Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund v. Ferreira Construction Co., Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-12584
District Judge Denise J. Casper, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 7, 2019 at 11:49 PM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Massachusetts Laborers' Annuity Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sasha N. Gillin +1 617 742 0208 sgillin@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sasha N. Gillin +1 617 742 0208 sgillin@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Massachusetts Laborers' Legal Services Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sasha N. Gillin +1 617 742 0208 sgillin@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sasha N. Gillin +1 617 742 0208 sgillin@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
No Logo New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Segal Roitman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sasha N. Gillin +1 617 742 0208 sgillin@segalroitman.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne R. Sills +1 617 742 0208 +1 617 742 2187 asills@segalroitman.com
v.
No Logo Ferreira Construction Co., Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1132
Nature of Suit 791 - Labor: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SUMMONS Returned Executed Ferreira Construction Co., Inc. served on 12/20/2018, answer due 1/10/2019. (Sills, Anne) (Entered: 01/09/2019)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE of Appearance by Sasha N. Gillin on behalf of Massachusetts Laborers' Annuity Fund, Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, Massachusetts Laborers' Legal Services Fund, Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund, New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund (Gillin, Sasha) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Summons Issued as to Ferreira Construction Co., Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McKillop, Matthew) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 12/17/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          COMPLAINT against Ferreira Construction Co., Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7456907 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Massachusetts Laborers' Annuity Fund, Massachusetts Laborers' Health and Welfare Fund, Massachusetts Laborers' Legal Services Fund, Massachusetts Laborers' Pension Fund, New England Laborers' Training Trust Fund. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet & Title Sheet)(Sills, Anne) (Attachment 3 replaced on 12/17/2018) (McKillop, Matthew). (Entered: 12/17/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 21 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?