Bogle v. Oregon Department of Corrections
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 6:18-cv-02095
District Judge Ann L. Aiken, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 8, 2020 at 8:31 PM ST (1.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Tracey E. Bogle, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Tracey E. Bogle

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tracey E. Bogle
v.
No Logo C/O Does No. 1-30, Defendant
No Logo C/O Lieutenants Does 1-10, Defendant
No Logo Collette S. Peters, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by State of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert E. Sullivan +1 503 947 4700 +1 503 947 4791 robert.sullivan@doj.state.or.us
No Logo Mrs. Hendrix, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by State of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert E. Sullivan +1 503 947 4700 +1 503 947 4791 robert.sullivan@doj.state.or.us
No Logo Oregon Department of Corrections, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by State of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert E. Sullivan +1 503 947 4700 +1 503 947 4791 robert.sullivan@doj.state.or.us
No Logo Santiam Correctional Institution, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by State of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert E. Sullivan +1 503 947 4700 +1 503 947 4791 robert.sullivan@doj.state.or.us
No Logo State of Oregon, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by State of Oregon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert E. Sullivan +1 503 947 4700 +1 503 947 4791 robert.sullivan@doj.state.or.us
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/8/2020, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/8/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: None Summary Judgment or 12(b) Dismissal Advice Notice - FORM EVENT
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed Filed by Hendrix, State of Oregon, Santiam Correctional Institution, Oregon Department of Corrections, Collette S. Peters. (Sullivan, Robert) (Entered: 01/28/2019)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/24/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Notice of Change of Address as of 1/31/19. Filed by Tracey E. Bogle. (dsg) (Entered: 01/25/2019)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Time 8 . Waiver of Service is due by 1/28/2019. Ordered by Judge Ann L. Aiken. A copy of this Order was mailed to pro se plaintiff Tracey E. Bogle. (ck) (Entered: 01/14/2019)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Declaration of Robert E. Sullivan in Support of Motion for Extension of Time. Filed by State of Oregon. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time 8 .) (Sullivan, Robert) (Entered: 01/14/2019)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants' Waiver of Service. Filed by State of Oregon. (Sullivan, Robert) (Entered: 01/14/2019)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Clerk's Notice of Mailing Notice of Lawsuit 5 to Bogle and e-mailing to Andrew Hallman and DOJ's Trial Case Requests, including the complaint. (kf) (Entered: 12/14/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Clerk's Notice of Mailing Order to proceed ifp 4 to Bogle and ODOC. (kf) (Entered: 12/14/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None
                      Notice of Lawsuit and Request for Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver of Service due 1/14/2019. (kf) (Entered: 12/14/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and to Collect Inmate Filing Fee signed on 12/13/18 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (kf) (Entered: 12/14/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Ann L. Aiken. (jw) (copy mailed to plaintiff) (Entered: 12/06/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Tracey E. Bogle. (Attachments: # 1 attachment) (jw) (Entered: 12/06/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                              Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Tracey E. Bogle against C/O Does No. 1-30, C/O Lieutenants Does 1-10, Hendrix, Oregon Department of Corrections, Collette S. Peters, Santiam Correctional Institution, State of Oregon (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet). (jw) (Entered: 12/06/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 14 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?