Williams v. Big Picture Loans, LLC
Federal Court Proceeding Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:18-mc-00045
District Judge Anthony J Trenga, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 2, 2019 at 8:01 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Dowin Coffy, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of KRISTI C. KELLY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Joseph Guzzo +1 703 424 7576 +1 703 591 0167 aguzzo@kellyandcrandall.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristi Cahoon Kelly +1 703 424 7572 +1 703 591 1067 kkelly@kellyandcrandall.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Casey Shannon Nash +1 703 273 7770 +1 888 892 3512 casey@kellyandcrandall.com
No Logo George Hengle, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of KRISTI C. KELLY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Joseph Guzzo +1 703 424 7576 +1 703 591 0167 aguzzo@kellyandcrandall.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristi Cahoon Kelly +1 703 424 7572 +1 703 591 1067 kkelly@kellyandcrandall.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Casey Shannon Nash +1 703 273 7770 +1 888 892 3512 casey@kellyandcrandall.com
No Logo Gloria Turnage, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of KRISTI C. KELLY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Joseph Guzzo +1 703 424 7576 +1 703 591 0167 aguzzo@kellyandcrandall.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristi Cahoon Kelly +1 703 424 7572 +1 703 591 1067 kkelly@kellyandcrandall.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Casey Shannon Nash +1 703 273 7770 +1 888 892 3512 casey@kellyandcrandall.com
No Logo Lula Williams, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of KRISTI C. KELLY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Joseph Guzzo +1 703 424 7576 +1 703 591 0167 aguzzo@kellyandcrandall.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristi Cahoon Kelly +1 703 424 7572 +1 703 591 1067 kkelly@kellyandcrandall.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Casey Shannon Nash +1 703 273 7770 +1 888 892 3512 casey@kellyandcrandall.com
No Logo Marcella P. Singh, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of KRISTI C. KELLY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Joseph Guzzo +1 703 424 7576 +1 703 591 0167 aguzzo@kellyandcrandall.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kristi Cahoon Kelly +1 703 424 7572 +1 703 591 1067 kkelly@kellyandcrandall.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Casey Shannon Nash +1 703 273 7770 +1 888 892 3512 casey@kellyandcrandall.com
v.
No Logo Ascension Technologies, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Big Picture Loans, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Matt Martorello, Defendant
Citation Civil Miscellaneous Case
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Set Deadlines as to 1 Civil Miscellaneous Case Motion to Strike Objections and Compel Response Issued to Rosette, LLP Motion Hearing set for 1/4/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (clar, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE of Appearance by Casey Shannon Nash on behalf of Dowin Coffy, George Hengle, Marcella P. Singh, Gloria Turnage, Lula Williams (Nash, Casey) (Entered: 12/13/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Joseph Guzzo on behalf of Dowin Coffy, George Hengle, Marcella P. Singh, Gloria Turnage, Lula Williams (Guzzo, Andrew) (Entered: 12/13/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (acha, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Memorandum in Support re 4 MOTION to Seal filed by Dowin Coffy, George Hengle, Marcella P. Singh, Gloria Turnage, Lula Williams. (Kelly, Kristi) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Sealed Legal Document 6 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) re 4 MOTION to Seal . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. 4, # 2 Exhibit Ex. 5, # 3 Exhibit Ex. 6)(Kelly, Kristi) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Dowin Coffy, George Hengle, Marcella P. Singh, Gloria Turnage, Lula Williams (Kelly, Kristi) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                MOTION to Seal by Dowin Coffy, George Hengle, Marcella P. Singh, Gloria Turnage, Lula Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kelly, Kristi) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Notice of Hearing Date set for on January 4, 2019 re 1 Civil Miscellaneous Case, (Kelly, Kristi) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Brief in Support to 1 Civil Miscellaneous Case, (Motion to Strike Objections and Compel Response Issued to Rosette, LLP) filed by Dowin Coffy, George Hengle, Marcella P. Singh, Gloria Turnage, Lula Williams. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Subpoena, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Martorello's Initial Disclosures, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Objection Letter, # 4 Exhibit 4 - Placeholder, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Placeholder, # 6 Exhibit 6 - Placeholder)(Kelly, Kristi) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Civil Miscellaneous Case Williams, et al., v. Rosette, LLP (Motion to Strike Objections and Compel Response Issued to Rosette, LLP) ( Filing fee $ 47, receipt number 0422-6403736.), filed by Lula Williams, Dowin Coffy, George Hengle, Gloria Turnage, Marcella P. Singh. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Kelly, Kristi) (Entered: 12/12/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 5 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?