C.D. v. Natick Public School District
Appeal Court of Appeals for the First Circuit, Case No. 18-1794

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 5, 2019 at 5:11 PM EST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo C.D., by and throught her Parents and Next Friends, M.D. and P.D., Plaintiff - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 508-964-6664

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR NTC Retained, COR NTC Retained, COR NTC Retained Laurie R. Martucci +1 508 964 6665

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 617-720-2626

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR NTC Retained, COR NTC Retained, COR NTC Retained Benjamin J. Wish +1 617 227 5777
No Logo M.D., Plaintiff - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 508-964-6664

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR NTC Retained, COR NTC Retained, COR NTC Retained Laurie R. Martucci +1 508 964 6665

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 617-720-2626

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR NTC Retained, COR NTC Retained, COR NTC Retained Benjamin J. Wish +1 617 227 5777
No Logo P.D., Plaintiff - Appellant

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 508-964-6664

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR NTC Retained, COR NTC Retained, COR NTC Retained Laurie R. Martucci +1 508 964 6665

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 617-720-2626

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR NTC Retained, COR NTC Retained, COR NTC Retained Benjamin J. Wish +1 617 227 5777
No Logo MA BUREAU OF SPECIAL EDUCATION APPEALS, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 617-727-5785

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
NTC Government - Other Iraida J. Alvarez

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 617-963-2022

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
COR NTC Government - Other Anna Rachel Dray-Siegel

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 617-963-2559

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
NTC Government - Other Julia Eleanor Kobick
No Logo NATICK PUBLIC SCHOOL DISTRICT, Defendant - Appellee

Toggle Switch Represented by Direct: 617-479-5000

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
NTC Retained Doris Regina MacKenzi Ehrens +1 617 479 6469
COR NTC Retained Felicia S. Vasudevan, Attorney +1 617 479 6469
Nature of Suit 3448 - Civil Rights
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107375333 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BRIEF tendered by Appellants C.D., P.D. and M.D.. [18-1794] (BJW) [Entered: 12/10/2018 04:27 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    PLEADING tendered: APPENDIX filed by Appellants C.D., M.D. and P.D. Number of Copies: 5. Number of Volumes: 6. Certificate of service dated 12/10/2018. [18-1794] (AMM) [Entered: 12/10/2018 04:20 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107361969 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      ORDER entered: Upon consideration of motion, it is ordered that the time for Plaintiffs-Appellants C.D., M.D., and P.D. to file a brief and appendix be enlarged to and including December 10, 2018. The time for filing Defendants-Appellees MA Bureau of Special Education Appeals and Natick Public School District's briefs shall then run in accordance with Fed. R. App. P. 31(a). Since the time for Appellees' briefs are not yet set, the request to extend Appellees' brief deadline is denied without prejudice subject to renewal. [18-1794] (GRC) [Entered: 11/05/2018 05:08 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107361410 Filed: 11/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        JOINT MOTION to extend time to file brief and appendix to extend time to file a response filed by Appellants C.D., M.D., P.D. and Appellees MA Bureau of Special Education Appeals and Natick Public School District. Certificate of service dated 11/04/2018. [18-1794] (LRM) [Entered: 11/04/2018 11:26 AM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107353139 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          BRIEFING schedule set. Brief and appendix due 11/26/2018 for appellant C.D., M.D. and P.D.. Pursuant to F.R.A.P. 31(a), appellee's brief will be due 30 days following service of appellant's brief and appellant's reply brief will be due 14 days following service of appellee's brief. [18-1794] (GRC) [Entered: 10/17/2018 02:10 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            NOTICE of filing the following transcript(s) in district court by Court Reporter Valerie A. O'Hara: 07/11/2018. In accordance with Judicial Conference Policy, the transcript will not be available to the public by remote electronic access for ninety days after the filing date. During that ninety day period, the transcript may be purchased through the court reporter or viewed at the public terminal at the district court. [18-1794] (GRC) [Entered: 09/24/2018 03:01 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107336794 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              TRANSCRIPT ordered: 07/11/2018. Transcript(s) due 11/09/2018 from Court Reporter Valerie A. O'Hara [18-1794] (ZN) [Entered: 09/10/2018 02:22 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107336254 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants C.D., M.D. and P.D. filed by Attorney Benjamin J. Wish. Certificate of service dated 09/07/2018. [18-1794] (BJW) [Entered: 09/07/2018 04:21 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107335152 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  DOCKETING statement filed by Appellants C.D., M.D. and P.D.. Certificate of service dated 09/05/2018. [18-1794] (LRM) [Entered: 09/05/2018 05:44 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107335146 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    TRANSCRIPT report/order form filed by Appellants C.D., M.D. and P.D. indicating transcripts are being ordered. Certificate of service dated 09/05/2018. [18-1794] (LRM) [Entered: 09/05/2018 05:06 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107335128 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee MA Bureau of Special Education Appeals filed by Attorney Anna Rachel Dray-Siegel. Certificate of service dated 09/05/2018. [18-1794] (AD) [Entered: 09/05/2018 04:41 PM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107335005 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellants C.D., M.D. and P.D. filed by Attorney Laurie R. Martucci, Esq.. Certificate of service dated 09/05/2018. [18-1794] (LRM) [Entered: 09/05/2018 03:24 PM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107331971 Filed: 8/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          NOTICE of appearance on behalf of Appellee Natick Public School District filed by Attorney Felicia S. Vasudevan. Certificate of service dated 08/28/2018. [18-1794] (FSV) [Entered: 08/28/2018 12:47 PM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107331489 Filed: 8/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            CIVIL CASE docketed. Notice of appeal (doc. #101) filed by Appellants C.D., M.D. and P.D.. Appearance form, Docketing Statement, and Transcript Report/Order form due 09/10/2018. [18-1794] (GRC) [Entered: 08/27/2018 03:16 PM]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 19 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?