Addax Energy SA v. M/V Yasa H. Mulla
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 18-2438

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 5, 2019 at 5:45 AM ST (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 4120 - Marine Contract Actions
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by Addax Energy SA. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000417215] [18-2438] Steven Stancliff [Entered: 12/07/2018 08:30 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Steven M. Stancliff for Addax Energy SA. [1000417049] [18-2438] Steven Stancliff [Entered: 12/06/2018 04:58 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE ISSUED to Addax Energy SA requesting response to Motion for stay pending appeal [6]Response due: 12/07/2018, 1:00 PM.[1000416204]. [18-2438] TF [Entered: 12/06/2018 09:52 AM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        MOTION by M/V Yasa H. Mulla for stay pending appeal.. Date and method of service: 12/05/2018 ecf. [1000415879] [18-2438] James Power [Entered: 12/05/2018 03:59 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS by M/V Yasa H. Mulla. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [1000415877] [18-2438] James Power [Entered: 12/05/2018 03:42 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by Marie E. Larsen for M/V Yasa H. Mulla. [1000415874] [18-2438] Marie Larsen [Entered: 12/05/2018 03:31 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL by James H. Power for M/V Yasa H. Mulla. [1000415873] [18-2438] James Power [Entered: 12/05/2018 03:27 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case Originating case number: 2:17-cv-00641-HCM-DEM. Mailed to: Walz. [18-2438] TF [Entered: 12/03/2018 12:15 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:17-cv-00641-HCM-DEM. Case manager: TFischer. [18-2438] TF [Entered: 12/03/2018 11:50 AM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 9 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?