Columbia Export Terminal, LLC v. The International Longshore and Warehouse Union
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-02177
Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 20, 2019 at 3:43 PM ST (1.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1962
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: None Judgment - Terminate Case
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 12/20/2019, Entered: None Order on Findings & Recommendation
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for leave
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Issue Subpoena to Pacific Maritime Association to Obtain Addresses Needed for Service of Process 8 . (gm) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Motion for Leave to Issue Subpoena to Pacific Maritime Association to Obtain Addresses Needed for Service of Process. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Damm, Jacqueline) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Damm, Jacqueline) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Notification of CM/ECF Account for Thomas A. Lidbury (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: talidbury. Go to the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Thomas A. Lidbury for Columbia Export Terminal, LLC,. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5673929 issued. Signed on 12/18/2018 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (ecp) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Thomas A. Lidbury . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5673929. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Damm, Jacqueline) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Summons Issued Electronically as to The International Longshore and Warehouse Union. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jtj) (Main Document 3 replaced on 12/18/2018) (sss). (Entered: 12/18/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Court Filing
                      Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 4/17/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/17/2019. Pretrial Order is due by 5/17/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (jtj) (Entered: 12/18/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                        Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5672667 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: No. Filed by Columbia Export Terminal, LLC against All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Attachment, # 2 Attachment, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Proposed Summons). (Damm, Jacqueline) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 3 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?