Miller v. United States
Federal Civil Lawsuit Hawaii District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-00587
District Judge HELEN GILLMOR, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 4, 2019 at 11:39 PM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo I. M. M., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by lawctr.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Collin Marty Fritz +5283 528 528 3900 cmfritz@lawctr.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Allen K. Williams +5283 528 528 3900 allen@lawctr.net
No Logo Sheena Miller, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by lawctr.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Collin Marty Fritz +5283 528 528 3900 cmfritz@lawctr.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Allen K. Williams +5283 528 528 3900 allen@lawctr.net
No Logo Tracy Miller, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by lawctr.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Collin Marty Fritz +5283 528 528 3900 cmfritz@lawctr.net
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Allen K. Williams +5283 528 528 3900 allen@lawctr.net
United States of America United States of America, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Thomas A. Helper +5412 541 541 2850 Tom.Helper@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2671
Nature of Suit 362 - Personal Injury: Medical Malpractice
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Plaintiffs' Scheduling Conference Statement and Certificate of Service. (Williams, Allen) Modified on 1/31/2018 (emt, ). (Entered: 01/30/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Defendant's Scheduling Conference Statement ; COS. (Helper, Thomas) Modified on 1/31/2018 (emt, ). (Entered: 01/30/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      REPORT of Planning Meeting . (Williams, Allen) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 2/06/2018 at 9:00 AM is CONTINUED to 09:15 AM, the same day, in Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 1/30/2018. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI)(mrf)CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry (Entered: 01/09/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas A. Helper on behalf of United States of America on behalf of United States of America. (Helper, Thomas) (Entered: 01/05/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Tracy Miller. United States of America served on 12/18/2017. (Williams, Allen) Modified on 12/26/2017 to reflect date of service (emt, ). (Entered: 12/22/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: # 1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, # 2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (emt, ) (Entered: 12/12/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00AM on 2/6/2018 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE RICHARD L. PUGLISI - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 12/12/2017. (Attachments: # 1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry. ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (Entered: 12/12/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Summons Issued as to United States of America. (emt, ) (Entered: 12/12/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 17-00587 HG-RLP on all further pleadings. (emt, )CERTIFICATE OF SERVICEParticipants registered to receive electronic notifications received this document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Participants not registered to receive electronic notifications were served by first class mail on the date of this docket entry. (Entered: 12/12/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      CIVIL Cover Sheet by Tracy Miller. (Williams, Allen) (Entered: 12/12/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        COMPLAINT and Summons against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-1967985.), filed by Tracy Miller. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(Williams, Allen) (Entered: 12/12/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 0 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?