Wilson v. Turner
Federal Civil Lawsuit West Virginia Southern District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-01502
District Judge Thomas E. Johnston, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 21, 2020 at 6:26 PM DT (1 year ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Leon Wilson, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by #3546945

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Leon Wilson, Jr.
v.
No Logo C.O. Turner, Defendant
No Logo South Central Regional Jail, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/21/2020, Entered: None Order Adopting Proposed Findings and Recommendations
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/1/2020, Entered: None Proposed Findings and Recommendations by Magistrate Judge
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: None Mail Returned as Undeliverable
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: None Order Adopting Proposed Findings and Recommendations
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: None Proposed Findings and Recommendations by Magistrate Judge
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None case assigned
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None case assigned
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Court Filing
                STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (taq)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                  COMPLAINT. (Attachment: # 1 Mailing Envelope) (taq)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs
                    APPLICATION by Leon Wilson, Jr. to Proceed without Prepayment of Fees and Costs. (taq)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 5 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?