Muehlemann v. Lange
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Western District Court, Case No. 6:18-cv-00354
District Judge Alan D. Albright, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 7, 2019 at 5:07 PM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Michael Edward Muehlemann, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Edward Muehlemann
v.
No Logo Bell County Jail, Defendant
No Logo Sheriff Eddie Lange, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Letter to Michael Edward Muehlemann: case transferred from Southern District of Texas. (lad) (Entered: 12/03/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Case electronically transferred in from Southern District of Texas; Case Number 4:18-cv-04491. (Entered: 12/03/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Interdistrict transfer to Western District of TX, Waco Division. Case transferred electronically. Case terminated on 12/3/2018, filed. (gkelner, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/3/2018.]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER TO TRANSFER CASE to Western District of TX, Waco Division (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/3/2018.] (Entered: 12/03/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            MEMORANDUM ON TRANSFER(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(gkelner, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/3/2018.] (Entered: 12/03/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (SarahShelby, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/3/2018.] (Entered: 11/29/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Sheriff Eddy Lange, filed. (lrivera, 2) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/3/2018.] (Entered: 11/28/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Michael Edward Muehlemann, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/19/2018. (Attachments: # 1 proceed IFP)(lrivera, 2) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/3/2018.] (Entered: 11/28/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against Bell County Jail, Sheriff Eddy Lange (Filing fee $ 400) filed by Michael Edward Muehlemann. (Attachments: # 1 cover letter, # 2 envelope)(lrivera, 2) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 12/3/2018.] (Entered: 11/28/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 3 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?