United States v. Orlandella
Federal Court Proceeding Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:18-mj-01444
Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 4, 2019 at 7:05 PM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Anne Paruti +1 617 748 3310 anne.paruti.lohnes@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Brian Orlandella, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY James J. Cipoletta +1 781 289 7777 +1 781 289 9468 jcipoletta@comcast.net

Toggle Switch Represented by FEDERAL DEFENDERS OF THE MD GA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 12/07/2018, LEAD ATTORNEY Stylianus Sinnis +1 617 223 8061 +1 617 223 8080 stellio_sinnis@fd.org
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 6 Motion for Release from Custody as to Brian Orlandella (1). See docket no. 13 for conditions. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ORDER entered. ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Brian Orlandella. (Attachments: # 1 Order, # 2 EM Warrant) (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Appearance Bond Entered as to Brian Orlandella in amount of $ 50,000 (unsecured). (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: Release Hearing as to Brian Orlandella held on 12/20/2018 re 6 MOTION for Release from Custody filed by Brian Orlandella. Def't grants the motion for release and releases the def't on conditions with a 50K unsecured bond. Def't released. (Attorneys present: Paruti, Cipoletta. )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Digital Recording. To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ORDER entered. ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR RELEASE FROM CUSTODY as to Brian Orlandella (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION as to Brian Orlandella 6 MOTION for Release from Custody : Release Hearing set for 12/20/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 12/14/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: Detention/Preliminary Hearings as to Brian Orlandella held on 12/7/2018; 7 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney granted by the Court (Attorney Stylianus Sinnis terminated); deft waived probable cause; proffers given re detention; parents' residence to be inspected by a probation officer; 6 Defendant's Motion for Release from Custody and the issue of detention as whole taken under advisement by the Court; deft remanded to custody of the USM. (Attorneys present: ASUA Paruti for the Gov't; Cipoletta for the deft. ) (USPO: A. Berry)Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Digital Recording. To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov. (Lovett, Jarrett) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney as to Brian Orlandella. (Sinnis, Stylianus) (Entered: 12/06/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  MOTION for Release from Custody as to Brian Orlandella. (Cipoletta, James) (Entered: 12/06/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: James J. Cipoletta appearing for Brian Orlandella. Type of Appearance: Retained. (Cipoletta, James) (Entered: 12/05/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: Initial Appearance as to Brian Orlandella held on 12/3/2018; deft advised of charges; deft verified review of the complaint; deft advised of minimum and maximum penalties; deft advised of right to counsel; deft's financial affidavit filed; Court appointed Stellio Sinnis for purposes of this hearing pending further review of the financial affidavit; deft advised of Constitutional Rights; deft advised of rights to detention and probable cause hearings; Govt's request for detention and a continuance allowed by the Court; Detention/Probable Cause Hearings set for 12/7/2018 11:00 AM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell; deft remanded to custody of USM. (Attorneys present: AUSA Paruti for the Gov't; Sinnis for the deft) (USPO: A. Berry)Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Digital Recording. To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please go to http://www.mad.uscourts.gov/attorneys/Magistrate-Audio.htm . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov. (Lovett, Jarrett) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Arrest on Probable Cause of Brian Orlandella (Lovett, Jarrett)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment as to Brian Orlandella; Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. (Garvin, Brendan) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            COMPLAINT as to Brian Orlandella (1). (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 JS45)(Garvin, Brendan) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 4 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?