Ernest Francis v. Andrew Lerner
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 17-2206

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 4, 2019 at 12:58 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3450 - Interstate Commerce
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Receipt of paper copy of RESPONSE BRIEF filed at [38] by Andrew Scott Lerner and Gregory B. Walz, Esq. Number of pages: [53]. Sufficient: YES. Number of Copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 06/01/2018. [1000307092] [17-2206] TW [Entered: 06/05/2018 12:14 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    BRIEF by Appellees Andrew Scott Lerner and Gregory B. Walz, Esq. in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: RESPONSE. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 06/01/2018. [1000305705] [17-2206] John Altmiller [Entered: 06/01/2018 04:24 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      ORDER filed [1000296115] granting Motion to extend filing time [36] Number of days granted: 14. Response brief due 06/01/2018 Copies to all parties. [17-2206] JR [Entered: 05/17/2018 10:23 AM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        MOTION by Appellees Andrew Scott Lerner and Gregory B. Walz, Esq. to extend filing time for opening/response brief until June 1, 2018.. Date and method of service: 05/17/2018 ecf. [1000296063] [17-2206] John Altmiller [Entered: 05/17/2018 09:48 AM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Receipt of paper copy of APPENDIX filed at [33] by Ernest P. Francis. Total number of volumes (including any sealed): [1]. Total number of pages in all volumes: [628]. Total number of sealed volumes: 0. Sufficient? Yes. CD/DVD/Other exhibit? No. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 05/15/2018. [1000295351] [17-2206] JR [Entered: 05/16/2018 09:52 AM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Receipt of paper copy of OPENING BRIEF filed at [32] by Ernest P. Francis. Number of pages: [64]. Sufficient: Yes. Number of copies: [1]. Received by clerk date: 05/15/2018. [1000295337] [17-2206] JR [Entered: 05/16/2018 09:42 AM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Corrected FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellant Ernest P. Francis. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 05/10/2018. [1000292481] [17-2206] Ernest Francis [Entered: 05/10/2018 10:21 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Corrected BRIEF by Appellant Ernest P. Francis in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 05/10/2018. [1000292480] [17-2206] Ernest Francis [Entered: 05/10/2018 10:19 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  ORDER filed [1000291294] granting Motion to extend filing time for filing paper brief and appendix [28] Number of days granted: 1.; granting Motion for to amend caption [27] (miscInputText(SKIP)). Copies to all parties. [17-2206] JR [Entered: 05/09/2018 12:12 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    ORDER filed [1000281221] granting Motion for leave to file [29], updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Response brief due 05/18/2018 Copies to all parties. [17-2206] JR [Entered: 04/24/2018 08:44 AM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellees Andrew Scott Lerner and Gregory B. Walz, Esq.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [1000187560] [17-2206] John Altmiller
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by John C. Altmiller for Andrew Scott Lerner and Gregory B. Walz, Esq..[1000187399] [17-2206] John Altmiller
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] Case Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 1:15-cv-00889-GBL-MSN. Mailed to: Joshua Morehouse. [17-2206] (TW)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            DISTRICT COURT UPDATE. TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Ernest P. Francis before Judge Lee, re [142] Notice of Appeal Transcript due by 11/27/2017. [17-2206] (AD)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 10/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              DISTRICT COURT UPDATE. TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Ernest P. Francis before Judge Nachmanoff, re [142] Notice of Appeal Transcript due by 11/27/2017. [17-2206] (AD)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                STATUS OF COUNSEL FORM by Appellant Ernest P. Francis. [17-2206] Ernest Francis
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  NOTICE ISSUED to Ernest P. Francis re: status of counsel. Mailed to: Joshua Arthur Morehouse. Status of Counsel due 10/27/2017. [17-2206] (JR)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:15-cv-00889-GBL-MSN. Case manager: JRice. [17-2206] (JR)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 13 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?