Romano v. Hall
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Western District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-01225
District Judge Elizabeth A. Wolford, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 7, 2019 at 5:12 PM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Anthony Romano, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by 00-A-5352

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony Romano
v.
No Logo B. Hall, Defendant
No Logo Jane Doe, Defendant
No Logo Sandy Kelsey, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
JUDGMENT to administratively terminate this action without filing the complaint or assessing a filing fee. Signed by Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court on 11/30/2018. (KM)Plaintiff mailed a copy of this document. (Main Document 3 replaced on 11/30/2018) (KM). (Entered: 11/30/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    E-Filing Notification regarding 3 JUDGMENT. Main Document replaced with correct document on.(KM) (KM)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      ORDER that Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis is denied without prejudice. The Clerk of Court shall administratively terminate this action without filing the complaint or assessing the filing fee. If Plaintiff wishes to reopen this action, he shall so notify this Court in writing, no later than thirty days from the date of this order. This writing must include either a properly supported motion to proceed in forma pauperis and an authorization form or the $400.00 filing fee. Upon Plaintiff's submission of the required forms or the filing fee the Clerk of Court shall reopen this case. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 11/29/2018. Plaintiff mailed the order and the forms.(KM) (Entered: 11/30/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        COMPLAINT against Jane Doe, B. Hall, Sandy Kelsey, filed by Anthony Romano. (Attachments: # 1 envelop, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KM) (Entered: 11/05/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Remark - Plaintiff has been mailed a pro se packet including Privacy Notice and Consent to Proceed before a Magistrate Judge. (KM)
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 3 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?