City of Fitchburg v. Purdue Pharma L.P.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-12580
Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 4, 2019 at 2:09 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo City of Fitchburg, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bonsignore & Brewer

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert J. Bonsignore +1 781 391 9400 +1 781 391 9496 rbonsignore@bandblaw.net
v.
No Logo ACTAVIS LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY JEFF GOLDMAN +1 617 951 8000 jeff.goldman@morganlewis.com
No Logo Actavis Pharma, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY JEFF GOLDMAN +1 617 951 8000 jeff.goldman@morganlewis.com
No Logo Actavis Inc., Defendant
Allergan PLC Allergan PLC, Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pierce, Atwood LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark B. Rosen +1 603 373 2015 mrosen@pierceatwood.com
Cardinal Health, Inc. Cardinal Health, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Alison M. Newman +1 202 434 5354 anewman@wc.com
No Logo Cephalon, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Acusphere, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY JEFF GOLDMAN +1 617 951 8000 jeff.goldman@morganlewis.com
No Logo CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, Defendant
No Logo Doe Defendants, Defendant
No Logo Endo Health Solutions Inc., Defendant
No Logo Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Fathalla Mashali, Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc. Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Holland & Knight, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Deborah E. Barnard +1 617 523 2700 +1 617 523 6850 deborah.barnard@hklaw.com
Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Johnson & Johnson, Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC Mallinckrodt LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY BRIEN T. O'CONNOR +1 617 951 7000 +1 617 951 7050 Brien.O'Connor@ropesgray.com
McKesson Corporation McKesson Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Covington

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Geoffrey E Hobart +1 202 662 6000 +1 202 662 5281 ghobart@cov.com
Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
PURDUE PHARMA, INC. PURDUE PHARMA, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Timothy C. Blank +1 617 728 7100 +1 617 426 6567 timothy.blank@dechert.com
Purdue Pharma LP Purdue Pharma LP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Timothy C. Blank +1 617 728 7100 +1 617 426 6567 timothy.blank@dechert.com
No Logo RITE AID OF MARYLAND, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Caitlin M. Snydacker +1 617 951 8572 caitlin.snydacker@morganlewis.com
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY JEFF GOLDMAN +1 617 951 8000 jeff.goldman@morganlewis.com
No Logo THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Timothy C. Blank +1 617 728 7100 +1 617 426 6567 timothy.blank@dechert.com
No Logo Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dunbar Law PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Ronald William Dunbar +1 617 244 3550 +1 617 244 6363 dunbar@dunbarlawpc.com
Wal-mart, Inc. Wal-mart, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Watson Laboratories, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY JEFF GOLDMAN +1 617 951 8000 jeff.goldman@morganlewis.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: None Order on motion for extension of time
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by email (McKillop, Matthew) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Leo T. Sorokin assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AmerisourceBergen Corporation identifying Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation for AmerisourceBergen Corporation.. (Rosen, Mark) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AmerisourceBergen Corporation ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7456187 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Service of Process, # 2 Declaration of Mark B. Rosen i/s/o Notice of Removal, # 3 Exhibit A to Rosen Dec. - Mashali Consent, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Category Form)(Rosen, Mark) (Entered: 12/14/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 23 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?