United States v. Lusby
Criminal Case Maryland District Court, Case No. 8:18-cr-00604
District Judge Theodore D. Chuang, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 5, 2019 at 7:54 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Gregory Bernstein +1 301 344 0862 +1 301 344 4516 gregory.bernstein@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jessica C. Collins +1 202 308 6451 jessica.collins@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Matthew Joseph Lusby, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by FEDERAL DEFENDERS OF THE MD GA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael T Citaramanis +1 301 344 0600 +1 301 344 0019 michael_citaramanis@fd.org

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Consent MOTION to Exclude Time Pursuant to the Speedy Trial Computation by USA as to Matthew Joseph Lusby. (Bernstein, Gregory) (Entered: 01/04/2019)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    PAPERLESS NOTICE OF HEARING by U.S. Attorney's Office as to Matthew Joseph Lusby. PLEASE NOTE: Defendant is in custody. A writ has not been requested. A come up was requested on 1/3/2019. An interpreter will not be needed. Arraignment set for 1/14/2019 02:00 PM in Greenbelt (for specific location, refer to court website:www.mdd.uscourts.gov/calendar/calendar.asp) before Magistrate Judge Thomas M. DiGirolamo.(Bernstein, Gregory)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael T Citaramanis as Public Defender appearing for Matthew Joseph Lusby(Citaramanis, Michael) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER OF DETENTION as to Matthew Joseph Lusby Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. DiGirolamo on 12/14/2018 (mtds, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/14/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          Detention Hearing as to Matthew Joseph Lusby held on 12/14/2018 before Magistrate Judge Thomas M. DiGirolamo (FTR - Diaz 1A) (mtds, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/14/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            Motion and Order to Unseal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. DiGirolamo on 12/11/2018. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Matthew Joseph Lusby. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. DiGirolamo on 12/11/2018. (ts2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Matthew Joseph Lusby. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. DiGirolamo on 12/11/2018. (ts2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Matthew Joseph Lusby (ts2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    Initial Appearance as to Matthew Joseph Lusby (Defendant informed of Rights.) held on 12/11/2018 before Magistrate Judge Thomas M. DiGirolamo.(FTR - Singletary - 1A) (ts2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      MOTION and ORDER to Seal Case as to Matthew Joseph Lusby. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. DiGirolamo on 12/10/2018. (km4s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        SEALED INDICTMENT as to Matthew Joseph Lusby (1) count(s) 1. (km4s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/11/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 5 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?