Fischer v. Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Incorporated
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-01778
District Judge David G Campbell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 30, 2020 at 3:55 PM DT (1 year ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Susan Fischer, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cutter Law PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Curtis Brooks Cutter +1 916 290 9400 +1 916 588 9330 bcutter@cutterlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Todd Alan Walburg +1 510 281 5881 +1 510 488 1175 twalburg@cutterlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by cwazlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Curt William Clausen +1 602 285 4450 +1 602 285 4483 curt@cwazlaw.com
v.
Bayer Corporation Bayer Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldman Ismail Tomaselli Brennan & Baum LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew L. Goldman +1 312 881 5960 +1 312 881 5965 agoldman@goldmanismail.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jennifer L. Greenblatt +1 312 881 5949 +1 312 881 5191 jgreenblatt@goldmanismail.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Allyson M Julien +1 312 881 5968 +1 312 881 5026 ajulien@goldmanismail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Osborn Maledon, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jeffrey Bryan Molinar +1 602 640 9000 +1 602 664 2086 jmolinar@omlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph Nathaniel Roth +1 602 640 9320 +1 602 664 2051 jroth@omlaw.com
Bayer Healthcare LLC Bayer Healthcare LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldman Ismail Tomaselli Brennan & Baum LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew L. Goldman +1 312 881 5960 +1 312 881 5965 agoldman@goldmanismail.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jennifer L. Greenblatt +1 312 881 5949 +1 312 881 5191 jgreenblatt@goldmanismail.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Allyson M Julien +1 312 881 5968 +1 312 881 5026 ajulien@goldmanismail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Osborn Maledon, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jeffrey Bryan Molinar +1 602 640 9000 +1 602 664 2086 jmolinar@omlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph Nathaniel Roth +1 602 640 9320 +1 602 664 2051 jroth@omlaw.com
Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc. Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldman Ismail Tomaselli Brennan & Baum LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew L. Goldman +1 312 881 5960 +1 312 881 5965 agoldman@goldmanismail.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jennifer L. Greenblatt +1 312 881 5949 +1 312 881 5191 jgreenblatt@goldmanismail.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Allyson M Julien +1 312 881 5968 +1 312 881 5026 ajulien@goldmanismail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Osborn Maledon, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jeffrey Bryan Molinar +1 602 640 9000 +1 602 664 2086 jmolinar@omlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph Nathaniel Roth +1 602 640 9320 +1 602 664 2051 jroth@omlaw.com
No Logo Bracco Diagnostics Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Bracco Diagnostics Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker, Sterchi, Cowden & Rice, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Paul S. Penticuff +1 816 471 2121 +1 816 472 0288 penticuff@bscr-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Thomas N. Sterchi +1 816 471 2121 +1 816 472 0288 sterchi@bscr-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jones, Skelton & Hochuli, P.L.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Donn Christopher Alexander +1 602 235 7152
No Logo Guerbet LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by KENDALL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jamie Kendall +1 610 756 0200 +1 610 756 0202 jkendall@tkfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Brad Michael Welsh +1 610 756 0200 +1 610 756 0202 bwelsh@tkfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Brian W. Shaffer +1 215 963 5000 +1 215 963 5001 bshaffer@morganlewis.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Christina M. Vitale +1 713 890 5000 +1 713 890 5001 christina.vitale@morganlewis.com
No Logo Liebel-flarsheim Company LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by KENDALL LAW FIRM, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jamie Kendall +1 610 756 0200 +1 610 756 0202 jkendall@tkfirm.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Brad Michael Welsh +1 610 756 0200 +1 610 756 0202 bwelsh@tkfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Brian W. Shaffer +1 215 963 5000 +1 215 963 5001 bshaffer@morganlewis.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Christina M. Vitale +1 713 890 5000 +1 713 890 5001 christina.vitale@morganlewis.com
Mallinckrodt, Inc. Mallinckrodt, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Mallinckrodt Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Shook Harrty and Bacon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert Thomas Adams +1 816 474 6550 +1 816 421 5547 rtadams@shb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Devin Kyle Ross +1 816 559 2688 +1 816 421 5547 dkross@shb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Snell & Wilmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Patrick Xavier Fowler +1 602 382 6213 +1 602 382 6070 pfowler@swlaw.com
Mallinckrodt LLC Mallinckrodt LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Shook Harrty and Bacon LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert Thomas Adams +1 816 474 6550 +1 816 421 5547 rtadams@shb.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Devin Kyle Ross +1 816 559 2688 +1 816 421 5547 dkross@shb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Snell & Wilmer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Patrick Xavier Fowler +1 602 382 6213 +1 602 382 6070 pfowler@swlaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (73) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 4/30/2020, Entered: None USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 2/11/2020, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Withdrawal (No Longer with Firm Only)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 12/27/2019, Entered: None Transcript - Appeal
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 12/13/2019, Entered: None Transcript - Appeal
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 12/11/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 12/11/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 12/11/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 12/5/2019, Entered: None Transcript Request
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: None USCA Case Number
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: None Clerks Judgment
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 10/25/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 10/22/2019, Entered: None Notice of Change of Address/Firm Name (Attorney)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 10/4/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion for Summary Judgment
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 9/20/2019, Entered: None Transcript Request
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 8/29/2019, Entered: None Telephone Conference
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 8/28/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 8/2/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal Document
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 8/2/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 8/2/2019, Entered: None Notice of Attorney Withdrawal (No Longer with Firm Only)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 8/1/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 8/1/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: None Transcript
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Guerbet LLC, Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC. (Kendall, Jamie) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Remark: Pro hac vice motions granted for Devin K Ross and Robert T Adams on behalf of Mallinckrodt Incorporated and Mallinckrodt LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Mallinckrodt Incorporated, Mallinckrodt LLC. (Fowler, Patrick) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Bracco Diagnostics Incorporated. (Alexander, Donn) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Bayer Corporation, Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Incorporated. (Molinar, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/07/2018)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      STIPULATION by Bayer Corporation, Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Protective Order)(Molinar, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/06/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Remark: Pro hac vice motions granted for Allyson M Julien, Andrew L Goldman and Jennifer Greenblatt on behalf of Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Incorporated, Bayer Corporation, and Bayer HealthCare LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for C Brooks Cutter on behalf of plaintiff. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Remark: Pro hac vice motions granted for Thomas N Sterchi and Paul S Penticuff on behalf of Bracco Diagnostics Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 terminating 31 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Attorney notified that pro hac motion incorrectly filed into civil case without fee payment and to refile in pro hac master case. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Thomas N. Sterchi by Bracco Diagnostics Incorporated. (Sterchi, Thomas) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/22/2018, Entered: None Service Executed
                                                                                  SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Susan Fischer: Proof of Service re: Complaint, Summons, Notice to Parties MIDP, CMO, Cover Sheet upon Liebel-Flarsheim Company, LLC on 07/31/2018. (Walburg, Todd) (Entered: 08/22/2018)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                    *Corporate Disclosure Statement by Guerbet LLC, Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent Guerbet SA for Guerbet LLC and Liebel-Flarsheim Company Ireland Limited Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC. (Vitale, Christina) *Modified to correct/add corporate parties on 8/20/2018 (EJA). (Entered: 08/17/2018)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                      ANSWER to 10 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Guerbet LLC, Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC.(Vitale, Christina) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Brian W Shaffer on behalf of defendants Guerbet LLC and Leibel-Flarsheim Company LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Remark: Pro hac vice motions granted for Brad Welsh and Jamie Kendall on behalf of defendants Guerbet LLC and Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/13/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel
                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Marie Vitale on behalf of Guerbet LLC, Liebel-Flarsheim Company LLC. (Vitale, Christina) (Entered: 08/13/2018)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                              Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mallinckrodt Incorporated, Mallinckrodt LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mallinckrodt PLC for Mallinckrodt Incorporated, Mallinckrodt LLC. (Fowler, Patrick) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                Defendants Mallinckrodt Inc. and Mallinckrodt LLC's ANSWER to 10 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Mallinckrodt Incorporated, Mallinckrodt LLC.(Fowler, Patrick) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                  *Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals (Molinar, Jeffrey) *Modified to remove filers on 8/9/2018 (KAS). (Entered: 08/08/2018)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                    *Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Incorporated identifying Shering Berlin Incorporated, Bayer HealthCare Holdings LLC, Bayer Corporation, Bayer US Holding LP, Bayer World Investments BV, Bayer Solution and Bayer AG as corporate affiliates. (Molinar, Jeffrey) *Modified to remove filers and add corporate affiliates on 8/9/2018 (KAS). (Entered: 08/08/2018)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                      *Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bayer Corporation identifying Bayer US Holding LP, Bayer World Investments BV, Bayer World Investments BV, and Bayer AG as corporate affiliates. (Molinar, Jeffrey) *Modified to remove filers and add corporate affiliates on 8/9/2018 (KAS). (Entered: 08/08/2018)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Answer to amended complaint
                                                                                                        Joint ANSWER to 10 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Bayer Corporation, Bayer HealthCare LLC, Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Incorporated.(Molinar, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                          Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bracco Diagnostics Incorporated. (Alexander, Donn) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                            ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Bracco Diagnostics Incorporated.(Alexander, Donn) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Service Executed
                                                                                                              SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Susan Fischer: Proof of Service re: Complaint, Summons, Notice to Parties MIDP, CMO, Cover Sheet upon Malinckrodt, LLC on 07/18/2018. (Walburg, Todd) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Service Executed
                                                                                                                SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Susan Fischer: Proof of Service re: Complaint, Summons, Notice to Parties MIDP, CMO, Cover Sheet upon Malinckrodt, Inc on 07/18/2018. (Walburg, Todd) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Service Executed
                                                                                                                  SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Susan Fischer: Proof of Service re: Complaint, Summons, Notice to Parties MIDP, CMO, Cover Sheet upon Guerbet, LLC on 07/18/2018. (Walburg, Todd) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Service Executed
                                                                                                                    SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Susan Fischer: Proof of Service re: Complaint, Summons, Notice to Parties MIDP, CMO, Cover Sheet upon Bracco Diagnostics, Inc. on 07/18/2018. (Walburg, Todd) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Service Executed
                                                                                                                      SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Susan Fischer: Proof of Service re: Complaint, Summons, Notice to Parties MIDP, CMO, Cover Sheet upon Bayer Healthcare LLC on 07/18/2018. (Walburg, Todd) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Service Executed
                                                                                                                        SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Susan Fischer: Proof of Service re: Complaint, Summons, Notice to Parties MIDP, CMO, Cover Sheet upon Bayer Corporation on 07/18/2018. (Walburg, Todd) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Service Executed
                                                                                                                          SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Susan Fischer: Proof of Service re: Complaint, Summons, Notice to Parties MIDP, CMO, Cover Sheet upon Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals, Inc. on 07/18/2018. (Walburg, Todd) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 11/2/2018. Motions due by 2/1/2019. Daubert Hearing set for 3/15/2019 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 7/17/2018. (DGC, nvo) (Entered: 07/17/2018)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Susan Fischer.(Walburg, Todd) (Entered: 07/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Order Reassigning CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - Transferring this matter to District Judge David G. Campbell. In all future filings, the parties shall refer to this case as No. CV-18-01778-PHX-DGC. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 6/22/18. (DXD) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Todd Walburg on behalf of plaintiffs. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on September 7, 2018. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 6/8/18. (JAMA) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 6/8/18. (JAMA) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: 1 Complaint filed by Susan Fischer. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Notice re Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot(MIDP)
                                                                                                                                          NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (BAC) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Summons issued
                                                                                                                                            Summons Issued as to Bayer Healthcare Pharmaceuticals Incorporated. (BAC). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 06/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None New Case OpenedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-15592297. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-01778-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached.(BAC) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Summons Submitted
                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Submitted by Susan Fischer. (Walburg, Todd) (BAC) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/8/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15592297 filed by Susan Fischer. (Walburg, Todd) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BAC) (Entered: 06/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 11 times.

                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?