iPrint Tech. IPO v. IPrint.com, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-05365
District Judge Shira A. Scheindlin, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 5, 2019 at 12:42 AM EST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Alfred Boeckli, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Sandy A Liebhard +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 liebhard@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Patrick Praesel, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
v.
Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Fleetboston Robertson Stephens Inc., Defendant
No Logo Iprint.com, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Leader & Berkon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Gloria E. Koo +1 212 486 2400 +1 212 486 3099 gkoo@leaderberkon.com
No Logo James P. McCormick, Defendant
No Logo Robertson Stephens, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Brendan Joseph Dowd +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 bdowd@omm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew Jay Frackman +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 afrackman@omm.com
No Logo Royal P. Farros, Defendant
U.S. Bancorp Piper Jaffray, Inc. U.S. Bancorp Piper Jaffray, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Dean M. Jeske +1 312 832 4500 +1 312 832 4700 djeske@foley.com
No Logo Abraham Garfinkel, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Kenneth A. Elan +1 212 619 0261 +1 212 385 2707 elanfirm@yahoo.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph P. Garland +1 914 912 7858 +1 212 213 1816 joe.JPGarland@Gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Menachem E. Lifshitz +1 212 779 1414 lifshitz@bernlieb.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph R. Seidman +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 seidman@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Klein & Solomon

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Jay B. Solomon +1 212 661 9400 +1 212 661 6606 jay@kleinsolomon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Klein & Solomon, Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Edward E. Klein +1 212 661 9400

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Mel Urbach

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Mel Urbach +1 201 395 4709
No Logo Jeanne Rich, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Gustavo Fabian Bruckner +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 gfBruckner@pomlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Frederick Taylor Isquith, Sr +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653 isquith@whafh.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Gregory Mark Nespole +1 212 545 4657 +1 212 545 4693 nespole@whafh.com
No Logo Lisa Stoshak, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Peter Edward Seidman +1 212 613 5625 +1 212 868 1229 pseidman@milberg.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Robert C. Smith, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Sandy A Liebhard +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 liebhard@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Todd Simon, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Menachem E. Lifshitz +1 212 779 1414 lifshitz@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Egleston Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Gregory Michael Egleston +1 212 683 3400 +1 212 683 3402 greg.egleston@gmail.com
No Logo J.P. Morgan Chase, Consolidated Defendant
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 77
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/17/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT settling action. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/24/09) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Right to Appeal)(dt) (Entered: 12/17/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    STIPULATION AND ORDER that the Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement with defendant Issuers and Individuals submitted to the Court on 6/10/4, is hereby terminated purs to Paragraph 39 of the Proposed Partial Settlement. However, purs to paragraph 40 of the Proposed Partial Settlement, that paragraph, and the paragraphs referred to therein, shall survive the termination of the Proposed Partial Settlement. This Stipulation resolves (5527) Motion to Approve of Class action settlement. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this motion. This document relates to: All cases listed on Schedule I. (orig fld in 21mc92, #5620). (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/25/07) (cd)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ANSWER to Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. Related document: 19 Amended Complaint filed by Alfred Boeckli, Robert C. Smith, Patrick Praesel.(sac, ) (Entered: 03/29/2004)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/23/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      ANSWER by US Bancorp Piper to [19-1] amended complaint . (Attorney Dean M. Jeske from the Firm: Foley & Lardner). (sac) (Entered: 09/22/2003)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ANSWER by Robertson Stephens to [19-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Brendan Joseph Dowd from the O'Melveny & Myers, LLP)... rec'd in the night deposit box on 7/21/03 at 7:28 p.m. (sac) (Entered: 08/20/2003)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/30/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to James P. McCormick by Jeannie Terrill, co-worker, on 4/26/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/25/2002)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/23/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            NOTICE of Change of Address by IPrint.com, Inc. for counsel of record; Firm: Leader & Berkon, LLP, 630 Third Ave.; N.Y. 10017. (sac) (Entered: 07/24/2002)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to US Bancorp Piper by Patrice Blaeser, managing agent, on 4/29/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/23/2002)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Fleet Boston by Stephen Austin, Managing Agent on 4/26/02. (gf) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  MASTER ALLEGATIONS by Alfred Boeckli, Robert C. Smith, Patrick Praesel RE: Amended Complaint, doc.# 19, Filed on April 19, 2002. (ac)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    AMENDED COMPLAINT by Alfred Boeckli, Robert C. Smith, Patrick Praesel amending [1-1] complaint ; Summons issued. (ac) (Entered: 07/12/2002)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      OMNIBUS ORDER, Alfred Boeckli is hereby appointed as lead pltff and his selection of the Executive Committee to serve as Lead Counsel is approved. All other motions to be appointed lead pltff and for approval of lead counsel are hereby denied. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (orig. doc. filed in 21 mc 92, doc. #4319) (sac)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Robertson Stephens. (sac) (Entered: 02/06/2002)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/30/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Class Action Complaint as to James P. McCormick by Jane "Andrea" Doe on 9/9/01. Answer due on 10/1/01 for James P. McCormick. (kkc) (Entered: 10/31/2001)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/30/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Class Action Complaint as to Royal P. Farros by Jane "Andrea" Doe on 9/9/01. Answer due on 10/1/01 for Royal P. Farros. (kkc) (Entered: 10/31/2001)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/30/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Class Action Complaint as to IPrint.com, Inc. by Jane "Andrea" Doe on 9/9/01. Answer due on 10/1/01 for IPrint.com, Inc. (kkc) (Entered: 10/31/2001)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/25/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                STIPULATION and ORDER: the defts' time to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this action is extended through and including the later of 45 days after (I) the assignment of lead pltfs' counsel; or (II) the filing of an amended complaint in this action. (signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin) (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/09/2001)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/24/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by pltf Abraham Garfinkel. (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/09/2001)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by deft J.P. Morgan Chase. (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/09/2001)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by deft Credit Suisse First. (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/09/2001)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/20/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons returned executed as to IPrint.com, Inc., and Royal P. Farros mailed on 7/23/01. Answer due on 9/21/01 for IPrint.com, Inc., for Royal P. Farros. (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/09/2001)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by pltf Lisa Stoshak on whose behalf Brodsky & Smith, LLC. (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/09/2001)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/6/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by deft Credit Suisse First. (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/09/2001)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Consolidated Lead Case. (dcap)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                ORDER,... that all cases involving Iprint in this IPO Securities Litigation, as set forth in the attached Rider (1:01-cv-05619, 1:01-cv-05747, 1:01-cv-07428 and 1:01-cv-07550) shall be consolidated into case number 01 Civ. 5365. The Clerk of Court is hereby ordered to consolidate any future cases that are designated as related to 01 Civ. 5365,... the Clerk of Court is further ordered to close all cases that have been consolidated, subject to re-opening at a later date on proper application by a party ... ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. [Original filed in 1:01-cv-05365 Document No. 7. Document Docketed in 1:01-cv-05619; 1:01-cv-05747; 1:01-cv-07428; 1:01-cv-07550] (dcap) Modified on 09/27/2001 (Entered: 09/27/2001)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Alfred Boeckli, Robert C. Smith in support of [4-1] motion to consolidate cases 01cv5365(SAS) and 01cv5747, [4-2] motion appointing Movants to serve as lead plaintiffs, [4-3] motion approving Movants' selection of counsel for the Class. (Received in Night Box on 8/13/01 at 6:47pm) [Original filed in 01cv5365(SAS) as Doc# 6 and docketed to 01cv5747.] (dcap) (Entered: 08/21/2001)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Michael S. Egan, Esq. by Alfred Boeckli, Robert C. Smith in support of [4-1] motion to consolidate cases 01cv5365(SAS) and 01cv5747, [4-2] motion appointing Movants to serve as lead plaintiffs, [4-3] motion approving Movants' selection of counsel for the Class. (Received in Night Box on 8/13/01 at 6:48pm) [Original filed in 01cv5365(SAS) as Doc# 5 and docketed to 01cv5747.] (dcap) (Entered: 08/21/2001)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/13/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) by Alfred Boeckli, Robert C. Smith to consolidate cases 01cv5365(SAS) and 01cv5747, appointing Movants to serve as lead plaintiffs and approving Movants' selection of counsel for the Class . No return date indicated. (Received in Night Box on 8/13/01 at 6:47pm) [Original filed in 01cv5365(SAS) as Doc# 4 and docketed to 01cv5747.] (dcap) (Entered: 08/21/2001)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Pretrial Conference set at 4:30 9/7/01 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (dcap)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          Notice of Case Reassignment to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Copy of notice mailed to Attorney(s) of record. Pursuant to the Order of Chief Judge Mukasey dated August 8, 2001, the above entitled action is reassinged to the calendar of Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for inclusion in the coordinated pretrial proceedings being conducted by that judge. Two originals of all future documents submitted in this action are to be presented in the Clerk's Office for filing. One original is to be filed in this docket number and one original is to be filed in the miscellaneous case number 21mc92 (SAS). Each shall bear the original assigned judge's ( ) initials after the original docket number. Attached is a copy of Judge Mukasey's ORDER re: coordinating the proceedings before Judge Scheindlin. Also attached is a copy of Judge Scheindlin's ORDER re: set initial PTC 09/07/01 and directing all counsel to comply with Judge Scheindlin's requirements. [Original Orders docketed in 21mc92 (SAS) as documents numbers 1 and 2] (dcap) Modified on 10/31/2001 (Entered: 08/10/2001)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons & Complait returned executed as to Credit Suisse First mailed on 6/25/01. Answer due on 8/24/01 for Credit Suisse First. (sac) (Entered: 07/20/2001)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/13/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Magistrate Judge Frank Maas is so designated. (jco)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/13/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 408729. (jco) (Entered: 06/14/2001)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 6 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?