GLOBAL GAMING v. TRUMP PLAZA FUNDING, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:94-cv-02021-JHR

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 16, 2017 at 8:07 PM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo GLOBAL GAMING TECHNOLOGY, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ROSLYN S. HARRISON +1 908 232 5806 rozhar@comcast.net
No Logo ATLANTIC CITY SHOWBOAT, INC., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolff & Samson PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PAUL M. COLWELL +1 973 325 1500 pcolwell@wolffsamson.com
No Logo Bally's Park Place, Inc., Counter-Claimant
No Logo GRIFFCO RESORTS HOLDING, INC., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sughrue Mion, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space WILLIAM MACK WEBNER +1 202 293 7060
No Logo Pratt Hotel Corporation, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolff & Samson PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PAUL M. COLWELL +1 973 325 1500 pcolwell@wolffsamson.com
No Logo THE CLARIDGE HOTEL AND CASINO CORPORATION, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolff & Samson PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PAUL M. COLWELL +1 973 325 1500 pcolwell@wolffsamson.com
No Logo TRUMP PLAZA FUNDING, INC., Counter-Claimant
Trump Taj Mahal, Inc. Trump Taj Mahal, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Trump's Castle Hotel & Casino, Inc. Trump's Castle Hotel & Casino, Inc., Counter-Claimant
v.
No Logo ATLANTIC CITY SHOWBOAT, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MATTHEW V. DELDUCA +1 609 620 3200 mdelduca@dechert.com
No Logo Bally's Park Place, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MATTHEW V. DELDUCA +1 609 620 3200 mdelduca@dechert.com
No Logo GREAT BAY HOTEL AND CASINO, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MATTHEW V. DELDUCA +1 609 620 3200 mdelduca@dechert.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolff & Samson PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space PAUL M. COLWELL +1 973 325 1500 pcolwell@wolffsamson.com
No Logo Pratt Hotel Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MATTHEW V. DELDUCA +1 609 620 3200 mdelduca@dechert.com
No Logo THE CLARIDGE HOTEL AND CASINO CORPORATION, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MATTHEW V. DELDUCA +1 609 620 3200 mdelduca@dechert.com
Trump Plaza Associates, GP Trump Plaza Associates, GP, Defendant
Officially listed as "TRUMP PLAZA ASSOCIATES"

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MATTHEW V. DELDUCA +1 609 620 3200 mdelduca@dechert.com
Trump Taj Mahal Associates, LP Trump Taj Mahal Associates, LP, Defendant
Officially listed as "TRUMP TAJ MAHAL ASSOCIATES"

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MATTHEW V. DELDUCA +1 609 620 3200 mdelduca@dechert.com
Trump's Castle Associates, LP Trump's Castle Associates, LP, Defendant
Officially listed as "TRUMP'S CASTLE ASSOCIATES"

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MATTHEW V. DELDUCA +1 609 620 3200 mdelduca@dechert.com
No Logo GLOBAL GAMING TECHNOLOGY, INC., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ROSLYN S. HARRISON +1 908 232 5806 rozhar@comcast.net
Office Camden
Filed 5/5/1994
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Cause Section 35 U.S.C. § 271 Patent Infringement
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Camden
Terminated 4/25/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BG, CLOSED, SCHEDO
  Entries (73) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 62 Filed: 6/6/2001, Entered: 6/6/2001 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of dismissal with prejudice and without costs.(NM) (er)
    LREF
    Blank 61 Filed: 4/17/1996, Entered: 4/17/1996 ~Notice (other)
    NOTICE of Settlements by GLOBAL GAMING as to defts. Sigma Game, Inc. and Universal Distributing of Nevada, Inc. in related case CV-S-94-00601 (Nevada) (femp) Modified on 04/17/1996
      LREF
      Blank 60 Filed: 7/11/1995, Entered: 7/11/1995 Transcript
      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings taken on 3/3/95 (femp)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 4/25/1995, Entered: 5/4/1995 Status Conference
        Status conference held before Magistrate Joel B. Rosen on 4.25.95. (lc)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 4/25/1995, Entered: 4/25/1995 Terminated Case
          Case closed (mgr)
            LREF
            Blank 59 Filed: 4/19/1995, Entered: 4/25/1995 OrderCourt Filing
            ORDER granting [38-1] motion to stay proceedings pending the decision from the U.S. District Court for the District of Nevada. ( signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez ) (mgr)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 4/19/1995, Entered: 4/19/1995 Status Conference
              Status conference held before Magistrate Joel B. Rosen on April 13, 1995. (mgr)
                LREF
                Blank 56 Filed: 3/7/1995, Entered: 3/7/1995 Order
                ORDER permitting Mari Gursky Shaw to appear pro hac vice ( signed by Magistrate Joel B. Rosen ) (femp)
                  LREF
                  Blank 58 Filed: 3/3/1995, Entered: 3/10/1995 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                  Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: Carl Nami; Minutes of: 3/3/95; The following actions were taken, [38-1] motion to stay proceedings taken under advisement terminating [38-2] hearing Motion hearing set for 9:30 1/6/94 on [38-1] motion By Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez (femp)
                    LREF
                    Blank 57 Filed: 3/3/1995, Entered: 3/9/1995 Substitution of Attorney
                    SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANTS THE CLARIDGE AT PARK PLACE, INC., GREATE BAY HOTEL AND CASINO, INC. AND ATLANTIC CITY SHOWBOAT, INC. (lc)
                      LREF
                      Blank 55 Filed: 2/27/1995, Entered: 3/6/1995 Substitution of Attorney
                      Substitute attorney for BALLY'S PARK PLACE, TRUMP PLAZA, TRUMP TAJ MAHAL, TRUMP'S CASTLE, GREAT BAY HOTEL ; Terminated attorney WILLIAM MACK WEBNER for TRUMP'S CASTLE, attorney WILLIAM MACK WEBNER for TRUMP TAJ MAHAL, INC, attorney WILLIAM MACK WEBNER for BALLY'S PARK PLACE, attorney WILLIAM MACK WEBNER for TRUMP PLAZA FUNDING, attorney WILLIAM MACK WEBNER for BALLY'S PARK PLACE ; Added, MATTHEW V. DELDUCA (femp)
                        LREF
                        Blank 54 Filed: 2/27/1995, Entered: 3/6/1995 Notice of Appearance/
                        NOTICE of attorney appearance for THE CLARIDGE HOTEL, ATLANTIC CITY, PRATT HOTEL by MATTHEW V. DELDUCA (femp)
                          LREF
                          Blank 53 Filed: 2/6/1995, Entered: 2/6/1995 Order
                          CONSENT ORDER, for James Bear, StephenJensen and Joseph Jennings to appear pro hac vice ( signed by Magistrate Joel B. Rosen ) (femp)
                            LREF
                            Blank 52 Filed: 1/27/1995, Entered: 1/27/1995 Order
                            CONSENT ORDER re Amendment of Caption and Pleadings ( signed by Magistrate Joel B. Rosen ) (femp)
                              LREF
                              Blank 50 Filed: 1/25/1995, Entered: 1/25/1995 Order
                              CONSENT ORDER re Amendment of Caption and Pleadings ( signed by Magistrate Joel B. Rosen ) (femp)
                                LREF
                                Blank 49 Filed: 1/25/1995, Entered: 1/25/1995 Order
                                CONSENT ORDER for Eugene M. Cummings, Esq. to appear pro hac vice ( signed by Magistrate Joel B. Rosen ) (femp)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 1/25/1995, Entered: 1/25/1995 Scheduling Conference
                                  Scheduling conference held before Magistrate Joel B. Rosen on 1/19/95. (femp)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 51 Filed: 1/20/1995, Entered: 1/25/1995 Scheduling Order
                                    SCHEDULING ORDER setting Amending of pleadings on 2/17/95 ; Discovery cutoff 9/29/95 ; Settlement conference 1:30 4/25/95 ; ( signed by Magistrate Joel B. Rosen ) (femp)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 48 Filed: 1/18/1995, Entered: 1/20/1995 Certification
                                      Declaration of Joseph F.Jennings Re: admission pro hac vice (femp)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 47 Filed: 1/18/1995, Entered: 1/20/1995 Certification
                                        Declaration of Stephen C. Jensen Re: admission pro hac vice (femp)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 46 Filed: 1/18/1995, Entered: 1/20/1995 Certification
                                          Declaration of James B. Bear Re: admission pro hac vice (femp)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 45 Filed: 1/11/1995, Entered: 1/13/1995 Answer to Counterclaim
                                            ANSWER by GLOBAL GAMING to Counterclaim of Bally's Park Place (femp)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 44 Filed: 1/11/1995, Entered: 1/13/1995 Answer to Counterclaim
                                              ANSWER by GLOBAL GAMING to [43-2] counter claim (femp) Modified on 01/13/1995
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 12/21/1994, Entered: 12/21/1994 Remark
                                                Sched Conf resched to 1/19/95 at 11:00am per JBR (ln)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 43 Filed: 12/19/1994, Entered: 12/19/1994, Terminated: 4/25/1995 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                  ANSWER AMENDED COMPLAINT and COUNTERCLAIM by THE CLARIDGE HOTEL, PRATT HOTEL, ATLANTIC CITY against GLOBAL GAMING (femp)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 42 Filed: 12/15/1994, Entered: 12/15/1994 Order
                                                    ORDER, set scheduling conference for 11:30 1/18/95 ( signed by Magistrate Joel B. Rosen ) (femp)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 41 Filed: 12/14/1994, Entered: 12/15/1994 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                      ANSWER AMENDED COMPLAINT and COUNTERCLAIM by TRUMP PLAZA FUNDING, BALLY'S PARK PLACE, TRUMP TAJ MAHAL, INC, TRUMP'S CASTLE, GRIFFCO RESORTS against GLOBAL GAMING (femp)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 40 Filed: 12/9/1994, Entered: 12/12/1994 Certification
                                                        Declaration of W. Mack Webner Re: [38-1] motion to stay proceedings (femp)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 39 Filed: 12/9/1994, Entered: 12/12/1994 Certification
                                                          Declaration of Anthony de Alcuaz Re: [38-1] motion to stay proceedings (femp) Modified on 12/12/1994
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 38 Filed: 12/9/1994, Entered: 12/12/1994, Terminated: 4/19/1995 Motion to Stay
                                                            Notice of MOTION to stay proceedings by TRUMP PLAZA FUNDING, BALLY'S PARK PLACE, TRUMP TAJ MAHAL, INC, TRUMP'S CASTLE, GRIFFCO RESORTS, Motion hearing set for 9:30 1/6/94 on [38-1] motion . (memo) (femp)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 37 Filed: 12/5/1994, Entered: 12/9/1994 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                              Minute entry: Minutes of: 12/2/94; The following actions were taken, denying [29-1] motion for more definite statement terminating [29-2] hearing Motion hearing set for 9:30 10/21/94 on [29-1] motion By Magistrate Joel B. Rosen (femp)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 36 Filed: 12/5/1994, Entered: 12/9/1994 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                Minute entry: Minutes of: 12/2/94; The following actions were taken, denying [26-1] motion to strike [18-1] amended complaint terminating [26-2] hearing Motion hearing set for 9:30 10/21/94 on [26-1] motion By Magistrate Joel B. Rosen (femp)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 35 Filed: 11/23/1994, Entered: 12/7/1994 Order
                                                                  ORDER denying [26-1] motion to strike [18-1] amended complaint terminating [26-2] hearing, etc. Motion hearing set for 9:30 10/21/94 on [26-1] motion ( signed by Magistrate Joel B. Rosen ) (femp)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 34 Filed: 11/23/1994, Entered: 12/7/1994 Order
                                                                    LETTER OPINION ( signed by Magistrate Joel B. Rosen ) (femp)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 33 Filed: 11/22/1994, Entered: 11/22/1994 Transcript
                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Scheduleing Conference Proceedings recorded on November 4, 1994 (ln)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/18/1994, Entered: 11/28/1994 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                        Deadline updated; Motion hearing set for 12/2/94 for [26-1] motion to strike [18-1] amended complaint (ln)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/18/1994, Entered: 11/28/1994 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                          Deadline updated; Motion hearing set for 12/2/94 for [29-1] motion for more definite statement (ln)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/14/1994, Entered: 11/14/1994 Scheduling Conference
                                                                            Scheduling conference held before Magistrate Joel B. Rosen on 11/4/94. (femp)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 32 Filed: 10/31/1994, Entered: 10/31/1994 Certification
                                                                              CERTIFICATION of Stephen Jensen in support of defts. Claridge Hotel and Atlantic City Showboat's eply re motion to dismiss (femp)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 31 Filed: 10/24/1994, Entered: 10/24/1994 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by pltf. re affidavit and brief in opposition to motion to dismiss (femp)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 30 Filed: 10/24/1994, Entered: 10/24/1994 Affidavit
                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT of Mitchell Macknin Re: deft's motion to dismiss (femp)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/21/1994, Entered: 10/24/1994 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                    Deadline updated; Motion hearing set for 11/4/94 for [29-1] motion for more definite statement (ln)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/21/1994, Entered: 10/24/1994 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                                                                                      Deadline updated; Motion hearing set for 11/4/94 for [26-1] motion to strike [18-1] amended complaint (ln)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 27 Filed: 9/22/1994, Entered: 9/26/1994 Certification
                                                                                        CERTIFICATION of Stephen C. Jensen Re: [26-1] motion to strike [18-1] amended complaint (femp)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank 26 Filed: 9/22/1994, Entered: 9/26/1994, Terminated: 11/23/1994 Motion to Strike
                                                                                          Notice of MOTION to strike [18-1] amended complaint by THE CLARIDGE HOTEL, PRATT HOTEL, ATLANTIC CITY [26-1] motion referred to Magistrate Joel B. Rosen, Motion hearing set for 9:30 10/21/94 on [26-1] motion . (letter brief) (femp)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Blank 29 Filed: 9/19/1994, Entered: 10/4/1994 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                            Notice of MOTION for more definite statement by TRUMP PLAZA FUNDING, BALLY'S PARK PLACE, TRUMP TAJ MAHAL, INC, TRUMP'S CASTLE, GRIFFCO RESORTS [29-1] motion referred to Magistrate Joel B. Rosen, Motion hearing set for 9:30 10/21/94 on [29-1] motion . (Memo) (femp) Modified on 10/04/1994
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Blank 28 Filed: 9/19/1994, Entered: 9/28/1994 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                              Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by ; Minutes of: 9/16/94; The following actions were taken, granting [20-1] motion for Gary Kostow,Esq. to appear pro hac vice By Magistrate Joel B. Rosen (sa)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Blank 25 Filed: 9/6/1994, Entered: 9/6/1994 Order
                                                                                                ORDER granting [20-1] motion for Gary Kostow,Esq. to appear pro hac vice terminating [20-2] hearing Motion hearing set for 9:30 10/7/94 on [20-1] motion ( signed by Magistrate Joel B. Rosen ) (femp)
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Blank 24 Filed: 8/31/1994, Entered: 8/31/1994 Certification
                                                                                                  Declaration of Roslyn S. Harrison Re: [20-1] motion for Gary Kostow,Esq. to appear pro hac vice (femp)
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Blank 23 Filed: 8/31/1994, Entered: 8/31/1994 Affidavit
                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT of Buce S. Sperling Re: [20-1] motion for Gary Kostow,Esq. to appear pro hac vice (femp)
                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Blank 22 Filed: 8/31/1994, Entered: 8/31/1994 Affidavit
                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Gay Kostow, Esq. Re: [20-1] motion to appear pro hac vice (femp)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Blank 21 Filed: 8/31/1994, Entered: 8/31/1994 Affidavit
                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Joseph M. Vanek Re: [20-1] motion for Gary Kostow,Esq. to appear pro hac vice (femp)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Blank 20 Filed: 8/31/1994, Entered: 8/31/1994, Terminated: 9/6/1994 Motion for Limited Admission
                                                                                                          Notice of MOTION for Gary Kostow,Esq. to appear pro hac vice by GLOBAL GAMING [20-1] motion referred, Motion hearing set for 9:30 10/7/94 on [20-1] motion . (femp)
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 19 Filed: 8/31/1994, Entered: 8/31/1994 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                            CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GLOBAL GAMING of Amended Complaint (femp)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 18 Filed: 8/31/1994, Entered: 8/31/1994 Amended Complaint
                                                                                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT by GLOBAL GAMING , (Answer due 9/10/94) amending [1-1] complaint (femp)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 17 Filed: 8/11/1994, Entered: 8/11/1994 Order
                                                                                                                ORDER granting [13-1] motion for more definite statement terminating [12-2] hearing Motion hearing set for 9:30 8/5/94 on [12-1] motion, [11-2 ] set for 9:30 8/5/94 on [11-1] motion, ( signed by Magistrate Joel B. Rosen ) (femp) Modified on 09/20/1994
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 16 Filed: 8/10/1994, Entered: 8/10/1994 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                                                                                  Minute entry: Minutes of: 8/5/94; The following actions were taken, granting [11-1] motion for more definite statement, granting [12-1] motion for more definite statement terminating [13-2] hearing Motion hearing set for 9:30 8/5/94 on [13-1] motion By Magistrate Joel B. Rosen (femp) Modified on 09/20/1994
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 14 Filed: 7/27/1994, Entered: 7/27/1994 Affidavit
                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT by GLOBAL GAMING Re: [12-1] motion for more definite statement (femp)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 15 Filed: 7/22/1994, Entered: 7/27/1994 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GLOBAL GAMING of Memo of Law in Opposition to Motion for More Definite Statement (femp)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 10 Filed: 7/12/1994, Entered: 7/12/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER, extending time to answer by 7/8/94 ( signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez ) (femp)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 13 Filed: 7/11/1994, Entered: 7/21/1994, Terminated: 8/11/1994 Motion for More Definite Statement
                                                                                                                          Notice of MOTION for more definite statement by TRUMP PLAZA FUNDING, BALLY'S PARK PLACE, TRUMP TAJ MAHAL, INC [13-1] motion referred to Magistrate Joel B. Rosen, Motion hearing set for 9:30 8/5/94 on [13-1] motion . (femp)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 12 Filed: 7/11/1994, Entered: 7/21/1994 Motion for More Definite Statement
                                                                                                                            Notice of MOTION for more definite statement by THE CLARIDGE HOTEL, PRATT HOTEL, ATLANTIC CITY [12-1] motion referred to Magistrate Joel B. Rosen, Motion hearing set for 9:30 8/5/94 on [12-1] motion . (femp)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 11 Filed: 7/8/1994, Entered: 7/12/1994 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                              Notice of MOTION for a more definite statement by TRUMP PLAZA FUNDING, BALLY'S PARK PLACE, TRUMP TAJ MAHAL, INC, TRUMP'S CASTLE, GRIFFCO RESORTS [11-1] motion referred to Magistrate Joel B. Rosen, Motion hearing set for 9:30 8/5/94 on [11-1] motion . (Memo) (femp)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 9 Filed: 7/1/1994, Entered: 7/12/1994 Application/Petition
                                                                                                                                APPLICATION for additional extension of time to answer (femp)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 8 Filed: 6/14/1994, Entered: 6/14/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [4-1] application ( signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez ) (femp)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 7 Filed: 6/14/1994, Entered: 6/14/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [5-1] application ( signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez ) (femp)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Blank 6 Filed: 6/3/1994, Entered: 6/3/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER extending time to answer by Trump Plaza For 30 days ( signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez ) (femp)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 6/1/1994, Entered: 6/2/1994, Terminated: 6/14/1994 Application/Petition
                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION for extension of time to answer complaint by deft. Atlantic City Showboat, Inc. (femp) Modified on 06/07/1994
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 5/31/1994, Entered: 6/2/1994, Terminated: 6/14/1994 Application/Petition
                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION by defts. The Claridge Hotel and Casino Corporation and Griffco Resorts Holding, Inc. for extension of time to answer (femp) Modified on 06/07/1994
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 5/27/1994, Entered: 6/1/1994 Application/Petition
                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION by deft. Trump Plaza Funding, Inc. for a 30-day extension of time to answer (femp)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 5/10/1994, Entered: 5/10/1994 Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS(ES) issued for TRUMP PLAZA FUNDING, BALLY'S PARK PLACE, TRUMP TAJ MAHAL, INC, TRUMP'S CASTLE, THE CLARIDGE HOTEL, GRIFFCO RESORTS, PRATT HOTEL, ATLANTIC CITY ( 20 Days) (Mailed to Counsel) (femp)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 5/9/1994, Entered: 5/9/1994 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate JOEL B. ROSEN (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 5/5/1994, Entered: 5/9/1994 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                  COMPLAINT filed FILING FEE $ 120.00 RECEIPT # 192591 (ar1)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 104 times.

                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?