Lionbridge Tech. IPO v. Lionbridge Tech.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-06770
District Judge Shira A. Scheindlin, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 5, 2019 at 11:05 PM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Andrew Samet, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Menachem E. Lifshitz +1 212 779 1414 lifshitz@bernlieb.com
No Logo Bernard Gateau, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Claire Lubowicki, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Paul Dabill, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
v.
No Logo Adams, Harkness & Hill, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Claude P. Sheer, Defendant
No Logo Guy L. Dechazal, Defendant
No Logo Lionbridge Technologies, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Marcia J. Hopper, Defendant
No Logo Paul Kavanagh, Defendant
No Logo Prudential Securities Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Prudential Securities Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Sarah S. Gold +1 212 969 3000 +1 212 969 2900 sgold@proskauer.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen Leonard Ratner +1 212 969 3000 +1 212 969 2900 sratner@proskauer.com
No Logo Robertson Stephens, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew Jay Frackman +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 afrackman@omm.com
No Logo Rory J. Cowan, Defendant
No Logo Stephen J. Lifshatz, Defendant
No Logo Stephen M. Jenks, Defendant
U.S. Bancorp Piper Jaffray, Inc. U.S. Bancorp Piper Jaffray, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Dean M. Jeske +1 312 832 4500 +1 312 832 4700 djeske@foley.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 77
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (37) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT settling action. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/24/09) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Right to Appeal)(dt) (Entered: 12/22/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    STIPULATION AND ORDER that the Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement with defendant Issuers and Individuals submitted to the Court on 6/10/4, is hereby terminated purs to Paragraph 39 of the Proposed Partial Settlement. However, purs to paragraph 40 of the Proposed Partial Settlement, that paragraph, and the paragraphs referred to therein, shall survive the termination of the Proposed Partial Settlement. This Stipulation resolves (5527) Motion to Approve of Class action settlement. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this motion. This document relates to: All cases listed on Schedule I. (orig fld in 21mc92, #5620). (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/25/07) (cd)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/22/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE of Change of Address of Brian E. Pastuszenski and Inez H. Friedman-Boyce. Document filed by Lionbridge Technologies, Inc.. (Simes, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/22/2005)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/29/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      ANSWER by Prudential Sec. to [10-1] amended complaint . (Attorney Sarah S. Gold from the Proskauer Rose, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 10/10/2003)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/23/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ANSWER by U.S. Banccorp Piper to [10-1] amended complaint . (Attorney Dean M. Jeske from the Firm: Foley & Lardner). (sac) (Entered: 09/22/2003)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          (UNSIGNED) STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL; this action purs. to Stipulation and Order entered in 21 mc 92, doc. #5059, hereby dismisses without prejudice and without costs as to defts Rory J. Cowan, Stephen J. Lifshatz, Guy L. de Chazal, Marcia J. Hooper, Stephen M. Jenks, Paul Kavanagh and Claude P. Sheer. (Orig. filed and signed by Judge Scheindlin in 21 mc 92.) (sac)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/5/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            STIPULATION AND ORDER; substituting Proskauer Rose LLP in place of Katten Muchin Zavis Rosenman as counsel for defts Prudential Sec. Inc. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ) (sac) (Entered: 02/03/2003)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to U.S. Banccorp Piper by Patrice Blaeser on 4/29/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/23/2002)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Prudential Sec. by Alexis C. DaCosta, managing agent, on 5/3/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Lionbridge Tech. by Sandy Herring, managing agent, on 4/26/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Rory J. Cowan by Sandy Herring, co-worker, on 4/26/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Stephen J. Lifshatz by Sandy Herring, managing agent, on 4/26/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Guy L. Dechazal by Sandy Herring, co-worker, on 4/26/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Marcia J. Hopper by Sandy Herring, co-worker, on 4/26/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Stephen M. Jenks by Sandy Herring, co-worker, on 4/26/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Paul Kavanagh by Sandy Herring, co-worker, on 4/26/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Claude P. Sheer by Sandy Herring, co-worker, on 4/26/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Adams, Harkness by Joe Ciardi, managing agent, on 4/26/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    MASTER ALLEGATIONS by Bernard Gateau, Paul Dabill, Claire Lubowicki RE: Amended Complaint, doc.# 10, Filed on April 19, 2002. (ac)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT by Bernard Gateau, Paul Dabill, Claire Lubowicki amending [1-1] complaint ; Summons issued. (ac) (Entered: 06/26/2002)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        OMNIBUS ORDER, Bernard Gateau is hereby appointed as lead pltff and his selection of the Executive Committee to serve as Lead Counsel is approved. All other motions are hereby denied. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (orig. doc. filed in 21 mc 92, doc. #4319) (sac)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/25/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          STIPULATION and ORDER, pltffs agree to and here dismiss without prejudice all claims against: DoubleClick, Inc., Kevin J. O'Connor, Kevin P. Ryan, Dwight A. Merriman, Stephen R. Collins, Mark E. Nunnelly, W. Grant Gregory, Donald Peppers, David N. Strohm, Scott Gould to the extent the are named in any of the following actions listed herein. DoubleClick, Inc., Kevin J. O'Connor, Stephen R. Collins, David N. Strohm, Mark E. Nunnelly, W Grant Gregory, Donald Peppers and Thomas S. Murphy shall remain named as consolidated defts in the consolidated lead case 01 Civ. 3980, only in connection with the claims asserted against them in 01 Civ. 10211, which is to be consolidated with the lead case 01 Civ. 3980 purs. to the Court's order of consolidation entered in such lead case and dated 9/5/01. Pltffs agree to and here dismiss without prejudice all claims against: Brocade Communications Systems, Inc., Seth D. Neiman, Gregory L. Reyes, Michael J. Byrd to the extent they are named in any of the following actions: 01 Civ. 6613 01 Civ. 8663; 01 Civ. 8673. Pltffs agree to and hereby dismiss without prejudice all claims against: Extreme Networks, Inc., Gordon Stitt, Vito Palermo, Stephen Haddock, Herb Schneider, William Kelly, George Prodan, Paul Romeo, Harry Silverglide, Charles Carinalli, Promod Haque, Lawrence K. Orr, Peter Wolken to the extent they are named in any of the following actions: 01 Civ. 6700; 01 Civ. 6739. Extreme Networks, Inc., Gordon Stitt, Vito Palermo, Stephen Haddock, Herb Schneider, William Kelly, George Prodan, Paul Romeo, Harry Silverglide, Charles Carinalli, Promod Haque, Lawrence K. Orr, Peter Wolken shall remain named as consolidated defts in the consolidated lead case 01 Civ. 6143 only in connection with the claims asserted against them in the amended complaint filed 12/6/01 in 01 Civ. 6368, which case is to be closed and consolidated with new lead case 01 Civ. 6143 purs. to Court's order of consolidation dated 1/15/02. Pltffs agree to and hereby dismiss without prejudice all claims against: Tibco Software Inc., Vivek Y. Ranadive, Paul G. Hansen, Douglas M. Atkin, Yogen K. Dalal, Edward R. Kozel, Donald J. Listwin, Larry W. Sonsini, John G. Gaysom, Philip Wood, Robert Stefanski to the extent they are named in any of the following actions: 01 Civ. 6110; 01 Civ. 6778; 01 Civ. 6774; 01 Civ. 6877; 01 Civ. 7840; 01 Civ. 8786. Tibco Software Inc., Vivek Y. Ranadive, Paul G. Hansen, Douglas M. Atkin, Yogen K. Dalal, Edward R. Kozel, Donald J. Listwin, Larry W. Sonsini, John G. Gaysom, Philip Wood, Robert Stefanski shall remain named as consolidated defts in the consolidated lead case 01 Civ. 6110 only in connection with the claims asserted against them in the amended complaint filed 12/6/01 in 01 Civ. 6440, which case was closed and consolidated with the lead case 01 Civ. 6110 purs. to the Court's order of consolidated entered in such lead case and dated 9/10/01. Pltffs agree to and hereby dismiss without prejudice all claims against: Redback Networks, Inc., Dennis L. Barsema, Geoffrey C. Darby to the extent they are named in any of the following actions: 01 Civ. 6090; 01 Civ. 6135; 01 Civ. 6401; 01 Civ. 6436; 01 Civ. 6443; 01 Civ. 6615; 01 Civ. 6740; 01 Civ. 7429; 01 Civ. 7658 01 Civ. 7772; 01 Civ. 8352. Pltffs agree to and hereby dismiss without prejudice all claims against: Retek, Inc., John Buchanan, Gregory A. Effertz, Gordon Masson to the extent they are named in any of the following actions: 01 Civ. 5225 and cases consolidated thereunder. Pltffs agree to and hereby dismiss without prejudice all claims against: Ariba, Inc., Keith J. Krach, Edward P. Kinsey, Robert C. Kagle, John B. Mumford, Paul Hegarty, Hatim A. Tyabji to the extent they are named in any of the following actions: 01 Civ. 2359, and cases consolidated thereunder; 01 Civ. 4956. Pltffs agree to and hereby dismiss without prejudice all claims against: Lionbridge Tech., Inc., Rory J. Cowan, Stephen J. Lifshatz, Guy L. de Chazal, Marcia J. Hooper, Stephen M. Jenks, Paul Kavanagh, Claude P. Sheer in 01 Civ. 6770, subject to the execution by the Issuer Deft and Individual Defts named therein of a totaling agreement substantially in the form attached hereto as Exhibit A. Each deft dismissed from the IPO Actions purs. to this Stip. and Order hereby agrees that he or she or it will not seek to recover from Pltffs those costs incurred up to the date of entry of the dismissal of such deft, provided, however, that such deft is not later reinstated as a deft in an IPO Action by Pltffs or their respective counsel in connection with the same or substantially the same claims arising from the same public offering identified in those complaints from which such defts were dismissed purs. to this stip. and order. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin )... Duplicate copies of Stip. and Order filed in 01 Civ. 3980; 01 Civ. 4034; 01 Civ. 4099; 01 Civ. 4263; 01 Civ. 4515; 01 Civ. 4782; 01 Civ. 5667 01 Civ. 7635; 01 Civ. 10211; 01 Civ. 6613; 01 Civ. 8663; 01 Civ. 8673; 01 Civ. 6700; 01 Civ. 6739; 01 Civ. 6143; 01 Civ. 6368; 01 Civ. 6110; 01 Civ. 6778; 01 Civ. 6774; 01 Civ. 6877 01 Civ. 7840; 01 Civ. 8786; 01 Civ. 6440; 01 Civ. 6090; 01 Civ. 6135; 01 Civ. 6401; 01 Civ. 6436; 01 Civ. 6443; 01 Civ. 6615; 01 Civ. 6740; 01 Civ. 7429; 01 Civ. 7658; 01 Civ. 7772 01 Civ. 8352; 01 Civ. 5225; 01 Civ. 2359; 01 Civ. 6770; 01 Civ. 4956 (sac) (Entered: 03/11/2002)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Prudential Sec. (sac) (Entered: 02/13/2002)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Robertson Stephens. (sac) (Entered: 02/06/2002)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/1/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Leland Shalgos in support of [0-1] motion for an order, appointing Leland Shalgos as lead pltff in this action purs. to 15 U.S.C. 77z-1 and 78u-4, [0-2] motion for an order, approving Leland Shalgos' choice of Lead Counsel. (Filed dated 10/1/01) (sac)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/1/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION by Leland Shalogs for an order, appointing Leland Shalgos as lead pltff in this action purs. to 15 U.S.C. 77z-1 and 78u-4 ; for an order, approving Leland Shalgos' choice of Lead Counsel ; Return Date not indicated. (Filed dated 10/1/01) (sac) Modified on 06/25/2002
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/18/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    DECLARATION of Douglas Wilens by Bernard Gateau in support Re: [0-1] motion for an order, appointing him as Lead Pltff, [0-2] motion for an order, approving his selection of the law firm of Cauley Geller Bowman & Coates, LLP to serve as Lead Counsel, [0-3] motion for an order, consolidating the related actions. (01 Civ. 6770)... Filed dated 9/18/01. (sac) Modified on 06/25/2002
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/18/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Bernard Gateau in support of [0-1] motion for an order, appointing him as Lead Pltff, [0-2] motion for an order, approving his selection of the law firm of Cauley Geller Bowman & Coates, LLP to serve as Lead Counsel, [0-3] motion for an order, consolidating the related actions. (01 Civ. 6770)... Filed dated 9/18/01. (sac)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/18/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION by Bernard Gateau for an order, appointing him as Lead Pltff ; for an order, approving his selection of the law firm of Cauley Geller Bowman & Coates, LLP to serve as Lead Counsel ; for an order, consolidating the related actions ; Return Date not indicated. (Filed on 9/18/01) (sac)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Prudential Sec. (sac) (Entered: 10/11/2001)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Lionbridge Tech. . (bai) Modified on 09/26/2001 (Entered: 09/20/2001)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/14/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE; counsel for all parties are directed to attend an initial pretrial conference on 10/4/01 at 10:30 a.m. at the U.S. District Courthouse, 40 Foley Square for the purpose of case management and scheduling pursuant to FRCP 16. ( signed by Judge George B. Daniels ) (kkc) Modified on 09/26/2001 (Entered: 08/14/2001)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Pretrial Conference set at 4:30 9/07/01 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (dcap)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  Notice of Case Reassignment to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Copy of notice mailed to Attorney(s) of record. Pursuant to the Order of Chief Judge Mukasey dated August 8, 2001, the above entitled action is reassigned to the calendar of Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for inclusion in the coordinated pretrial proceedings being conducted by that judge. Two originals of all future documents submitted in this action are to be presented in the Clerk's Office for filing. One original is to be filed in this docket number and one original is to be filed in the miscellaneous case number 21mc92 (SAS). Each shall bear the original assigned judge's ( ) initials after the original docket number. Attached is a copy of Judge Mukasey's ORDER re: coordinating the proceedings before Judge Scheindlin. Also asttached is a copy of Judge Scheindlin's ORDER re: set initial PTC 09/07/01 and directing all counsel to comply with Judge Scheindlin's requirements. [Original Orders docketed in 21mc92 (SAS) as documents numbers 1 and 2] (dcap) (Entered: 09/26/2001)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    STIPULATION and ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT; the time within which defts Lionbridge Technologies, Inc., Rory J. Cowan, Stephen J. Lifshatz, Guy L. deChazal, Marcia J. Hooper, Stephen M. Jenks, Paul Kavanagh and Claude P. Sheer, must answer, move or respond to the complaint is extended through 45 days after (i) appointment of lead pltff's counsel; or (ii) the filing of an amended complaint . The defts herein acknowledge valid service of the summons and complaint and waive any objections to service of the summons and complaint . ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ) (sn) (Entered: 08/10/2001)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/24/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Magistrate Judge Kevin N. Fox is so designated. (bai)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/24/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Class Action COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 412435. (bai) (Entered: 07/26/2001)
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                          Statistics

                                                                          This case has been viewed 11 times.

                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                          Space
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                           
                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                          Need Password Help?