Edwards v. Fischer
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Western District Court, Case No. 6:18-cv-06851
District Judge Charles J. Siragusa, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 5, 2019 at 7:03 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo William Edwards, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by 14-A-2670

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Edwards
v.
No Logo Anthony J. Annucci, Defendant
No Logo B. Flagler, Defendant
No Logo Brian Fischer, Defendant
No Logo Captain John Doe, Defendant
No Logo David Unger, Defendant
No Logo Diane Ives, Defendant
No Logo Donald Selsky, Defendant
No Logo Donald Venettozzi, Defendant
No Logo IRC Jane Doe, Defendant
No Logo Justin J. Thomas, Defendant
No Logo Mr. Albert Prack, Defendant
No Logo S. Baker, Defendant
No Logo S. Kloc, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Plaintiff requested a copy of his docket, mailed to plaintiff at Collins CF. (TF)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. Consent form, privacy notice and civil case timeline mailed to plaintiff. (TF)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by William Edwards.(TF) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by William Edwards.(TF) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 3 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?