In Re: Marketwatch.com IPO v. Marketwatch.com Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-03225
District Judge Shira A. Scheindlin, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 5, 2019 at 11:06 PM EST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo B. W. Magid, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Bettie J. Anderson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Peter Edward Seidman +1 212 613 5625 +1 212 868 1229 pseidman@milberg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew L. Barroway +1 610 667 7056 + 610 667 7056
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Marc A Topaz +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056
No Logo Laurence Bonilla, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lovell Stewart Halebian Jacobson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Christopher Lovell +1 212 608 1900 +1 212 719 4677 clovell@lshllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sirota & Sirota, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Saul Roffe +1 609 791 7007 +1 609 896 9060 saul@sirotalaw.com
No Logo Major W. Sherwin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Nicholas J. Anderson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Peter Edward Seidman +1 212 613 5625 +1 212 868 1229 pseidman@milberg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew L. Barroway +1 610 667 7056 + 610 667 7056
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Marc A Topaz +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056
v.
No Logo Alan J. Hirschfield, Defendant
No Logo Allan R. Tessler, Defendant
No Logo Andrew Heyward, Defendant
No Logo Bancboston Robertson Stephens Inc., Defendant
Citigroup Global Markets, Inc. Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Defendant
Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation, Defendant
No Logo James A. DePalma, Defendant
No Logo Larry S. Kramer, Defendant
No Logo Mark F. Imperiale, Defendant
No Logo Marketwatch.com, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Ronit Setton +1 212 504 6000 +1 212 504 6591 ronit.setton@cwt.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stratton Bone Campaign

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Brooke Bass +1 212 504 6000
Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc. Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Incorporated"
Officer/Director, Cumulus Media Inc.
Officer/Director, Chart Industries, Inc.
Officer/Director, Lodgian, Inc.
Officer/Director, Mlgpe Ltd
Merrill Lynch GP Inc. Officer/Director, Merrill Lynch GP Inc.
Officer/Director, Merrill Lynch & Co Inc
Officer/Director, Merrill Lynch Group, Inc
Hertz Global Holdings Inc Officer/Director, Hertz Global Holdings Inc
Merrill Lynch International Officer/Director, Merrill Lynch International
Officer/Director, Merrill Lynch Trust Co Fsb
Officer/Director, Infospace.com, Inc.
Officer/Director, Fund Asset Management Lp
Officer/Director, New BlackRock, Inc.
Officer/Director, Princeton Administrators Lp
Officer/Director, NATIONSBANK CORP
Bank of America, NA Officer/Director, Bank of America, NA
Officer/Director, Blue Ridge Investments, LLC
Officer/Director, Gabelli Utility Fund
Officer/Director, Pimco High Income Fund
Officer/Director, Koll Real Estate Group Inc
Officer/Director, Uslife Income Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Muniholdings Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Munienhanced Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Muniyield Quality Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Munivest Fund II Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Mark Holland +1 212 813 8800 +1 212 355 3333 mholland@goodwinlaw.com
No Logo Michael H. Jordan, Defendant
No Logo Morgan Stanley Dean Witter & Co., Incorporated, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Day Pitney, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Howard Fetner +1 203 752 5012 +1 203 752 5001 hfetner@daypitney.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Latham & Watkins LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew Brian Clubok +1 202 637 2200 +1 202 637 2201 andrew.clubok@lw.com
No Logo Robertson Stephens, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Brendan Joseph Dowd +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 bdowd@omm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew Jay Frackman +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 afrackman@omm.com
The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc. The Goldman Sachs Group, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sullivan & Cromwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Gandolfo V. Diblasi +1 212 558 4992 +5583 558 558 3588 diblasig@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY John Louis Hardiman +1 212 558 4070 +1 212 558 3588 hardimanj@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY David Maxwell James Rein +1 212 558 3035 +1 212 558 3588 reind@sullcrom.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Penny Shane +1 212 558 4000 +1 212 558 3588 shanep@sullcrom.com
No Logo Bear Stearns & Co Inc, Consolidated Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY RANDY MICHAEL MASTRO +1 212 351 4000 +1 212 351 5219 rmastro@gibsondunn.com
No Logo Lawrence Kramer, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Peter J. Bardwick, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Denis Fazioli, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Gregory Mark Nespole +1 212 545 4657 +1 212 545 4693 nespole@whafh.com
No Logo Gary Kogan, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Marc S. Henzel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Marc S. Henzel +1 215 625 9999

Toggle Switch Represented by The World Trade Center-Baltimore

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Charles J. Piven +1 410 332 0030 +6851 685 685 1300

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Thomas Hamilton Burt +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653 burt@whafh.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Frederick Taylor Isquith, Sr +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653 isquith@whafh.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Gregory Mark Nespole +1 212 545 4657 +1 212 545 4693 nespole@whafh.com
No Logo Heidi Hertz, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Menachem E. Lifshitz +1 212 779 1414 lifshitz@bernlieb.com
No Logo Jeff Eltinge, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Marc S. Henzel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Marc S. Henzel +1 215 625 9999

Toggle Switch Represented by The World Trade Center-Baltimore

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Charles J. Piven +1 410 332 0030 +6851 685 685 1300

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Thomas Hamilton Burt +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653 burt@whafh.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Frederick Taylor Isquith, Sr +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653 isquith@whafh.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Gregory Mark Nespole +1 212 545 4657 +1 212 545 4693 nespole@whafh.com
No Logo John Minch, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Peter Edward Seidman +1 212 613 5625 +1 212 868 1229 pseidman@milberg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew L. Barroway +1 610 667 7056 + 610 667 7056
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Marc A Topaz +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056
No Logo Murray L. Waldron, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Peter Edward Seidman +1 212 613 5625 +1 212 868 1229 pseidman@milberg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew L. Barroway +1 610 667 7056 + 610 667 7056
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Marc A Topaz +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056
No Logo Phillip Walsky, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Peter Edward Seidman +1 212 613 5625 +1 212 868 1229 pseidman@milberg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SEEGER WEISS LP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY David R. Buchanan +1 212 584 0700 +1 212 584 0799 DBuchanan@SeegerWeiss.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen A. Weiss +1 212 584 0700 +1 212 584 0799 sweiss@seegerweiss.com
No Logo William Denson, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Frederick Taylor Isquith, Sr +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653 isquith@whafh.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Gregory Mark Nespole +1 212 545 4657 +1 212 545 4693 nespole@whafh.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 77
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (71) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/22/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT settling action as to 01 Civ. 3225. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/24/09) (Attachments: # 1 notice of right to appeal)(ml) (Entered: 12/23/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL; The following related actions are dismissed without prejudice as to the individual defendants listed on Schedule 1, and dismissed pursuant to the Opinion and Order dated 2/19/03, as the individual defendants listed on Schedule 2. The dismissal of the related actions is without costs to the individual defendants listed on Schedules 1 and 2. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 1/22/09) This Document Relates to: 01cv2359, 01cv3225, 01cv3360, 01cv3910, 01cv5143, 01cv5644, 01cv5838, 01cv6000, 01cv6008, 01cv6120, 01cv6271, 01cv6277, 01cv6322, 01cv6747, 01cv6846, 01cv6870, 01cv7002, 01cv7046, 01cv7247, 01cv7344, 01cv9618, 01cv9651, 01cv9797, 01cv9799, 01cv9800, 01cv10040, 01cv10051, 01cv10075, 01cv10092, 01cv10108, 01cv10140, 01cv10161, 01cv10738, 01cv10753, 01cv10838, 01cv10867, 01cv10884, 01cv11230, 01cv11234.(sac) (sac) (Entered: 01/27/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      STIPULATION AND ORDER that the Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement with defendant Issuers and Individuals submitted to the Court on 6/10/4, is hereby terminated purs to Paragraph 39 of the Proposed Partial Settlement. However, purs to paragraph 40 of the Proposed Partial Settlement, that paragraph, and the paragraphs referred to therein, shall survive the termination of the Proposed Partial Settlement. This Stipulation resolves (5527) Motion to Approve of Class action settlement. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this motion. This document relates to: All cases listed on Schedule I. (orig fld in 21mc92, #5620). (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/25/07) (cd)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/20/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE of Change of Address by Ronit Setton on behalf of Marketwatch.com, Inc.. New Address: Cadwaldader, Wickersham & Taft LLP, One World Financial Center, New York, NY, 10281, (212) 504-6000. (sac, ) (Entered: 02/01/2005)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ANSWER to Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Citigroup Global Markets, Inc.. Related document: 40 Amended Complaint filed by Nicholas J. Anderson, Bettie J. Anderson, Major W. Sherwin, B. W. Magid.(sac, ) (Entered: 03/26/2004)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ANSWER to Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation.(sac, ) (Entered: 03/26/2004)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ANSWER to Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. Related document: 40 Amended Complaint filed by Nicholas J. Anderson, Bettie J. Anderson, Major W. Sherwin, B. W. Magid.(sac, ) (Entered: 03/26/2004)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/29/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              ANSWER by Morgan Stanley Dean to [40-1] amended complaint . (Attorney Andrew B. Clubok from the Firm: Kirkland and Ellis, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 11/10/2003)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ANSWER by Goldman Sachs Group to [40-1] amended complaint . (Attorney Penny Shane from the Firm: Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 09/18/2003)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  ANSWER by Merrill Lynch to [40-1] amended complaint . (Attorney Mark Holland from the Firm: Clifford Chance US, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 09/16/2003)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    ANSWER by Goldman Sachs Group to [40-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Penny Shane from the Firm: Sullivan & Cromwell, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 08/21/2003)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      ANSWER by Robertson Stephens to [40-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Brendan Joseph Dowd from the O'Melveny & Myers, LLP)... rec'd in the night deposit box on 7/21/03 at 7:28 p.m. (sac) (Entered: 08/19/2003)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        ANSWER by Bear, Stearns & Co. to [40-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Randy M. Mastro from the Firm: Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 08/06/2003)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/7/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          NOTICE of Change of Address by Occam Networks, Agency.com, Airspan Networks, Autobytel.com, Autoweb.com, Avantgo, BSquare Corp., Caldera Systems, CBS Marketwatch, Digitas, Inc., drugstore.com, Equinix, GT Group Telecom, Hoover's Inc., iBeam Broadcasting, SBI and Co., Metasolv Software, Multex, Net2000, United Online, Onvia.com, PlanetRx.com, Portal Software, Radware, Axeda Systems, Register.com, Silicon Laboratories, Sycamore Networks, theglobe.com, Tickets.com; Verado Holdings (FirstWorld Communications), Viador, Inc., Vignette Corp., and Z-Tel Technologies; Firm Name: Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft. (sac) (Entered: 03/28/2003)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/15/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            NOTICE of REGISTRATION AND FIRM NAME CHANGE by Goldman Sachs Group. Re: Sullivan & Cromwell LLP. (jw) (Entered: 03/06/2003)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              (UNSIGNED) STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL; this action purs. to Stipulation and Order entered in 21 mc 92, doc. #5059, hereby dismisses without prejudice and without costs as to defts Peter Bardwick. (Orig. filed and signed by Judge Scheindlin in 21 mc 92.) (sac)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                (UNSIGNED) STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL; this action purs. to Stipulation and Order entered in 21 mc 92, doc. #5059, hereby dismisses without prejudice and without costs as to defts Michael H. Jordan and James A. DePalma. (Orig. filed and signed by Judge Scheindlin in 21 mc 92.) (sac)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  (UNSIGNED) STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL; this action purs. to Stipulation and Order entered in 21 mc 92, doc. #5059, hereby dismisses without prejudice and without costs as to defts Lawrence Kramer, Andrew Heyward, Alan J. Hirschfield, Allen R. Tessler and Mark F. Imperiale. (Orig. filed and signed by Judge Scheindlin in 21 mc 92.) (sac) (Entered: 03/10/2003)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/30/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Marketwatch.com Inc. by Tahar Vinson, managing agent, on 4/29/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/25/2002)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Goldman Sachs Group by Patricia A. McGraw, managing agent, on 4/26/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Morgan Stanley Dean by Kevin McCarthy, managing agent, on 4/25/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Credit Suisse Corp. by Tracy Del Duca, managing agent, on 4/25/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Merrill Lynch by Sueanne Codman on 4/26/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Salomon Smith Barney by Andres Arroyo, managing agent, on 4/29/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                MASTER ALLEGATIONS by Nicholas J. Anderson, Bettie J. Anderson, Murray L. Waldron, Major W. Sherwin, B. W. Magid RE: Amended Complaint, doc. # 40, Filed on April 19, 2002. (ac)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT by Nicholas J. Anderson, Bettie J. Anderson, Major W. Sherwin, B. W. Magid amending [1-1] complaint ; Summons issued. (ac) (Entered: 06/11/2002)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    OMNIBUS ORDER, Nicholas and Bettie Anderson are hereby appointed as lead pltffs and their selection of the Executve Committee to serve as Lead Counsel is approved. All other motions to be appointed lead pltff and for approval of lead counsel are hereby denied. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (orig. doc. filed in 21 mc 92, doc. #4319) (sac)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/9/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      AMENDED RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Goldman Sachs Group. (sac) (Entered: 02/12/2002)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Robertson Stephens. (sac) (Entered: 02/06/2002)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Goldman Sachs Group . (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/12/2001)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Morgan Stanley Dean . (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/12/2001)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/20/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Credit Suisse Corp. (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/12/2001)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Goldman Sachs Group . (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/12/2001)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Morgan Stanley Dean . (ICMSUSER) Modified on 10/12/2001 (Entered: 10/12/2001)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Merrill Lynch . (ICMSUSER) Modified on 10/12/2001 (Entered: 10/12/2001)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Marketwatch.com Inc. (ICMSUSER) Modified on 10/12/2001 (Entered: 10/12/2001)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Salomon Smith Barney . (ICMSUSER) Modified on 10/12/2001 (Entered: 10/12/2001)
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/6/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Consolidated Lead Case. (dcap)
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/6/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER,... that all cases involving Marketwatch in this IPO Securities Litigation, as set forth in the attached Rider (1:01-cv-03397, 1:01-cv-03546, 1:01-cv-03829 and 1:01-cv-04265), shall be consolidated into case number 01 Civ. 3225. The Clerk of Court is hereby ordered to consolidate any future cases that are designated as related to 01 Civ. 3225,... the Clerk of Court is further ordered to close all cases that have been consolidated, subject to re-opening at a later date on proper application by a party ... ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. [Original filed in 1:01-cv-03225 Document No. 29. Document Docketed in 1:01-cv-03397; 1:01-cv-03546; 1:01-cv-03829; 1:01-cv-04265] (dcap) Modified on 11/07/2001 (Entered: 10/12/2001)
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/6/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Credit Suisse Corp. (ICMSUSER) Modified on 10/25/2001 (Entered: 10/12/2001)
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Pretrial Conference set at 4:30 9/7/01 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (dcap)
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                  Notice of Case Reassignment to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Copy of notice mailed to Attorney(s) of record. Pursuant to the Order of Chief Judge Mukasey dated August 8, 2001, the above entitled action is reassigned to the calendar of Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for inclusion in the coordinated pretrial proceedings being conducted by that judge. Two originals of all future documents submitted in this action are to be presented in the Clerk's Office for filing. One original is to be filed in this docket number and one original is to be filed in the miscellaneous case number 21mc92 (SAS). Each shall bear the original assigned judge's ( ) initials after the original docket number. Attached is a copy of Judge Mukasey's ORDER re: coordinating the proceedings before Judge Scheindlin. Also attached is a copy of Judge Scheindlin's ORDER re: set initial PTC 09/07/01 and directing all counsel to comply with judge Scheindlin's requirements. [Original Orders docketed in 21mc92 (SAS) as documents numbers 1 and 2] (dcap) Modified on 02/26/2002 (Entered: 08/10/2001)
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/13/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Memo endorsed on motion; granting [25-1] motion for Steven G. Bradbury, Andrew B.Clubok, Brant W. Bishop and Elizabeth L. Deeley to appear pro hac vice. Motion granted, No opposition. ( signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton ); Copies mailed. Document sent to Attorney Admissions Clerk. (tp)
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      REPLY MEMORANDUM in further support re: motion of the Anderson Group for appointment as lead plntf et al (cd) (Entered: 07/13/2001)
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Christopher J. Gray by Laurence Bonilla in support of [16-1] motion for an Order to consolidate actions 01cv3225 (LLS), 01cv3397 (AKH), 01cv3546 (VM), 01cv3829 and 01cv4265 into one action for all purposes, [16-2] motion an Order to appoint class member Laurence Bonilla to serve as lead plaintiff, [16-3] motion for an Order to direct lead counsel for the class be determined by sealed bid auction; filed in the night deposit on 7/10/01 at 11:46 (pl) Modified on 10/25/2001 (Entered: 07/11/2001)
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Laurence Bonilla in support of [16-1] motion for an Order to consolidate actions 01cv3225 (LLS), 01cv3397 (AKH), 01cv3546 (VM), 01cv3829 and 01cv4265 into one action for all purposes, [16-2] motion for an Order to appoint class member Laurence Bonilla to serve as lead plaintiff, [16-3] motion for an Order to direct that lead counsel for the class be determined by sealed bid auction . (pl) Modified on 10/25/2001 (Entered: 07/11/2001)
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER; in view of the substantial number of cases filed in this Court raising issues similar to those in this action, and the present uncertainty about how the cases should be administered, the [3-1] Order for conference pursuant to Rule 16(b) dated 5/9/01 is vacated until further Order . ( signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton ); Copies mailed. (kkc) Modified on 10/25/2001 (Entered: 07/10/2001)
                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/5/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              MEMORANDUM IN FURTHER SUPPORT of the motion of the Anderson Group for consolidation, appointment as lead pltff and approval of selection of lead counsel; and in opposition to [16-1] motion for an Order to consolidate actions 01cv3225 (LLS), 01cv3397 (AKH), 01cv3546 (VM), 01cv3829 and 01cv4265 into one action for all purposes, [16-2] motion for an Order to appoint class member Laurence Bonilla to serve as lead plaintiff, [16-3] motion for an Order to direct that lead counsel for the class be determined by sealed bid auction, [9-1] motion for an order purs. to FRCP 42(a) consolidating the following actions 01 cv 3225; 01 cv 3397; 01 cv 3546; cv 3829; and 01 cv 4265, [9-2] motion appointing Nicholas Anderson and Bettie J. Anderson, Murray L. Waldron and John Minch as Lead Plaintiff for the Class purs. to Section 27 the Securities Act of 1933 and Section 21D of the Exchange Act of 1934, [9-3] motion approving their of the law firms of Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach and Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP to serve as Lead Counsel, [12-1] motion for an order appointing the Kogan lead plaintiff group to serve as lead plaintiff pro tempore, [12-2] motion for an order approving the lead plaintiff's selection of Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP as lead counsel, [12-3] motion for an order consolidating all related actions such as 01 civ. 3225, 01 civ. 3397, 01 civ. 3546, 01 civ. 3829 and 01 civ. 4265. (Rec'd in night box 7/5/01 9:26 PM) (sn) Modified on 10/25/2001 (Entered: 07/09/2001)
                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/2/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT of Christopher Gray by Laurence Bonilla in opposition to the motions of the Anderson Group and the Kogan Lead Pltff Group for Appointment as Lead Pltff and Designation of Their Attys as Lead Counsel. Received in night deposit on 7/2/01 at 11:26 p.m. (jp) Modified on 10/25/2001 (Entered: 07/06/2001)
                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/2/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Laurence Bonilla in opposition to the motions of The Anderson Group and the Kogan Lead Pltff Group for Appointment as Lead Pltff and Designation of their Attys as Lead Counsel. Received in night deposit on 7/2/01 at 11:26 p.m.. (jp) Modified on 10/25/2001 (Entered: 07/06/2001)
                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/29/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION (filed on service date) by Morgan Stanley Dean for S teven G. Bradbury, Andrew B.Clubok, Brant W. Bishop and Elizabeth L. Deeley to appear pro hac vice ; Return date not indicated. Attached is affidavit in support of Howard Fetner, Steven G. Bradbury, Andrew W. Clubok Brant W. Bishop and Elizabeth L. Deeley. (djc) Modified on 10/25/2001 (Entered: 07/11/2001)
                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/20/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint as to Michael H. Jordan by U.S. Postal Service on 6/9/01. Answer due on 6/29/01 for Michael H. Jordan. (tp) Modified on 10/25/2001 (Entered: 06/21/2001)
                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Laurence Bonilla in support of [16-1] motion for an Order to consolidate actions 01cv3225 (LLS), 01cv3397 (AKH), 01cv3546 (VM), 01cv3829 and 01cv4265 into one action for all purposes, [16-2] motion for an Order to appoint class member Laurence Bonilla to serve as lead plaintiff, [16-3] motion for an Order to direct that lead counsel for the class be determined by sealed bid auction. Received in night deposit on 6/18/01 at 11:39 p.m. (kkc) Modified on 10/25/2001 (Entered: 06/22/2001)
                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) by Laurence Bonilla for an Order to consolidate actions 01cv3225 (LLS), 01cv3397 (AKH), 01cv3546 (VM), 01cv3829 and 01cv4265 into one action for all purposes ; for an Order to appoint class member Laurence Bonilla to serve as lead plaintiff ; for an Order to direct that lead counsel for the class be determined by sealed bid auction . Return date not indicated. Declaration of Christopher J. Gray in support of motion attached. Received in night deposit on 6/18/01 at 11:41 p.m. (kkc) Modified on 10/25/2001 (Entered: 06/22/2001)
                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Gary Kogan, Jeff Eltinge in support of [12-1] motion for an order appointing the Kogan lead plaintiff group to serve as lead plaintiff pro tempore, [12-2] motion for an order approving the lead plaintiff's selection of Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP as lead counsel, [12-3] motion for an order consolidating all related actions such as 01 civ. 3225, 01 civ. 3397, 01 civ. 3546, 01 civ. 3829 and 01 civ. 4265. (kw) Modified on 10/25/2001 (Entered: 06/22/2001)
                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Thomas H. Burt, Esq. by Gary Kogan, Jeff Eltinge in support Re: [12-1] motion for an order appointing the Kogan lead plaintiff group to serve as lead plaintiff pro tempore, [12-2] motion for an order approving the lead plaintiff's selection of Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP as lead counsel, [12-3] motion for an order consolidating all related actions such as 01 civ. 3225, 01 civ. 3397, 01 civ. 3546, 01 civ. 3829 and 01 civ. 4265. (kw) Modified on 10/25/2001 (Entered: 06/22/2001)
                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Thomas H. Burt, Esq. regarding compliance with individual practice rules of Hon. Louis L. Stanton. (kw) Modified on 10/25/2001 (Entered: 06/22/2001)
                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) by Gary Kogan, Jeff Eltinge for an order appointing the Kogan lead plaintiff group to serve as lead plaintiff pro tempore ; for an order approving the lead plaintiff's selection of Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP as lead counsel ; for an order consolidating all related actions such as 01 civ. 3225, 01 civ. 3397, 01 civ. 3546, 01 civ. 3829 and 01 civ. 4265 . No return date. (kw) Modified on 10/25/2001 (Entered: 06/22/2001)
                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Samuel H. Rudman by Nicholas J. Anderson, Bettie J. Anderson, Murray L. Waldron, John Minch in support Re: [9-1] motion for an order purs. to FRCP 42(a) consolidating the following actions 01 cv 3225; 01 cv 3397; 01 cv 3546; 01 cv 3829; and 01 cv 4265, [9-2] motion appointing Nicholas J. Anderson and Bettie J. Anderson, Murray L. Waldron and John Minch as Lead Plaintiff for the Class purs. to Section 27 of the Securities Act of 1933 and Section 21D of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934, [9-3] motion approving their selection of the law firms of Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP and Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP to serve as Lead Counsel. (ae) Modified on 10/12/2001 (Entered: 06/20/2001)
                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Nicholas J. Anderson, Bettie J. Anderson, Murray L. Waldron, John Minch in support of [9-1] motion for an order purs. to FRCP 42(a) consolidating the following actions 01 cv 3225; 01 cv 3397; 01 cv 3546; 01 cv 3829; and 01 cv 4265, [9-2] motion appointing Nicholas J. Anderson and Bettie J. Anderson, Murray L. Waldron and John Minch as Lead Plaintiff for the Class purs. to Section 27 of the Securities Act of 1933 and Section 21D of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934, [9-3] motion approving their selection of the law firms of Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP and Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP to serve as Lead Counsel. (ae) Modified on 10/12/2001 (Entered: 06/20/2001)
                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION by Nicholas J. Anderson, Bettie J. Anderson, Murray L. Waldron, John Minch for an order purs. to FRCP 42(a) consolidating the following actions 01 cv 3225 01 cv 3397; 01 cv 3546; 01 cv 3829; and 01 cv 4265 ; appointing Nicholas J. Anderson and Bettie J. Anderson, Murray L. Waldron and John Minch as Lead Plaintiff for the Class purs. to Section 27 of the Securities Act of 1933 and Section 21D of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 ; approving their selection of the law firms of Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP and Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP to serve as Lead Counsel . (ae) Modified on 10/12/2001 (Entered: 06/20/2001)
                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/31/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Morgan Stanley Dean. (kkc) (Entered: 06/04/2001)
                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/21/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            STIPULATION and ORDER; that dft. Michael H. Jordan acknowledges and accepts service of the Summons and Complaint in this action ; the last day for dft. to move, answer or otherwise respond to the complaint in this case shall be extended to the date 45 days after the later of: 1). the appointment of Lead Plaintiff(s) and Lead Counsel pursuant to 15 U.S.C. section 78z-1(a)(3) and 15 U.S.C. section 78u-4(a)(3); 2). the filing of a consolidated amended complaint in this action . ( signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton ) (pl) Modified on 10/25/2001 (Entered: 05/22/2001)
                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/17/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of summons and complaint as to Larry S. Kramer by Joan Platt on 4/23/01. Answer due on 5/14/01 for Larry S. Kramer. (lam) Modified on 10/25/2001 (Entered: 05/22/2001)
                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/17/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                STIPULATION and ORDER; defendants Marketwatch.com, Inc., Larry S. Kramer, James A. DePalma, and Andrew Heyward acknowledge and accept service of the summons and complaint in this action; the last day for defendants Marketwatch.com, Inc., Larry S. Karamer, James A. DePalma and Andrew Heyward to move, answer or otherwise respond to the complaint in thi matter shall be extended to the date 45 days after the later of: 1. appointment of Lead Plaintiff(s) and Lead Counsel purs to 15 U.S.C. section 78z-1(a)(3) and 15 U.S.C. section 78u-4(a)(3); or 2. the filig of a consolidated amended complaint in this action ; (signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton ) (djc) Modified on 05/21/2001 (Entered: 05/18/2001)
                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/14/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION and ORDER; that defendants' time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint in this action is extended through and including the later of 60 days after (i) assignment of lead plaintiffs' counsel; or (ii) the filing of an amended complaint in this action . ( signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton ) (kkc) (Entered: 05/15/2001)
                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/9/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER FOR CONFERNECE PURS. TO RULE 16(b); that this action is scheduled for a conference in accordance with FRCP 16(b) on Friday, 8/3/01 at 12:30 p.m. in Room 23C . ( signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton ); Copies mailed. (jp) (Entered: 05/10/2001)
                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/4/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S/C as to Credit Suisse Corp. by Janine Schamper on 4/20/01. Answer due on 5/10/01 for Credit Suisse Corp. . (cd) (Entered: 05/07/2001)
                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/17/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        Magistrate Judge Douglas F. Eaton is so designated. (kkc)
                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/17/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 403006. (kkc) (Entered: 04/18/2001)
                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/19/1992, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            OMNIBUS ORDER, Nicholas and Bettie Anderson are hereby appointed as lead pltff and their selection of the Executive Committee to serve as Lead Counsel is approved. All other motions to be appointed lead pltff and for approval of lead counsel are hereby denied. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (orig. doc. filed in 21 mc 92, doc. #4319) (sac)
                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 12 times.

                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?