Peterson v. Pfizer
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Southern District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-02726
District Judge Anthony J. Battaglia, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 3, 2019 at 4:10 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Barbara Peterson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Barbara Peterson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barbara Peterson
No Logo Bradley Peterson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by La Jolla, Ca. 92037

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY David Andrew Kaufman +1 619 865 8648 attorney@lawofficesofdavidkaufman.com
v.
No Logo ABBVIE, Defendant
No Logo Does 1-25, Defendant
No Logo Pfizer, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Anthony J. Battaglia for all further proceedings. The new case number is 3:18-cv-02726-AJB-RBB.(no document attached) (jrm) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (lrc) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against ABBVIE, Does 1-25, Pfizer ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11958015.), filed by Bradley Peterson. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:18-cv-2726-BEN-RBB. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks are assigned to the case. (Kaufman, David)(lrc) (sjt). (Entered: 12/03/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 15 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?