Liberate Tech. IPO v. Liberate Techno.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-04147
District Judge Shira A. Scheindlin, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 4, 2019 at 11:29 PM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ben Berman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Menachem E. Lifshitz +1 212 779 1414 lifshitz@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Peter Edward Seidman +1 212 613 5625 +1 212 868 1229 pseidman@milberg.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Carl Huang, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Joseph Wilder, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Abraham, Fruchter & Twersky, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Jack W. Fruchter +1 212 279 5050 +1 212 279 3655 jfruchter@aftlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Peter Edward Seidman +1 212 613 5625 +1 212 868 1229 pseidman@milberg.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SEEGER WEISS LP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen A. Weiss +1 212 584 0700 +1 212 584 0799 sweiss@seegerweiss.com
No Logo Rio Guzman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY STUART LANE BERMAN +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 sberman@ktmc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Safirstein Metcalf LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY PETER GEORGE SAFIRSTEIN +1 212 201 2845 +1 212 201 2858 psafirstein@safirsteinmetcalf.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew L. Barroway +1 610 667 7056 + 610 667 7056
v.
No Logo Bancboston Robertson Stephens Inc., Defendant
No Logo Charles G. Tritschler, Defendant
No Logo Chase Securities Inc., Defendant
Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Dain Rauscher Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Arnold & Porter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stewart David Aaron +1 212 715 1000
No Logo David A. Limp, Defendant
No Logo David J. Roux, Defendant
No Logo Hambrecht and Quist, Defendant
No Logo J.P. Morgan Sec., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph M. McLaughlin +1 212 455 2000 jmclaughlin@stblaw.com
No Logo Liberate Technologies, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc, Defendant
Officially listed as "Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Mark Holland +1 212 813 8800 +1 212 355 3333 mholland@goodwinlaw.com
No Logo Mitchell E. Kertzman, Defendant
No Logo Nancy J. Hilker, Defendant
No Logo RBC Dominion Securities, Defendant
No Logo Robertson Stephens, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Brendan Joseph Dowd +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 bdowd@omm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew Jay Frackman +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 afrackman@omm.com
U.S. Bancorp Piper Jaffray, Inc. U.S. Bancorp Piper Jaffray, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Dean M. Jeske +1 312 832 4500 +1 312 832 4700 djeske@foley.com
No Logo Brian Shonson, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Menachem E. Lifshitz +1 212 779 1414 lifshitz@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Peter Edward Seidman +1 212 613 5625 +1 212 868 1229 pseidman@milberg.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo David Osher, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Peter Edward Seidman +1 212 613 5625 +1 212 868 1229 pseidman@milberg.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SEEGER WEISS LP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY David R. Buchanan +1 212 584 0700 +1 212 584 0799 DBuchanan@SeegerWeiss.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen A. Weiss +1 212 584 0700 +1 212 584 0799 sweiss@seegerweiss.com
No Logo Irwin M. Chase Trust, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Glancy Binkow & Goldberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Brian P Murray +1 212 682 5340 +1 212 884 0988 bmurray@glancylaw.com
No Logo Karol Rose, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY STUART LANE BERMAN +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 sberman@ktmc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew L. Barroway +1 610 667 7056 + 610 667 7056
No Logo Linda Jones, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Frederick W. Gerkens, III +1 212 382 2221 +1 212 382 3944 fgerkens.esq@verizon.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Harwood Feffer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert Ira Harwood +1 212 935 7400 +1 212 753 3630 rharwood@whesq.com
No Logo Myron Ruderman, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bull and Lifshitz

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Peter D.. Bull +1 212 213 6222 +1 212 213 9405 pdb@nyclasslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Lifshitz Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Joshua M. Lifshitz +1 212 213 6222 +1 212 213 9405 jml@jlclasslaw.com
No Logo Sanjay Budhwar, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Menachem E. Lifshitz +1 212 779 1414 lifshitz@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Peter Edward Seidman +1 212 613 5625 +1 212 868 1229 pseidman@milberg.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Stephen Inglis, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Susan Katz, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Faruqi & Faruqi, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Nadeem Faruqi +1 212 983 9330 +1 212 983 9331 nfaruqi@faruqilaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Marc S. Henzel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Marc S. Henzel +1 215 625 9999

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Thomas Hamilton Burt +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653 burt@whafh.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Frederick Taylor Isquith, Sr +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653 isquith@whafh.com
No Logo Terry Jones, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Frederick W. Gerkens, III +1 212 382 2221 +1 212 382 3944 fgerkens.esq@verizon.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Harwood Feffer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert Ira Harwood +1 212 935 7400 +1 212 753 3630 rharwood@whesq.com
No Logo Tova Schwartz, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Menachem E. Lifshitz +1 212 779 1414 lifshitz@bernlieb.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (60) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/21/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT settling action. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/24/09) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Right to Appeal)(dt) (Entered: 12/22/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    STIPULATION AND ORDER that the Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement with defendant Issuers and Individuals submitted to the Court on 6/10/4, is hereby terminated purs to Paragraph 39 of the Proposed Partial Settlement. However, purs to paragraph 40 of the Proposed Partial Settlement, that paragraph, and the paragraphs referred to therein, shall survive the termination of the Proposed Partial Settlement. This Stipulation resolves (5527) Motion to Approve of Class action settlement. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this motion. This document relates to: All cases listed on Schedule I. (orig fld in 21mc92, #5620). (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/25/07) (cd)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/31/2005, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ORDER; that Arnold & Porter LLP be substituted in the place and stead of Dorsey & Whitney LLP as the attorneys of record for defendant, RBC Dain Rauscher, Inc. in this action. Original Document filed in 21-mc-92, Doc#5427. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/31/05) This Document Relates to: 01cv6000; 01cv9742; 01cv9982; 01cv6275; 01cv9422; 01cv5446; 01cv10827; 01cv6241; 01cv6613; 01cv5143; 01cv5072; 01cv10988; 01cv5937; 01cv6222; 01cv11234; 01cv10686; 01cv6542; 01cv6887; 01cv7355; 02cv9699; 01cv8404; 01cv5911; 01cv9800; 01cv10684; 01cv6143; 01cv7055; 01cv7048; 01cv5039; 01cv10834; 01cv6084; 01cv9917; 01cv10899; 01cv4147; 01cv6661; 01cv11000; 01cv6757; 01cv6627; 01cv11230; 01cv9675; 01cv5332; 01cv7035; 01cv11239; 01cv6004; 01cv7280; 01cv7344; 01cv4778; 01cv10185; 01cv10797; 01cv7270; 01cv11201; 01cv6090; 01cv10140; 01cv11245; 01cv4941; 01cv10596; 01cv6821; 01cv6001; 01cv6492; 01cv9981; 01cv9563; 01cv5241; 01cv6906; 01cv9514; 01cv10833; 01cv10053; 01cv10830; 01cv6365; 01cv4779; 01cv5074.(sac, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF OMNIBUS MOTION FOR INTERVENTION; the Class members listed on Exhibit 1 to this Notice hereby withdraw, without prejudice to renewal, their Omnibus Motion for Intervention (Doc. No. 5191 on Dkt. 21 MC 92) that was filed on 9/2/03. This Document Relates to: 01cv5902; 01cv2359; 01cv10901; 01cv3360; 01cv6890; 01cv5446; 01cv2858; 01cv10827; 01cv9883; 01cv6397; 01cv6613; 01cv6271; 01cv10839; 01cv5937; 01cv6222; 01cv7669; 01cv10971; 01cv5575; 01cv7044; 01cv10943; 01cv10686; 01cv10105; 01cv5834; 01cv6542; 01cv7000; 01cv10944; 01cv3792; 01cv4942; 01cv11231; 01cv6887; 01cv5948; 01cv6242; 01cv7467; 01cv9411; 01cv9414; 01cv6775; 01cv5911; 01cv11246; 01cv7055; 01cv6948; 01cv10164; 01cv10813; 01cv7048; 01cv10738; 01cv10640; 01cv10884; 01cv10741; 01cv6339; 01cv6771; 01cv9743; 01cv6272; 01cv6842; 01cv6277; 01cv9922; 01cv10969; 01cv6084; 01cv3975; 01cv7654; 01cv9917; 01cv9349; 01cv7974; 01cv9417; 01cv10740; 01;cv9442; 01cv4147; 01cv6661; 01cv3483; 01cv6757; 01cv10990; 01cv6627; 01cv7726; 01cv9651; 01cv4183; 01cv3910; 01cv7028; 01cv5332; 01cv9798; 01cv11239; 01cv6089; 01cv6004; 01cv10823; 01cv10945; 01cv7280; 01cv10775; 01cv5354; 01cv7032; 01cv9744; 01cv9904; 01cv11217; 01cv10185; 01cv7279; 01cv2261; 01cv6082; 01cv10867; 01cv10160; 01cv10898; 01cv10683; 01cv2712; 01cv6090; 01cv10942; 01cv10120; 01cv11245; 01cv5225; 01cv6950; 01cv9746; 01cv7415; 01cv4941; 01cv10831; 01cv5600; 01cv10941; 01cv9921; 01cv4186; 01cv6846; 01cv6821; 01cv7474; 01cv5267; 01cv6288; 01cv7247; 01cv6110; 01cv10822; 01cv6008; 01cv5269; 01cv9563; 01cv9348; 01cv9604; 01cv5739; 01cv10999; 01cv3450; 01cv5241; 01cv9720; 01cv10040; 01cv6906; 01cv9514; 01cv10833; 01cv10092; 01cv10053; 01cv6768; 01cv10830; 01cv10638; 01cv4779; 01cv5074. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 9/30/04)... Original Document filed in 21-mc-92, Doc#5367.(sac, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: MOTION, Doc#5191, (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) to Intervene. Original Document filed in 21mc92, Doc#5279. (sac, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/4/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) to Intervene.. Document filed by Linda Jones, Terry Jones. Original Document filed in 21 MC 92, Doc#5195.(sac, )
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/4/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            NOTICE OF OMNIBUS MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) to Intervene EACH CLASS MEMBER named on Exhibit 1 attached to Memorandum of Law in Support, as class plaintiffs in those coordinated actions. This Document Relates to: 01cv5902; 01cv2359; 01cv10901; 01cv3360; 01cv6890; 01cv5446; 01cv2858; 01cv10827; 01cv9883; 01cv6397; 01cv6613; 01cv6271; 01cv10839; 01cv5937; 01cv6222; 01cv7669; 01cv10971; 01cv5575; 01cv7044; 01cv10943; 01cv10686; 01cv10105; 01cv5834; 01cv6542; 01cv7000; 01cv10944; 01cv3792; 01cv4942; 01cv11231; 01cv6887; 01cv6242; 01cv7467; 01cv9411; 01cv9414; 01cv6775; 01cv5911; 01cv11246; 01cv7055; 01cv6948; 01cv10164; 01cv10813; 01cv7084; 01cv10738; 01cv10640; 01cv10884; 01cv10741; 01cv6339; 01cv6771; 01cv9743; 01cv62672; 01cv6842; 01cv6277; 01cv9922; 01cv10969; 01cv6084; 01cv3975; 01cv7654; 01cv9917; 01cv9349; 01cv 4974; 01cv9417; 01cv 10740; 01cv992; 01cv4147; 01cv6661; 01cv3483; 01cv6757; 01cv10990; 01cv6627; 01cv7726; 01cv9651; 01cv4183; 01cv3910; 01cv7028; 01cv5332; 01cv9798; 01cv11239; 01cv6089; 01cv6004; 01cv10823; 01cv10945; 01cv7280; 01cv10775; 01cv5354; 01cv7032; 01cv9744; 01cv9904; 01cv11217; 01cv10185; 01cv7279; 01cv2261; 01cv6082; 01cv10867; 01cv10160; 01cv10898; 01cv10683; 01cv2712; 01cv6090; 01cv10942; 01cv10120; 01cv11245; 01cv5225; 01cv6950; 01cv9746; 01cv7415; 01cv4941; 01cv10831; 01cv5600; 01cv10941; 01cv9921; 01cv4186; 01cv6846; 01cv6821; 01cv7474; 01cv5267; 01cv6288; 01cv7247; 01cv6110; 01cv10822; 01cv6008; 01cv5269; 01cv9563; 01cv9348; 01cv9604; 01cv5739; 01cv10999; 01cv3450; 01cv5241; 01cv9720; 01cv10040; 01cv6906; 01cv9514; 01cv10833; 01cv10092; 01cv10053; 01cv6768; 01cv10830; 01cv10638; 01cv4779; 01cv5074. Origianl Document filed in 21MC92, Doc#5191. Document filed by Terry Jones, Linda Jones. (sac, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              ANSWER to Corrected Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. Related document: 30 Amended Complaint filed by Karol Rose, Ben Berman, Carl Huang.(sac, ) (Entered: 03/26/2004)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/23/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ANSWER by U.S. Bancorp Piper to [30-1] amended complaint . (Attorney Dean M. Jeske from the Firm: Foley & Lardner). (sac) (Entered: 09/22/2003)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  ANSWER by Merrill Lynch to [30-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Mark Holland from the Firm: Clifford Chance US, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 09/15/2003)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    ANSWER by Robertson Stephens to [30-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Brendan Joseph Dowd from the O'Melveny & Myers, LLP)... rec'd in the night deposit box on 7/21/03 at 7:13 p.m. (sac) (Entered: 08/19/2003)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      ANSWER by J.P. Morgan Sec. to [30-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Joseph M. McLaughlin from the Simpson, Thacher & Bartlett, LLP)... rec'd in the night deposit box on 7/21/03 at 6:40 p.m. (sac) (Entered: 08/14/2003)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/18/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        ANSWER by Dain Rauscher, Inc. to [30-1] amended complaint . (Attorney Stewart D. Aaron from the Firm: Dorsey & Whitney, LLP)... rec'd in the night deposit box on 7/18/03 at 5:46 p.m. (sac) (Entered: 07/23/2003)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          (UNSIGNED) STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL; this action purs. to Stipulation and Order entered in 21 mc 92, doc. #5059, hereby dismisses without prejudice and without costs as to defts Nancy J. Hilker, Mitchell E. Kertzman, David A. Limp, David J. Roux and Charles G. Tritschler. (Orig. filed and signed by Judge Scheindlin in 21 mc 92.) (sac)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/31/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            NOTICE OF JOINDER of plaintiff Rio Guzman, purs. to FRCP 20. (rec'd in the night deposit box on 7/31 at 11:29 p.m.) (sac) (Entered: 08/22/2002)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Supplement Summons & Amended Complaint as to Dain Rauscher, Inc. by John Orenstein, Managing Agent on 4/3/02 (gf) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Amended Complaint as to U.S. Bancorp Piper by Patrice Blaeser, managing agent, on 4/3/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to U.S. Bancorp Piper by Patrice Blaeser, managing agent, on 4/3/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Amended Complaint as to Dain Rauscher, Inc. by John Orenstein, managing agent, on 4/3/02 . . (sac) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/25/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to BancBoston Robertson by Stephen Austin, managing agent, on 4/2/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/01/2002)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/25/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Amended Complaint as to BancBoston Robertson by Stephen Austin, managing agent, on 4/2/02. (sac) Modified on 06/28/2002 (Entered: 06/28/2002)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/24/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Amended Complaint as to David J. Roux by Jordan Magat, co-worker, on 4/4/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/16/2002)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/24/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Amended Complaint as to Charles G. Tritschler by leaving with Jordan Magat, co-worker, on 4/4/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/16/2002)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/24/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Amended Complaint as to David A. Limp by Jordan Magat, co-worker, on 4/4/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/16/2002)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                MASTER ALLEGATIONS by Ben Berman, Karol Rose, Carl Huang RE: Amended Complaint, doc.# 30, Filed on April 19, 2002. (ac)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT by Karol Rose, Ben Berman, Carl Huang amending [24-1] amended complaint, [1-1] complaint ; Summons issued. (ac) (Entered: 06/12/2002)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    OMNIBUS ORDER, Ben Berman is hereby appointed as lead pltff and his selection of the Executive Committee to serve as Lead Counsel is approved. All other motions to be appointed lead pltff and for approval of lead counsel are hereby denied. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (orig. doc. filed in 21 mc 92, doc. #4319) (sac)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Amended Complaint as to Chase Securities by Rosa A. Laraque, managing agent, on 3/28/02. (sac) (Entered: 05/16/2002)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/9/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Amended Complaint as to Credit Suisse First by Mary O'Riordan, Asst. V.P., on 4/1/02. (sac) (Entered: 05/06/2002)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Robertson Stephens. (sac) (Entered: 02/06/2002)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Merrill Lynch. (sac) (Entered: 01/29/2002)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Merrill Lynch. (sac) (Entered: 01/28/2002)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 12/6/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by Tova Schwartz (Answer due 12/19/01 for Nancy J. Hilker, for Mitchell E. Kertzman, for Merrill Lynch, for BancBoston Robertson, for Credit Suisse First, for Liberate Techno.) amending [1-1] complaint against Chase Securities, Dain Rauscher, Inc., U.S. Bancorp Piper, David J. Roux, David A. Limp, Charles G. Tritschler; Summons issued. (sac) (Entered: 12/17/2001)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/20/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Credit Suisse First. (sac) Modified on 10/12/2001 (Entered: 10/11/2001)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/6/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Consolidated Lead Case. (dcap)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/6/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER,... that all cases involving Liberate Technology in this IPO Securities Litigation, as set forth in the attached Rider (1:01-cv-04212, 1:01-cv-04281, 1:01-cv-04495, 1:01-cv-04514, 1:01-vc-04959, 1:01-cv-05309, 1:01-cv-8474), shall be consolidated into case number 01 Civ. 4147. The Clerk of Court is hereby ordered to consolidate any future cases that are designated as related to 01 Civ. 4147,... the Clerk of Court is further ordered to close all cases that have been consolidated, subject to re-opening at a later date on proper application by a party ... ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. [Original filed in 1:01-cv-04147 Document No. 22. Document Docketed in 1:01-cv-04212; 1:01-cv-04281; 1:01-cv-04495; 1:01-cv-04514; 1:01-cv-04959; 1:01-cv-05309; 1:01-cv-8474] (dcap) Modified on 11/05/2001 (Entered: 10/12/2001)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/30/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        AMENDED RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Liberate Techno., Mitchell E. Kertzman, Nancy J. Hilker. (sac) (Entered: 09/05/2001)
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/21/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER; withdrawing [6-1] motion to appoint Karol Rose and Rio Guzman as Lead Plaintiffs in the consolidated securities class actions against Liberate Technologies, Inc. and other defendants. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (sac) (Entered: 08/28/2001)
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            WITHDRAWAL of [6-1] motion to appoint Karol Rose and Rio Guzman as Lead Plaintiffs in the consolidated securities class actions against Liberate Technologies, Inc. and other defendants, [6-2] motion to approve Karol Rose and Rio Guzman's selection of Schiffrin & Barroway, as Lead Counsel to the class. [Docketed in 1:01-cv-04147; 1:01-cv-04281; 1:01-cv-04959; 1:01-cv-04495; 1:01-cv-05309; 1:01-cv-04212; 1:01-cv-04515] (dcap)
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ben Berman, Brian Shonson, Sanjay Budhwar in further support of: [9-1] motion to consolidate cases 1:01-cv-04147, 1:01-cv-04212, 1:01-cv-04281, 1:01-cv-04495, 1:01-cv-04514, 1:01-cv-04959, 1:01-cv-05309, [9-2] motion to appoint Ben Berman, Brian Shonson and Sanjay Budhwar as Lead Plaintiff, [9-3] motion to approve Ben Berman, Brian Shonson and Sanjay Budhwar's selection of the law frims fo Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP and Bernstein Liebhard & Lifshitz, LLP to serve as Lead Counsel. Received in night deposit on 8/9/01 at 6:22 p.m. (kkc) Modified on 10/25/2001 (Entered: 08/10/2001)
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Pretrial Conference set at 4:30 9/7/01 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (dcap)
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                  Notice of Case Reassignment to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Copy of notice mailed to Attorney(s) of record. Pursuant to the Order of Chief Judge Mukasey dated August 8, 2001, the above entitled action is reassigned to the calendar of Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for inclusion in the coordinated pretrial proceedings being conducted by that judge. Two originals of all future documents submitted in this action are to be presented in the Clerk's Office for filing. One original is to be filed in this docket number and one original is to be filed in the miscellaneous case number 21mc92 (SAS). Each shall bear the original assigned judge's ( ) initials after the original docket number. Attached is a copy of Judge Mukasey's ORDER re: coordinating the proceedings before Judge Scheindlin. Also attached is a copy of Judge Scheindlin's ORDER re: set initial PTC 09/07/01 and directing all counsel to comply with judge Scheindlin's requirements. [Original Orders docketed in 21mc92 (SAS) as documents numbers 1 and 2] (dcap) Modified on 11/13/2001 (Entered: 08/10/2001)
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/3/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Liberate Techno., Mitchell E. Kertzman, Nancy J. Hilker. (sac) Modified on 10/25/2001 (Entered: 08/06/2001)
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/2/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ben Berman, Brian Shonson, Sanjay Budhwar in opposition to [6-1] motion to appoint Karol Rose and Rio Guzman as Lead Plaintiffs in the consolidated securities class actions against Liberate Technologies, Inc. and other defendants, [6-2] motion to approve Karol Rose and Rio Guzman's selection of Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP as Lead Counsel to the class, [3-1] motion appointing the Katz's Plaintiff Group to serve as Lead Plaintiff pro tempore, [3-2] motion approving the Katz's Plaintiff Group's selection of Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP as Lead Counsel, [3-3] motion to consolidate cases 1:01-cv-04147, 1:01-cv-04281, 1:01-cv-04959, 1:01-cv-04495, 1:01-cv-05309, 1:01-cv-04212, 1:01-cv-04514. (Received in Night Box on 8/2/01 at 9:45pm) [Original filed in 01cv4147(SAS) as Doc# 18 and docketed in 01cv4212, 01cv4281, 01cv4495, 01cv4514, 01cv4959 and 01cv5309.] (dcap) Modified on 10/25/2001 (Entered: 08/20/2001)
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/2/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ben Berman, Brian Shonson, Sanjay Budhwar in support of [9-1] motion to consolidate cases 1:01-cv-04147, 1:01-cv-04212, 1:01-cv-04281, 1:01-cv-04495, 1:01-cv-04514, 1:01-cv-04959, 1:01-cv-05309, [9-2] motion to appoint Ben Berman, Brian Shonson and Sanjay Budhwar as Lead Plaintiff, [9-3] motion to approve Ben Berman, Brian Shonson and Sanjay Budhwar's selection of the law frims fo Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP and Bernstein Liebhard & Lifshitz, LLP to serve as Lead Counsel. (Received in Night Box on 8/2/01 at 9:45pm) [Original filed in 01cv4147(SAS) as Doc# 18 and docketed to 01cv4214, 01cv4281, 01cv4495, 01cv4514, 01cv4959 and 01cv5309.] (dcap) Modified on 10/25/2001 (Entered: 08/20/2001)
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/2/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          KATZ LEAD PLAINTIFF GROUP'S response to competing motions for appoinmemnt of lead counsel. (pl) Modified on 10/25/2001 (Entered: 08/07/2001)
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/2/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Karol Rose, Rio Guzman in further support of [6-1] motion to appoint Karol Rose and Rio Guzman as Lead Plaintiffs in the consolidated securities class actions against Liberate Technologies, Inc. and other defendants, [6-2] motion to approve Karol Rose and Rio Guzman's selection of Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP as Lead Counsel to the class . (pl) Modified on 10/25/2001 (Entered: 08/07/2001)
                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/31/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              STIPULATION and ORDER; defendants' time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the complaint in this action is extended through and including the later of sixty days after (i) the assignment of lead plaintiffs' counsel; or (ii) the filing of an amended complaint in this action ; (signed by Chief Judge Michael B. Mukasey ) (djc) (Entered: 08/01/2001)
                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/16/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                DECLARATION of Samuel H. Rudman by Ben Berman, Brian Shonson, Sanjay Budhwar in support Re: [9-1] motion to consolidate cases 1:01-cv-04147, 1:01-cv-04212, 1:01-cv-04281, 1:01-cv-04495, 1:01-cv-04514, 1:01-cv-04959, 1:01-cv-05309, [9-2] motion to appoint Ben Berman, Brian Shonson and Sanjay Budhwar as Lead Plaintiff, [9-3] motion to approve Ben Berman, Brian Shonson and Sanjay Budhwar's selection of the law frims fo Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP and Bernstein Liebhard & Lifshitz, LLP to serve as Lead Counsel. [Received in the Night Deposit Box on 07-16-01 at 11:27 PM] [Original filed in 1:01-cv-04147 Document No. 11. Docketed in 1:01-cv-04212, 1:01-cv-04281, 1:01-cv-04495, 1:01-cv-04514, 1:01-cv-04959, 1:01-cv-05309] (dcap) (Entered: 07/26/2001)
                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/16/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ben Berman, Brian Shonson, Sanjay Budhwar in support of [9-1] motion to consolidate cases 1:01-cv-04147, 1:01-cv-04212, 1:01-cv-04281, 1:01-cv-04495, 1:01-cv-04514, 1:01-cv-04959, 1:01-cv-05309, [9-2] motion to appoint Ben Berman, Brian Shonson and Sanjay Budhwar as Lead Plaintiff, [9-3] motion to approve Ben Berman, Brian Shonson and Sanjay Budhwar's selection of the law frims fo Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP and Bernstein Liebhard & Lifshitz, LLP to serve as Lead Counsel. [Received in the Night Deposit Box on 07-16-01 at 11:27 PM] [Original filed in 1:01-cv-04147 Document No. 10. Docketed in 1:01-cv-04212, 1:01-cv-04281, 1:01-cv-04495, 1:01-cv-04514, 1:01-cv-04959, 1:01-cv-05309] (dcap) (Entered: 07/26/2001)
                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/16/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION by Ben Berman, Brian Shonson, Sanjay Budhwar to consolidate cases 1:01-cv-04147, 1:01-cv-04212, 1:01-cv-04281, 1:01-cv-04495, 1:01-cv-04514, 1:01-cv-04959, 1:01-cv-05309, and to appoint Ben Berman, Brian Shonson and Sanjay Budhwar as Lead Plaintiff, and to approve Ben Berman, Brian Shonson and Sanjay Budhwar's selection of the law frims fo Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP and Bernstein Liebhard & Lifshitz, LLP to serve as Lead Counsel . No Return Date. [Received in the Night Deposit Box on 07-16-01 at 11:27 PM] [Original filed in 1:01-cv-04147 Document No. 9. Docketed in 1:01-cv-04212; 1:01-cv-04281; 1:01-cv-04495; 1:01-cv-04514; 1:01-cv-04959; 1:01-cv-05309] (dcap) Modified on 07/26/2001 (Entered: 07/26/2001)
                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/16/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Thomas H. Burt by Karol Rose, Rio Guzman in support of [6-1] motion to appoint Karol Rose and Rio Guzman as Lead Plaintiffs in the consolidated securities class actions against Liberate Technologies, Inc. and other defendants, [6-2] motion to approve Karol Rose and Rio Guzman's selection of Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP as Lead Counsel to the class. [Received in the Night Deposit Box on 07-16-01 at 8:39 PM] [Original filed in 1:01-cv-04147 Document No. 8. Docketed in 1:01-cv-04281; 1:01-cv-04959; 1:01-cv-04495; 1:01-cv-05309; 1:01-cv-04212; 1:01-cv-04514] (dcap) (Entered: 07/26/2001)
                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/16/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Karol Rose, Rio Guzman in support of [6-1] motion to appoint Karol Rose and Rio Guzman as Lead Plaintiffs in the consolidated securities class actions against Liberate Technologies, and other defendants, [6-2] motion to approve Karol Rose and Rio Guzman's selection of Schiffrin Barroway, LLP as Lead Counsel to the class. [Received in the Night Deposit Box on 07-16-01 at 8:39 PM] [Original filed in 1:01-cv-04147 Document No. 7. Docketed in 1:01-cv-04281; 1:01-cv-04959; 1:01-cv-04495; 1:01-cv-05309; 1:01-cv-04212; 1:01-cv-04514] (dcap) (Entered: 07/26/2001)
                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/16/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION by Karol Rose, Rio Guzman to appoint Karol Rose and Rio Guzman as Lead Plaintiffs in the consolidated securities class actions against Liberate Technologies, Inc. and other defendants, and to approve Karol Rose and Rio Guzman's selection of Schiffrin & Barroway, LLP as Lead Counsel to the class . No Return Date. [Received in the Night Deposit Box on 07-16-01 at 8:39 PM] [Original filed in 1:01-cv-04147 Document No. 6. Docketed in 1:01-cv-04281; 1:01-cv-04959; 1:01-cv-04495; 1:01-cv-05309; 1:01-cv-04212; 1:01-cv-04514] (dcap) (Entered: 07/26/2001)
                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/16/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Thomas H. Burt by Susan Katz in support Re: [3-1] motion appointing the Katz's Plaintiff Group to serve as Lead Plaintiff pro tempore, [3-2] motion approving the Katz's Plaintiff Group's selection of Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP as Lead Counsel, [3-3] motion to consolidate cases 1:01-cv-04147, 1:01-cv-04281, 1:01-cv-04959, 1:01-cv-04495, 1:01-cv-05309, 1:01-cv-04212, 1:01-cv-04514. [Original filed in 1:01-cv-04147 Document No. 5. Docketed in 1:01-cv-04281, 1:01-cv-04959, 1:01-cv-04495, 1:01-cv-05309, 1:01-cv-04212, 1:01-cv-04514] (dcap) Modified on 07/26/2001 (Entered: 07/26/2001)
                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/16/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Susan Katz in support of [3-1] motion appointing the Katz's Plaintiff Group to serve as Lead Plaintiff pro tempore, [3-2] motion approving the Katz's Plaintiff Group's selection of Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP as Lead Counsel, [3-3] motion to consolidate cases 1:01-cv-04147, 1:01-cv-04281, 1:01-cv-04959, 1:01-cv-04495, 1:01-cv-05309, 1:01-cv-04212, 1:01-cv-04514. [Original filed in 1:01-cv-04147 Document No. 4. Docketed in 1:01-cv-04281, 1:01-cv-04959, 1:01-cv-04495, 1:01-cv-05309, 1:01-cv-04212, 1:01-cv-04514] (dcap) Modified on 10/25/2001 (Entered: 07/26/2001)
                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/16/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION by Susan Katz appointing the Katz's Plaintiff Group to serve as Lead Plaintiff pro tempore, and approving the Katz's Plaintiff Group's selection of Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP as Lead Counsel, and to consolidate cases 1:01-cv-04147, 1:01-cv-04281, 1:01-cv-04959, 1:01-cv-04495, 1:01-cv-05309, 1:01-cv-04212, 1:01-cv-04514 . No Return Date. [Original Filed in 1:01-cv-04147 Document No. 3. Docketed in 1:01-cv-04281; 1:01-cv-04959; 1:01-cv-04495; 1:01-cv-05309; 1:01-cv-04212; 1:01-cv-04514] (dcap) (Entered: 07/26/2001)
                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/6/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint as to Nancy J. Hilker by Wendi Okun, in-house counsel, on 5/22/01. (sac) (Entered: 07/10/2001)
                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/16/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. (tp)
                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/16/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 405909. (tp) (Entered: 05/17/2001)
                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?