Bernard R Berlow and Sarina C Berlow - Adversary Proceeding
Bankruptcy Case Pennsylvania Middle Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 5:03-ap-50372
District Judge John J. Thomas, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 7, 2019 at 5:14 PM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Bernard R Berlow, Plaintiff

Represented by Law Office of William Hronis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY WILLIAM HRONIS +1 610 740 1004 +1 610 740 9357
No Logo Sarina C Berlow, Plaintiff

Represented by Law Office of William Hronis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY WILLIAM HRONIS +1 610 740 1004 +1 610 740 9357
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Represented by United States of America

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space United States of America
Nature of Suit 498 - Other Action
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/3/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Adversary Proceeding 03-50372 Closed. (JK)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/26/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Order granting complaint that the post-petition lien in the case of US vs Bernard Berlow Docket Number CR-02-108-01 filed in the amount of $247,774.21 on or about January 9, 2003 is nullity as a matter of law pursuant to 11 U.S.C. Sec 362. (Attachments: 1 Certificate of Service) (CDS) (Entered: 06/01/2004)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/20/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Motion for Default Judgment Filed by William Hronis Esq of Law Offices of William Hronis on behalf of Bernard R Berlow, Sarina C Berlow (RE: related document(s) 1 ) . (JK) (Entered: 05/21/2004)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/20/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Order Granting Motion to Extend Time; Order of 3/17/04 is enlarged for a period of 30 days. (RE: related document(s) 5 ). (JK) (Entered: 04/20/2004)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/16/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Motion to Extend Time to allow Ch 7 Trustee to enter his appearance and file pleadings Filed by William Hronis Esq of Law Offices of William Hronis on behalf of Bernard R Berlow, Sarina C Berlow (RE: related document(s) 4 ) . (JK) (Entered: 04/16/2004)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/17/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Order that pleading is denied for failure to comply with BPO 7055-1 unless compliance occurs within 30 days (RE: related document(s) 1 ). Compliance due by 4/16/2004. (JK) (Entered: 03/17/2004)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/11/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Certificate of Service Filed by William Hronis Esq of Law Offices of William Hronis on behalf of Bernard R Berlow, Sarina C Berlow (RE: related document(s) 1, 2 ). (JK) (Entered: 12/11/2003)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/2/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Summons issued setting answer date(RE: related document(s) 1 ). Answers to Complaint/Summons are due on: 1/6/2004. (JK) (Entered: 12/02/2003)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/2/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Filing fee not required(RE: related document(s) 1 ). (JK)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Complaint Filed by William Hronis Esq, on behalf of Bernard R Berlow, Sarina C Berlow against United States of America . Filing Fee due in the amount of $ 150.00 . 498 (Other Action) (JK) (Entered: 12/02/2003)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 10 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?