Carroll County v. Purdue Pharma L.P.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Georgia Northern District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-00131
District Judge Timothy C. Batten, Sr, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 7, 2019 at 8:48 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Carroll County, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Brinson, Askew, Berry, Seigler, Richardson & Davis, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Lee B. Carter +1 706 291 8853 lcarter@brinson-askew.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jesse Anderson Davis +1 706 291 8853 adavis@brinson-askew.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Leslie Lucas +1 706 291 8853 slucas@brinson-askew.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Crongeyer Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY William Q. Bird +1 404 873 4696 +1 404 872 3745 billbird@birdlawgroup.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John W Crongeyer , +1 404 542 6205 +1 404 872 3745 jwc@birdlawgroup.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Paul I. Hotchkiss +1 404 873 4696 +1 404 872 3745 pih@birdlawgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McCamy Phillips Tuggle & Fordham

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert Harris Smalley, III +1 706 278 4499 rsmalley@mccamylaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Finnell Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert Kirtley Finnell +1 706 235 7272 +1 706 235 9461 bob@finnellfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Tisinger Vance, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Richard G. Tisinger, Jr. +1 770 834 4467 +1 770 834 5426 rtisingerjr@tisingervance.com
v.
No Logo ACTAVIS LLC, Defendant
No Logo Actavis Pharma, Inc., Defendant
Allergan Finance, LLC Allergan Finance, LLC, Defendant
Allergan PLC Allergan PLC, Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Corporation AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc. Cardinal Health, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cephalon, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Acusphere, Inc.
No Logo Depomed, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Endo Health Solutions Inc., Defendant
No Logo Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc. Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Johnson & Johnson, Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC Mallinckrodt LLC, Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC Mallinckrodt PLC, Defendant
McKesson Corporation McKesson Corporation, Defendant
Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Par Pharmaceuticals Inc., Defendant
PURDUE PHARMA, INC. PURDUE PHARMA, INC., Defendant
Purdue Pharma LP Purdue Pharma LP, Defendant
No Logo Specgx LLC, Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Defendant
No Logo THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC., Defendant
No Logo Watson Laboratories, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1964
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
New Civil Action Number in USDC NDOH 1:18-op-46269 (aar)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Civil Case Terminated. (jlm)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Case electronically transferred to the Northern District of Ohio for inclusion in MDL 2804. (jlm)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Certified copy of Conditional Transfer ORDER (CTO67) from the MDL Panel TRANSFERRING action to the Northern District of Ohio for inclusion in MDL 2804. (jlm) (Entered: 11/27/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Carroll County. Endo Health Solutions Inc. waiver mailed on 11/2/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Davis, Jesse) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Carroll County. Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. waiver mailed on 11/2/2018, answer due 1/2/2019. (Davis, Jesse) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Carroll County. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8249137) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rsh) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 11/02/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 24 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?