United States v. Bartnes
Federal Civil Lawsuit Montana District Court, Case No. 4:18-cv-00075
District Judge Brian Morris, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 8, 2019 at 7:23 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo The United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The Southern District Of Florida

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kurt G. Alme +1 406 657 6101 +6576 657 657 6058

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Ryan S. Watson +1 202 514 5173 +1 202 307 0054 Ryan.Watson@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Jeannie V. Bartnes, Defendant
No Logo Montana Department of Revenue, Defendant
No Logo Sheridan County, Montana, Defendant
No Logo Steve J. Bartnes, Defendant
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7401
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
JUDGMENT; On September 5, 2018, the United States and Steve J. Bartnes and Jeannie V. Bartnes filed a Stipulation for Entry of Judgment. In consideration of the Stipulation, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED as follows: 1. Judgment is hereby entered in favor of the United States on Count I of its Complaint and against Defendant Steve Bartnes for his 2005 income tax liabilities in the amount of $139,271.99, as of April 22, 2018, plus statutory interest, as provided by 26 U.S.C. §§ 6601, 6621, & 6622, and 28 U.S.C. § 1961(c), and other statutory additions as provided by law. 2. Judgment is hereby entered in favor of the United States on Count II of its Complaint and against Defendants Steve Bartnes and Jeannie Bartnes, jointly and severally, for their 2007, 2008, 2010, 2011, 2012, and 2013 income tax liabilities in the amount of $664,174.64, as of April 22, 2018, plus statutory interest, as provided by 26 U.S.C. §§ 6601, 6621, & 6622, and 28 U.S.C. § 1961(c), and other statutory additions as provided by law. 3. Judgment is hereby entered in favor of the United States on Count III of its Complaint and against Defendants Steve Bartnes and Jeannie Bartnes. The United States has valid and subs isting federal tax liens for the 2005, 2007, 2008, 2010, 2011, 2012, and 2013 tax years attached to the real property located at 93 McElroy, Westby, Montana 59275 (the Subject Property) and more particularly described in Paragraph 29 of the United S tates Complaint. 4. The United States federal tax liens are hereby foreclosed, subject to the parties stipulation that the United States will not seek an order of foreclosure and judicial sale from the Court for a period of six months from the dat e of this Judgment. Upon the expiration of the six-month period, the United States shall submit either an order of foreclosure and judicial sale to be entered by the Court or a status report to advise the Court of the disposition of the Subject Property. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/4/2018. (TLO)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Original issued Summonses mailed to Counsel Watson. (Attachments: # 1 Issued Summons - Jeannie Bartnes, # 2 Issued Summons - MT Dept. of Revenue, # 3 Issued Summons - Sheridan County, MT) (SLR) Modified on 5/15/2018 to reflect original summons mailed to counsel Watson (MMS). (Entered: 05/15/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by The United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Blank Summons - Steve Bartnes, # 3 Blank Summons - Jeannie Bartnes, # 4 Blank Summons - Montana Dept. Revenue, # 5 Blank Summons - Sheridan County) (SLR) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 8 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?