United States v. Brack

Criminal Case New York Eastern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cr-00684
District Judge Eric N. Vitaliano, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Eric N. Vitaliano
Last Updated February 7, 2019 at 3:50 PM EST (6.2 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Philip Arthur Selden +1 410 209 4900 +1 718 254 6076 Philip.Selden@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Elgin Brack, Defendant

Represented by Law Offices of Andrew J. Frisch

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew J. Frisch +1 212 784 2413 +1 646 304 0352 afrisch@andrewfrisch.com
No Logo Scott Brack, Defendant

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Marion A. Seltzer +1 212 289 8798 +1 212 289 8798 marionseltzer23@gmail.com

Represented by Office of Defender Services

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/13/2018, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Douglas G. Morris +1 718 330 1200 +1 718 855 0760 douglas_morris@fd.org

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
INDICTMENT as to Elgin Brack (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7, 8, 9, Scott Brack (2) count(s) 1, 2, 4, 6, 8. (Attachments: # 1 Criminal Information Sheet) (Galeano, Sonia) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Attorney update in case as to Scott Brack. Attorney Douglas G. Morris terminated. (Williams, Erica) [1:18-mj-01124-SMG]
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
CJA 20 as to Scott Brack: Appointment of Attorney Marion A. Seltzer for Scott Brack. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 12/13/2018. (Williams, Erica) [1:18-mj-01124-SMG] (Entered: 12/14/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione: Change of Attorney Appointment Hearing as to Scott Brack held on 12/13/2018. AUSA Philip Selden present. Defendant present with Federal Defender Douglas Morris. FDNY Douglas Morris relieved as defense counsel. CJA Marion Seltzer appointed to represent the defendant. (FTR Log #12/13/18 11:39-11:41a.) (Williams, Erica) [1:18-mj-01124-SMG] (Entered: 12/14/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Scott Brack. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 11/29/2018. (Williams, Erica) [1:18-mj-01124-SMG] (Entered: 11/30/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy: Docket Call as to Scott Brack held on 11/29/2018. AUSA Philip Selden present. Defendant present with Federal Defender Douglas Morris. At this time, defense counsel states on the record that the defendant does not have a bail application/package. Order of detention entered with leave to reapply to a Magistrate or to the District Court to whom the case will be assigned. (FTR Log #11/29/18 2:32-2:34p.) (Williams, Erica) [1:18-mj-01124-SMG] (Entered: 11/30/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
CJA 20 - Counsel Andrew J. Frisch appointed to represent defendant Elgin Brack. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 11/27/2018. (Williams, Erica) [1:18-mj-01124-SMG] (Entered: 11/28/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Elgin Brack (Williams, Erica) [1:18-mj-01124-SMG] (Entered: 11/28/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Elgin Brack. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 11/27/2018. (Williams, Erica) [1:18-mj-01124-SMG] (Entered: 11/28/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold: Arraignment as to Elgin Brack (2) Count Complaint held on 11/27/2018, Attorney Appointment Hearing as to Elgin Brack held on 11/27/2018, Initial Appearance as to Elgin Brack held on 11/27/2018. AUSA Philip Selden present. Defendant present with appointed CJA counsel, Andrew Frisch. Defendant arraigned on the complaint. Preliminary hearing waived by defendant. At this time, defense counsel states on the record that the defendant does not have a bail application/package. Order of detention entered with leave to reapply to a Magistrate or to the District Court Judge to whom the case will be assigned. (FTR Log #11/27/18 2:48-2:51p.) (Williams, Erica) [1:18-mj-01124-SMG] (Entered: 11/28/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Scott Brack (Williams, Erica) [1:18-mj-01124-SMG] (Entered: 11/28/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
TEMPORARY COMMITMENT Issued as to Scott Brack (Williams, Erica) [1:18-mj-01124-SMG] (Entered: 11/28/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold: Arraignment as to Scott Brack (1) Count Complaint held on 11/27/2018, Attorney Appointment Hearing as to Scott Brack held on 11/27/2018, Initial Appearance as to Scott Brack held on 11/27/2018. AUSA Philip Selden present. Defendant present with Federal Defender Doug Morris. Defendant arraigned on the complaint. Temporary Order of Detention issued. Bail Hearing set for 11/29/2018 at 2:00 p.m. (FTR Log #11/27/18 4:41-4:44p.) (Williams, Erica) [1:18-mj-01124-SMG] (Entered: 11/28/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
COMPLAINT as to Scott Brack (1), Elgin Brack (2). (Williams, Erica) [1:18-mj-01124-SMG] (Entered: 11/28/2018)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 17 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?