United States v. Miller
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-02374
District Judge Catherine C. Blake, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 7, 2019 at 12:07 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ann Elizabeth Nash +1 202 307 6489 +1 202 514 6866 ann.e.nash@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Deborah C. Miller, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Frost & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua Peter Haukebo +1 410 497 5947 +1 888 235 8405 peter.haukebo@frosttaxlaw.com
No Logo Ronald E. Miller, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Frost & Associates

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua Peter Haukebo +1 410 497 5947 +1 888 235 8405 peter.haukebo@frosttaxlaw.com
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7401
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 2/21/2019. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 10/24/2018. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/24/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Telephone Conference re: Scheduling held on 10/23/2018 before Judge Catherine C. Blake. (kam, Deputy Clerk)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Miscellaneous correspondence to counsel advising of a conference call to discuss attached proposed scheduling order. Counsel are requested to confirm with Chambers their participation. (Blake, Catherine) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Deborah C. Miller, Ronald E. Miller.(Haukebo, Joshua) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Summons Issued 21 days as to Deborah C. Miller.(aos, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            NOTICE by United States of America Summons for Deborah C. Miller (Nash, Ann) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              QC NOTICE: 1 Complaint filed by United States of America was filed incorrectly. File a Summmons for Deborah Miller using the Notice entry from menu. (slss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Summons Issued 21 days as to Ronald E. Miller.(slss, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/03/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons for Ronald E. Miller, # 3 Summons for Deborah C. Miller)(Nash, Ann) (Entered: 08/02/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                    Statistics

                    This case has been viewed 3 times.

                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                    Space
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                     
                    PlainSite
                    Sign Up
                    Need Password Help?