United States v. Geniu Abreu
Criminal Case Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:18-cr-10196
District Judge Richard G. Stearns, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 4, 2019 at 7:44 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kenneth G. Shine +1 617 748 3686 +1 617 748 3954 kenneth.shine@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Vagner Geniu Abreu, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by FEDERAL DEFENDERS OF THE MD GA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Amy Barsky +1 617 223 8061 amy_barsky@fd.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Cara McNamara +1 907 646 3400 +1 907 646 3480 cara_mcnamara@fd.org

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Set Hearings as to Vagner Geniu Abreu: Rule 11 Hearing set for 12/10/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Richard G. Stearns. (Maynard, Timothy) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 25 Motion to Continue as to Vagner Geniu Abreu (1). Counsel are to reach out to the Clerk to schedule a new date. (Maynard, Timothy) (Entered: 12/05/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      MOTION to Continue UNOPPOSED MOTION TO RESCHEDULE HEARING as to Vagner Geniu Abreu. (McNamara, Cara) (Entered: 12/04/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        Judge Richard G. Stearns: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered acknowledging 22 Report and Order on Final Status Conference by Magistrate Judge as to Vagner Geniu Abreu (1): Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/6/2018 02:30 PM in Courtroom 21 before Judge Richard G. Stearns. (Maynard, Timothy) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          Case as to Vagner Geniu Abreu no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ORDER entered. REPORT IN LIEU OF FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 116.5(c) as to Vagner Geniu Abreu (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 09/21/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered as to Vagner Geniu Abreu re 20 Status Report filed by USA. In light of the status report the court cancel's the 9/20/18 final status and will send the case to the District Judge. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                STATUS REPORT FINAL by USA as to Vagner Geniu Abreu (Shine, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Amy Barsky appearing for Vagner Geniu Abreu. Type of Appearance: Federal Defender Office. (Barsky, Amy) (Entered: 09/19/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 7/9/18 as to Vagner Geniu Abreu. (Pacho, Arnold) (Entered: 08/30/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ORDER entered. SECOND ORDER ON EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Vagner Geniu Abreu. Time excluded from 8/21/18 until 9/20/18. Reason for entry of order on excludable delay: 18 USC 3161(h)(7)(A) Interests of justice. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered as to Vagner Geniu Abreu. In light of the submission, 15 status report, the Court adopts the deadlines therein, cancels the 8/21/18 initial status conference, and sets a final status conference for 9/20/2018 at 10:00 a.m. The deadline for filing Rule 12 motions shall be 9/20/18; in setting these dates, the court presumes that the parties will in the interim complete all discovery. The parties should contact the court immediately if they believe this schedule is impractical A joint final status conference memorandum addressing the issues in L.R. 116.5 (c)(1)-(3) shall be filed by cob 9.13.18. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 08/21/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          STATUS REPORT INITIAL by USA as to Vagner Geniu Abreu (Shine, Kenneth) (Entered: 08/21/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ORDER entered. INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER as to Vagner Geniu Abreu (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ORDER entered. FIRST ORDER OF EXCLUDABLE DELAY as to Vagner Geniu Abreu. Time excluded from 7/9/18 until 8/21/18. Reason for entry of order on excludable delay: 18 USC 3161(h)(7)(A) Interests of justice. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ORDER entered. ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DETENTION as to Vagner Geniu Abreu (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: Arraignment and Detention Hearing as to Vagner Geniu Abreu (1) Count 1 held on 7/13/2018. Plea entered: Not Guilty on Count 1. The def't agrees to an order of detention without prejudice. Def't remanded to the custody of the USM. (Attorneys present: Shine, McNamara. )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Digital Recording. To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov. Interpreter name: Claudia F. Azoff, Language: Portuguese. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    Set/Reset Hearings as to Vagner Geniu Abreu Arraignment and Detention Hearing set for 7/13/2018 01:00 PM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. Initial Status Conference set for 8/9/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: Initial Appearance as to Vagner Geniu Abreu (1) Count 1 held on 7/9/2018. The court informs the def't of the charges against him and his rights. The gov't states the maximum penalties. Upon review of the financial affidavit, the court finds that the def't does have some income. The court will appoint FD McNamara but will revisit if the def't is released on bail. Automatic discovery was turned over today and the court sets an initial status conference for 8/21/18 at 10:00 am. The court expects the case to be returned to Judge Stearns by mid September. Counsel requests arraignment and detention on Friday July 13, 2018 at 1:00 PM. Def't is remanded to the custody of the USM. (Attorneys present: Shine, McNamara. )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Digital Recording. To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov. Interpreter name: Claudia F. Azoff, Language: Portuguese. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING for Initial Appearance as to Vagner Geniu Abreu. Initial Appearance set for 7/9/2018 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 07/09/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Arrest of Vagner Geniu Abreu (Russo, Noreen)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            ELECTRONIC NOTICE CANCELING 7/3/2018 Initial Appearance as to Vagner Geniu Abreu. Court has been notified that defendant is unable to be transported to courthouse until 7/9/2018. Counsel to contact Judge Cabell's session for rescheduling. (Putnam, Harold) (Entered: 07/03/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING as to Vagner Geniu Abreu. Initial Appearance set for 7/3/2018 02:30 PM in Courtroom 25 before Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (Putnam, Harold) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment as to Vagner Geniu Abreu; Judge Richard G. Stearns assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  INDICTMENT as to Vagner Geniu Abreu (1) count(s) 1. (Attachments: # 1 JS45)(Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?