National Labor Relations Board v. Williams
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-00604
Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 7, 2019 at 2:03 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo National Labor Relations Board, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by National Labor Relations Board

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elliott Becker +1 202 273 0098 elliott.becker@nlrb.gov
v.
No Logo Rebekah Williams, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Rebekah Williams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rebekah Williams
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 160(1)
Nature of Suit 790 - Labor: Other
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
ORDER: In accordance with District Judge Simons May 22, 2018 Opinion and Order 12, Respondent Rebekah Williams is ordered, pursuant to 29 U.S.C. ยง 161(2), to comply with applicant National Labor Relations Boards Subpoena Duces Tecum B-1-YMHK2L and to produce all the documents requested therein, within 21 days of the date of entry of this order. DATED this 23rd day of May, 2018, by United States Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (copy mailed to Rebekah Williams) (peg) (Entered: 05/23/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Rebekah Williams regarding Order on Findings & Recommendation, 12 . (peg) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None Order on Findings and RecommendationCourt Filing
      ORDER - No party having made objections, this Court follows the recommendation of the Advisory Committee and reviews Judge Acosta's Findings and Recommendation for clear error on the face of the record. No such error is apparent. Accordingly, the Court ADOPTS Judge Acosta's Findings and Recommendation, ECF 10 . The Board's application (ECF 1 ) is GRANTED. Signed on 5/22/2018 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) (Entered: 05/22/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER by Judge Acosta - REFERRING Findings & Recommendation 10 regarding Complaint 1 to the Honorable Michael H. Simon for review and final determination. (copy of this entry emailed to defendant as she has not filed with the court, as requested, a "Notice of Appearance"). (peg) (Entered: 05/03/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION - The record before the court supports the reasonable inference that, since the Board issued its initial Decision and Order more than 14 months ago, Williams repeatedly has delayed providing thedocuments required. Because the documents now requested in the Subpoena are relevant and material to the Boards legitimate, pending investigation, the Boards application, (ECF No. 1), should be GRANTED. SCHEDULING ORDER: The Findings and Recommendation will be referred to a district judge. Objections, if any, are due May 18, 2018. If no objections are filed, then the Findings and Recommendation will go under advisement on that date. If objections are filed, then a response is due within 14 days after being served with a copy of the objections. When the response is due or filed, whichever date is earlier, the Findings and Recommendation will go under advisement. DATED this 3rd day of May, 2018, by United States Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (copy emailed to defendant as she has not filed a "Notice of Appearance" as requested by the court.) (peg) (Entered: 05/03/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            MINUTES of Proceedings: Telephone Status Conference held by Judge Acosta; formal order to follow. Elliott Becker, David Mori present as counsel for plaintiff. Rebekah Williams present as pro se defendant. Court Reporter: Cheryl Guthrie. (defendant sent a copy of this docket entry by email) (peg) (Entered: 05/01/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Acosta - RESETTING the Telephone Status Conference in this matter from Wednesday, April 25, 2018, at 10:00AM, Pacific Time to Tuesday, May 1, 2018, at 9:30AM. The previously provided court's call-in conference line information will remain the same for this new date and time. (peg) (Entered: 04/23/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Acosta - SETTING a Telephone Status Conference for Wednesday, April 25, 2018, at 10:00AM, Pacific Time. The court's conference line information will be sent by separate entry. (peg) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Acosta - The court STRIKES the telephone status conference set for 4/18/18 at request of defendant Ms. Williams due to a conflict. The court will set a new date and time for a status conference once the parties confer and contact the court with available dates and times. (peg) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Acosta - SETTING a Telephone Status Conference for Wednesday, April 18, 2018, at 10:00AM, Pacific Time. The court's conference line call-in information will be sent by separate entry. (peg) (Entered: 04/12/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Anna J. Brown to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (eo) (Entered: 04/10/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Anna J. Brown. (joha) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Civil Cover Sheet regarding Complaint 1 . Filed by National Labor Relations Board. (Becker, Elliott) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Complaint. Application for Subpoena Enforcement (fee exempt status selected (AUSA)) Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by National Labor Relations Board against Rebekah Williams. (Becker, Elliott) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 14 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?