida (Dearman, Mark) (Entered: 01/08/2019)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Fort Lauderdale, Florida. Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc. waiver sent on 1/3/2019, answer due 3/4/2019 filed on behalf of City of Fort Lauderdale, Florida (Dearman, Mark) (Entered: 01/08/2019)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Fort Lauderdale, Florida. Endo Health Solutions Inc. waiver sent on 1/3/2019, answer due 3/4/2019 filed on behalf of City of Fort Lauderdale, Florida (Dearman, Mark) (Entered: 01/08/2019)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Fort Lauderdale, Florida. Cephalon Inc. waiver sent on 1/3/2019, answer due 3/4/2019 filed on behalf of City of Fort Lauderdale, Florida (Dearman, Mark) (Entered: 01/08/2019)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Fort Lauderdale, Florida. Cardinal Health Inc. waiver sent on 1/3/2019, answer due 3/4/2019 filed on behalf of City of Fort Lauderdale, Florida (Dearman, Mark) (Entered: 01/08/2019)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Fort Lauderdale, Florida. Actavis Pharma, Inc. waiver sent on 1/3/2019, answer due 3/4/2019 filed on behalf of City of Fort Lauderdale, Florida (Dearman, Mark) (Entered: 01/08/2019)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Waiver of Service Returned Executed by City of Fort Lauderdale, Florida. Actavis LLC waiver sent on 1/3/2019, answer due 3/4/2019 filed on behalf of City of Fort Lauderdale, Florida (Dearman, Mark) (Entered: 01/08/2019)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Florida Southern. Case number 0:18-cv-62830. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/14/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Civil Case Terminated per DE 7 Conditional Transfer Order. Closing Case. (mc) [Transferred from flsd on 12/14/2018.]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Transfer Case (District)
                            CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-70) transferring case to the Northern District of Ohio re: MDL 2804 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster. (Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel). (mc) [Transferred from flsd on 12/14/2018.] (Entered: 12/14/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 1 Complaint,,,, into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Wal-Mart, Inc. f/k/a Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Gilbert, Robert) [Transferred from flsd on 12/14/2018.] (Entered: 12/05/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                Order Requiring Counsel to Meet, File Joint Scheduling Report and Joint Discovery Report. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 11/21/2018. See attached document for full details. (ar2) [Transferred from flsd on 12/14/2018.] (Entered: 11/26/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (ar2) [Transferred from flsd on 12/14/2018.] (Entered: 11/20/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Parties Not Added. The Filer failed to add all parties associated with the case.Filer is instructed to add the additional parties by filing a Notice of Entry of Parties. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (ar2) [Transferred from flsd on 12/14/2018.] (Entered: 11/20/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas and Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lurana S. Snow is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2) [Transferred from flsd on 12/14/2018.] (Entered: 11/20/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        COMPLAINT against ACTAVIS LLC, ALLERGAN PLC F/K/A ACTAVIS PLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corporation, CVS Orlando, Florida Distribution, L.L.C., CVS Vero, Florida Distribution, L.L.C., Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., H.D. Smith, LLC d/b/a HD Smith f/k/a H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co., Health Mart Systems, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA, INC. N/K/A JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., ORTHO-MCNEIL-JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. N/K/A JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc, Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Specgx LLC, THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Walgreen Co., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11176530, filed by City of Fort Lauderdale, Florida. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gilbert, Robert) [Transferred from flsd on 12/14/2018.] (Entered: 11/20/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 8 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?