Arena v. Quissett Partners Nominee Trust
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-11562
Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 18, 2021 at 3:25 PM DT (1.2 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Robert Driscoll, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan, Lovells Law Firm - NY Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin P. O'Brien +1 617 371 1035 +1 617 371 1037 justin.obrien@hoganlovells.com
No Logo Laina C. Driscoll, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan, Lovells Law Firm - NY Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin P. O'Brien +1 617 371 1035 +1 617 371 1037 justin.obrien@hoganlovells.com
No Logo Quissett Partners Nominee Trust, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hogan, Lovells Law Firm - NY Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin P. O'Brien +1 617 371 1035 +1 617 371 1037 justin.obrien@hoganlovells.com
No Logo John A. Arena, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 12/12/2016, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 12/12/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY James Michael Merberg +1 617 723 1990 +1 617 720 5760 JBRB127@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney Michael J. Wilson PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael J. Wilson +1 508 228 1829 mjw@mjwilsonlaw.com
No Logo Thomas Arena, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 12/12/2016, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 12/12/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY James Michael Merberg +1 617 723 1990 +1 617 720 5760 JBRB127@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Attorney Michael J. Wilson PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael J. Wilson +1 508 228 1829 mjw@mjwilsonlaw.com
No Logo Judge Jennifer C. Boal, Mediator
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 140 - Contract - Injunction (Post Award)
  Entries (56) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 5/18/2021, Entered: None Notice - Other
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: None Letter/request - non-motion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 1/4/2021, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address or Firm Name
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 12/4/2020, Entered: None Writ Issued
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 11/16/2020, Entered: None Letter/request - non-motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: None Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 8/9/2019, Entered: None Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Laina C. Driscoll, Robert Driscoll, Quissett Partners Nominee Trust. (O'Brien, Justin) (Entered: 12/31/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    Set/Reset Hearings: Jury Trial set for 3/12/2019 -3/15/19 09:30 AM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 12/19/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                      Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ORDER entered. ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TRIAL. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 12/14/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Laina C. Driscoll, Robert Driscoll, Quissett Partners Nominee Trust. (O'Brien, Justin) (Entered: 11/30/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. The Alternative Dispute Resolution Hearing is set for February 14, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. Counsel and principals are directed to be present and have full settlement authority. Each party must submit a brief (no more than 5 pages) mediation memorandum that includes a discussion of (1) the merits of the case (both strengths and weaknesses); (2) damages or other relief sought by the parties; (3) the status of discovery; and (4) the status of the parties' settlement discussions. The memoranda should be submitted BY HAND, E-MAIL to (steve_york@mad.uscourts.gov), OR MAIL WITH THE COURT no later than five (5) business days prior to the mediation and marked "Confidential - Not for Docketing." In the event that any party believes that the case is not ripe for mediation, or the date poses a serious conflict, counsel are to notify opposing counsel and call the deputy clerk at 617-748-9238 as soon as possible. Prior to the mediation, there will be a Telephone Conference set for February 11, 2019 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 14 before Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. The clerk will provide the call in information to all parties by email, one day prior to the upcoming telephone conference. (York, Steve) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            Notice of assignment to ADR Provider. Judge Jennifer C. Boal appointed.(Garvin, Brendan) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution: Late January / early February 2019. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Trial set for 3/11/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: Telephone Conference held on 10/31/2018. The parties indicate that the Pennsylvania appeal has just been argued and a decision is set to be issued at the end of December 2018. The court sets a trial date for March 11, 2019 at 9:30 AM. At this point the court is not sure if it will be a bench or jury trial. The court asks about Mediation but the defendant indicates the Pennsylvania case is important to the settlement discussion. The court asks that the parties file a brief status report every 30 days going forward. (Court Reporter: Digital Recording.) To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov.(Attorneys present: Wilson, O'Brien) (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. Telephone Status Conference set for 10/31/2018 at 12:45 PM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. The parties should call into 888-278-0296 (Access Code: 6533617) at least 5 minutes before the hearing. The parties should be prepared to report on the status of the Pennsylvania case and outstanding discovery. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 5/2/2018. The parties indicate that all discovery is complete but for 3 depositions. These depositions are best done after Penn. State Case has a ruling. This Penn. State Case provide clarity to the parties on this matter and is expected in September / October 2018- though the case could go forward without it. At this time the parties do not believe mediation would be helpful until the outcome of the Pennsylvania appeal. If tried, it would be two half days. The court suggests a trial date of November, 12th. Court expects to have a follow up status conference in the fall. Plaintiff states will be a jury trial but def't believes it will be a bench trial. (Court Reporter: Digital Recording.) To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov.(Attorneys present: Wilson (by phone); O'Brien) (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 05/17/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Rescheduling Hearing (TIME ONLY):Pretrial Conference reset for 5/2/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 16 before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. Att. Wilson may participate by telephone and should call into 888-278-0296; Access Code: 6533617 at least 5 minutes before the hearing. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 04/30/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re Initial Pretrial Conference. As neither party filed a dispositive motion by the deadline of March 23, 2018, or sought to extend or modify the schedule, the court presumes both that discovery is complete and that no such motions will be filed. Accordingly, the court sets an Initial Pretrial Conference for 5/2/2018 at 10:45 AM. The parties should be prepared to discuss their availability for trial in 2018. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ORDER entered. Memorandum of Lis Pendens (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 20 Motion for Lis Pendens. Upon further review of the Motion for Lis Pendens, as well as the cases cited by the defendants in their opposition, the Court finds that a lis pendens, is appropriate in this case because the plaintiffs assert a claim of right to title in the disputed property. Such a claim satisfies the standard for a lis pendens under M.G.L. c. 184, ยง 15, which simply requires that the underlying suit affect the title to real property, and eschews a consideration of the underlying case on the merits. See e.g., RFF Family Partnership, LP v. Link Development, LLC, 849 F. Supp. 2d 131, 137 (D. Mass. 2012). The two, principal cases cited by the defendants are distinguishable on the facts. In one, the court found that a lis pendens was not appropriate because the plaintiff was merely seeking the return of her security deposit. In the second, the plaintiff did assert a claim of title but that claim was meritless ab initio because the claim was based on a purchase option that had already lapsed. Finally, the court finds no basis to deem a lis pendens inappropriate even assuming, as the defendants argue, that the plaintiffs primary goal is to ensure that the proceeds of any sale of the property would be available for an accounting. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                AMENDED VERIFIED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by John A. Arena, Thomas Arena. Leave of Court granted on 6/29/17.(Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Plaintiffs Motion to Amend the Complaint 31 is GRANTED. The now verified complaint will be treated as the original complaint filed on 7/28/2016. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    MOTION to Amend 1 Complaint by Thomas Arena.(Wilson, Michael) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying 20 Motion for Lis Pendens subject to the plaintiff seeking leave of court to file an amended verified complaint. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered finding as moot 23 Motion to Expedite; finding as moot 26 Motion for Leave to File Document. Though with regard to #26 the court did consider the proposed documents attached. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: Motion Hearing held on 6/26/2017 re 26 MOTION for Leave to File Proposed Reply Regarding Motion to Reschedule Hearing filed by Robert Driscoll, Quissett Partners Nominee Trust, Laina C. Driscoll, 23 MOTION to Expedite and Reschedule Hearing on Motion for Lis Pendens filed by Robert Driscoll, Quissett Partners Nominee Trust, Laina C. Driscoll, 20 MOTION for Lis Pendens filed by Thomas Arena. The court finds motions 23 and 26 moot and denies motion 20 subject to plaintiff seeking leave of court to file an amended verified complaint. (Court Reporter: Digital Recording.) To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov.(Attorneys present: Wilson (by phone) and O"Brien) (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing.Hearing set for 6/26/2017 11:00 AM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. Among other things, the parties should be prepared to discuss why it would not be reasonable under the circumstances to agree that any sale proceeds be held in escrow pending resolution of the lawsuit. Counsel may appear by telephone if they wish. If any party would like to participate by phone they should inform the clerk at Noreen_Russo@mad.uscourts.gov and then call into 888-278-0296; Access Code: 6533617 at least 5 minutes before the hearing. (DLC, law3) (Entered: 06/22/2017)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              MOTION for Leave to File Proposed Reply Regarding Motion to Reschedule Hearing by Laina C. Driscoll, Robert Driscoll, Quissett Partners Nominee Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Reply, # 2 Proposed Reply Exhibit A, # 3 Proposed Reply Exhibit B)(O'Brien, Justin) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                REPLY to Response to 23 MOTION to Expedite and Reschedule Hearing on Motion for Lis Pendens filed by John A. Arena, Thomas Arena. (Wilson, Michael) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. re 23 MOTION to Expedite and Reschedule Hearing on Motion for Lis Pendens filed by Robert Driscoll, Quissett Partners Nominee Trust, Laina C. Driscoll. Plaintiffs are ordered to respond to Defendants' motion by the close of business on Thursday, June 22, 2017.(Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    MOTION to Expedite and Reschedule Hearing on Motion for Lis Pendens by Laina C. Driscoll, Robert Driscoll, Quissett Partners Nominee Trust.(O'Brien, Justin) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      ELECTRONIC NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion 20 MOTION for Lis Pendens : Motion Hearing set for 7/7/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. The court would prefer counsel appear in person.(Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Opposition re 20 MOTION for Lis Pendens filed by Laina C. Driscoll, Robert Driscoll, Quissett Partners Nominee Trust. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(O'Brien, Justin) (Entered: 06/16/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          MOTION for Lis Pendens by Thomas Arena.(Wilson, Michael) (Entered: 06/14/2017)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            16-cv-11562-DLC ANSWER to Counterclaim by John A. Arena, Thomas Arena.(Wilson, Michael) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by John A. Arena.. (Wilson, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/21/2017: # 1 Supplement Signatures) (Russo, Noreen). (Entered: 04/06/2017)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ORDER entered. SCHEDULING and INSTRUCTION ORDER. Please see the attached order for full details and session requirements. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 04/04/2017)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                  Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: Scheduling Conference held on 3/30/2017. The court will adopt the scheduling deadlines proposed by the parties and sets, with agreement of the parties, 4.28.17 as a deadline for a response to def'ts counterclaims. The parties to confer about consent and let the clerk know. The court explains its policy concerning discovery motions which will be contained in the scheduling and instruction order and informs the parties that if they would like to participate in Mediation with the court they can simply e-mail the clerk to get the process started. (Court Reporter: No Court Reporter Used.)(Attorneys present: Wilson (by phone) and O"Brien) (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 03/30/2017)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (Wilson, Michael) (Entered: 03/29/2017)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 . (O'Brien, Justin) (Entered: 03/29/2017)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        JOINT STATEMENT re scheduling conference . (O'Brien, Justin) (Entered: 03/23/2017)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          NOTICE of Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference set for 3/30/2017 02:30 PM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. The parties may participate by telephone. Counsel wishing to appear telephonically should inform the clerk at Noreen_Russo@mad.uscourts.gov and call 888-278-0296; Access Code: 6533617 at least 5 minutes before the hearing. See the attached notice for full details. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 02/28/2017)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            ANSWER to 1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Robert Driscoll, Quissett Partners Nominee Trust, Laina C. Driscoll.(O'Brien, Justin) (Entered: 02/24/2017)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The complaint in this case was filed on July 28, 2016. As of this date, there has been no return to the Court of proof of service of the summons and complaint on defendants as required by Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 4.1(b) of the Local Rules of this Court. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) and Local Rule 4.1(b), proof of service on defendants or good cause why service has not been made shall be filed by cob March 17, 2017. If nothing is filed in response to this order the court will recommend that the case be dismissed without prejudice. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell added. Judge Mark L. Wolf no longer assigned to case. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 02/23/2017)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  Judge Mark L. Wolf: ORDER entered. MEMORANDUM AND ORDER(Hohler, Daniel) (Main Document 8 replaced on 12/12/2016) (Hohler, Daniel). (Entered: 12/12/2016)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    Judge Mark L. Wolf: ENDORSED ORDER entered granting 5 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney James Michael Merberg terminated "ALLOWED."(Hohler, Daniel) (Entered: 12/12/2016)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Wilson on behalf of John A. Arena, Thomas Arena (Wilson, Michael) (Entered: 08/23/2016)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by John A. Arena, Thomas Arena.(Merberg, James) (Entered: 08/19/2016)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          Civil Cover Sheet & Category Sheet re 1 Complaint by John A. Arena, Thomas Arena. (Merberg, James) (Entered: 08/01/2016)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/01/2016)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark L. Wolf assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/01/2016)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-6224857 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by John A. Arena, Thomas Arena. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Merberg, James) (Entered: 07/28/2016)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 8 times.

                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?