King v. Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-00399
District Judge Joseph F. Bianco, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 7, 2019 at 4:27 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Kathy Drew King, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by National Labor Relations Board

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Brady Francisco-FitzMaurice +1 718 330 2819 +1 718 330 7579 brady.francisco-fitzmaurice@nlrb.gov
No Logo Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc., Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Jackson Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Roger H. Briton +1 631 247 4609 +1 631 247 0417 britonr@jacksonlewis.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 160(1)
Nature of Suit 720 - Labor: Labor/Management Relations
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE voluntarily on settlement without prejudice. The clerk of the court shall close the case.. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 2/13/2018. (Bollbach, Jean) (Entered: 02/14/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kathy Drew King (Francisco-FitzMaurice, Brady) (Entered: 02/13/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      SCHEDULING ORDER: Based on the parties' representation that they have reached a settlement, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the hearing scheduled for February 8, 2018 is adjourned sine die. The parties shall submit a status report to the Court by March 7, 2018, if no stipulation of discontinuance has been filed by that date. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 2/7/2018. (Baum, Sabrina)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      Letter to Judge Bianco by Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc. (Briton, Roger) (Entered: 02/06/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ORDER granting 12 Motion to Adjourn Conference. By letter dated February 1, 2018, respondent requests an extension of time to file in opposition to the Section 10(j) Petition. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, on consent, respondent's time to file in opposition to the Section 10(j) Petition is extended to February 6, 2018, at 5 pm. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 2/1/2018. (Baum, Sabrina)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc.. (Briton, Roger) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150. by Kathy Drew King. (Francisco-FitzMaurice, Brady) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              ELECTRONIC ORDER denying 2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Brady Francisco-Fitzmaurice for leave to appear pro hac vice is denied, with leave to renew upon the submission of a certificate of good standing from the court for each of the states in which the applicant is a member of the bar, which has been issued within thirty (30) days of filing pursuant to Rule 1.3(c) of the Local Rules of the United States District Courts for the Southern and Eastern Districts of New York. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Gary R. Brown on 1/25/2018. c/ecf (Johnston, Linda)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                SCHEDULING ORDER: Given the possibility of a furlough of federal employees on February 9, 2018, and the lack of prejudice to defendant of moving the hearing date by one day, the hearing is rescheduled for February 8, 2018, at 11:00 am. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 1/24/2018. (Baum, Sabrina)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  STATUS REPORT (Corrected letter to Dkt. 9) Letter from Roger Briton, Esq. to Judge Bianco in response to Status Letter filed 1/23/2018) by Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc. (Briton, Roger) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    Letter to Judge Bianco in Opposition to Petitioner's Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File to postpone and hold in abeyance further proceedings (Dkt. 6) by Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc. (Briton, Roger) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      NOTICE of Appearance by Roger H. Briton on behalf of Thermo Fisher Scientific Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Briton, Roger) (Entered: 01/24/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        STATUS REPORT and Letter by Kathy Drew King (Francisco-FitzMaurice, Brady) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          STATUS REPORT ORDER. In light of the end of the government shutdown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that petitioner shall submit a status report informing the Court of the status of this case by February 2, 2018. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 1/23/2018. (Baum, Sabrina)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time to File. By letter dated January 22, 2018, petitioner requests to postpone and hold in abeyance further proceedings, in light of the fact that the attorneys responsible for the case have been furloughed indefinitely as part of a shutdown of the federal government. Petitioner informs the Court that petitioner solicited respondent's position and, upon information and belief, respondent does not oppose the request. Upon good cause shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that petitioner's request is granted. Further proceedings are postponed and held in abeyance until Board attorneys are permitted to resume work. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner shall notify the Court as soon as is practicable when Congress has appropriated such funds. SO ORDERED. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 1/22/2018. (Baum, Sabrina)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              MOTION for Extension of Time to File to postpone and hold in abeyance further proceedings by Kathy Drew King. (Francisco-FitzMaurice, Brady) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Hearing set for 2/9/2018 01:00 PM in Courtroom 1020 before Judge Joseph F. Bianco. Ordered by Judge Joseph F. Bianco on 1/19/2018. (Bollbach, Jean) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 01/19/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Unsigned Order to Show Cause by Kathy Drew King (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 01/19/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kathy Drew King. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 01/19/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Kathy Drew King. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Memorandum in Support, # 4 Affidavit) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/19/2018: # 5 Exhibit) (Bowens, Priscilla). (Entered: 01/19/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 27 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?