Harris v. Southwestern Corrections
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Western District Court, Case No. 6:18-cv-00357
District Judge Alan D. Albright, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 5, 2019 at 1:03 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Rodrick Eugene Harris, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by #89712

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rodrick Eugene Harris
v.
No Logo Capt. FNU Hicks, Defendant
No Logo LaSalle Corrections Medical Department, Defendant
No Logo Nurse P Cates, Defendant
No Logo Nurse Doe 1, Defendant
No Logo Nurse Doe 2, Defendant
No Logo Southwestern Corrections, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Order for More Definite Statement
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None
      Case Opening Letter. (lad) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Complaint
        COMPLAINT, filed by Rodrick Eugene Harris.(lad) (Entered: 12/07/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 6 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?