Cosner v. Thistlethwait
Federal Civil Lawsuit West Virginia Southern District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-01499
District Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 10, 2021 at 1:30 PM ST (2.3 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ronald L. Cosner, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by #3601729

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald L. Cosner
v.
No Logo Dr. Lye, Defendant
No Logo Dr. Thistlethwait, Defendant
No Logo Mount Olive Correctional Complex, Defendant
No Logo N.P. Josh, Defendant
No Logo PSI meds, Defendant
No Logo Sandra May, Defendant
No Logo U.M. Best, Defendant
No Logo Wexford Health, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (110) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 3/10/2021, Entered: None Objection to Proposed Findings and Recommendations
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 2/18/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion / Application / Petition To Extend Time To File Objection To Proposed Findings and R
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 2/12/2021, Entered: None Extend Time To File Objection To Proposed Findings and Recommendations
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Discovery
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: None Proposed Findings and Recommendations by Magistrate Judge
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 11/24/2020, Entered: None Notice of Change of Attorney Information
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 10/13/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 10/2/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 9/30/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 9/29/2020, Entered: None Order Adopting Proposed Findings and Recommendations
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 9/25/2020, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 9/10/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 9/8/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 8/26/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Support
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 8/26/2020, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: None Joinder
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 8/20/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Support
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/20/2020, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/20/2020, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 8/14/2020, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 8/14/2020, Entered: None Objection to Proposed Findings and Recommendations
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/14/2020, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/7/2020, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/7/2020, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/6/2020, Entered: None Answer to Amended Complaint
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/5/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Sanctions
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/4/2020, Entered: None Motion Hearing
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion / Application / Petition To Extend Time To File Objection To Proposed Findings and R
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: None Extend Time To File Objection To Proposed Findings and Recommendations
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: None Order
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 7/13/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/10/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Support
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/10/2020, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/9/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Discovery
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: None Complaint - Amended
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion / Application / Petition for Leave to File
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: None Proposed Findings and Recommendations by Magistrate Judge
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Strike
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/30/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 6/25/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/24/2020, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/4/2020, Entered: None Discovery
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: None Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 5/14/2020, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/13/2020, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/27/2020, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/19/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/11/2020, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/11/2020, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: None Notice of Change of Attorney Information
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: None Sanctions
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: None Objection To Filed Document - DO NOT USE FOR OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED F&R, INTERROGATORIES, or DIGITEK
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/29/2020, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: None Filing Fee Received (Partial)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/23/2020, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion / Application / Petition to Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/3/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/30/2019, Entered: None Certificate of Service
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/30/2019, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/30/2019, Entered: None Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/24/2019, Entered: None Order Adopting Proposed Findings and Recommendations
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/24/2019, Entered: None Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/24/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/24/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/24/2019, Entered: None Default (Entry of) By The Clerk Pursuant To Rule 55(a), FRCivP
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/13/2019, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/13/2019, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/13/2019, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Support
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/6/2019, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed by US Marshal
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed by US Marshal
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/26/2019, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed by US Marshal
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/25/2019, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed by Certified Mail, with Return Receipt Cards
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/20/2019, Entered: None Amend
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed by Certified Mail, with Return Receipt Cards
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/14/2019, Entered: None Letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/14/2019, Entered: None Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/14/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None Summons Reissued by the Clerk
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None Summons Reissued by the Clerk
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None Proposed Findings and Recommendations by Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: None Proposed Findings and Recommendations by Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/18/2019, Entered: None Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None case assigned
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/10/2018, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley for Findings of Fact and Recommendations for disposition. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (taq)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CASE assigned to Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Preliminary Injunction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        REQUEST by Ronald L. Cosner for Preliminary Injunction. (taq) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT. (Attachment: # 1 Cover Letter and Mailing Envelope) (taq) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by Ronald L. Cosner to Proceed in forma pauperis, Authorization to release institutional account information and Consent to collection of fees from trust fund account. (taq) (Entered: 12/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?