Breakaway Solut. IPO v. Breakaway Solutions
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-06397
District Judge Shira A. Scheindlin, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 8, 2019 at 5:46 AM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo CBZ, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Menachem E. Lifshitz +1 212 779 1414 lifshitz@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Egleston Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Gregory Michael Egleston +1 212 683 3400 +1 212 683 3402 greg.egleston@gmail.com
No Logo Jerry Loew, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo John R. Longman, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Safirstein Metcalf LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY PETER GEORGE SAFIRSTEIN +1 212 201 2845 +1 212 201 2858 psafirstein@safirsteinmetcalf.com
No Logo Mohammad Tariq, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Shamim Tariq, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Tim Conners, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
v.
No Logo Breakaway Solutions, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Christopher H. Greendale, Defendant
No Logo Deutsche Banc Securities, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Joel M. Mitnick +1 212 839 5300 +1 212 839 5599 jmitnick@sidley.com
No Logo Deutsche Bank Alex B, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Joel M. Mitnick +1 212 839 5300 +1 212 839 5599 jmitnick@sidley.com
No Logo Gordon Brooks, Defendant
No Logo Kevin Comerford, Defendant
Lehman Brothers, Inc. Lehman Brothers, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Lehman Abs Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Moses Silverman +1 212 315 3082

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Debra Lee Bogo-Ernst

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew Emanuel Tauber +1 202 263 3324 +1 202 263 5324 atauber@mayerbrown.com
No Logo Morgan Stanley & Co., Defendant
No Logo Burkhard Adrian, Movant
No Logo Gary L. Howell, Movant
No Logo Leila M. Thompson, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Safirstein Metcalf LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY PETER GEORGE SAFIRSTEIN +1 212 201 2845 +1 212 201 2858 psafirstein@safirsteinmetcalf.com
No Logo Scott NMN Levine, Movant
No Logo The Pepe Group, Movant
No Logo Gerald S. Platts, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo John Longman, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Marek Bartula, Intervenor Plaintiff
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 77
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (45) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/25/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT, Settleing action. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/24/09) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Right to Appeal)(dt) (Entered: 11/30/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    *STIPULATION AND ORDER; the Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement with Defendant Issuers and Individuals submitted to the Court on 6/10/04, is hereby terminated pursuant to Paragraph 39 of the Proposed Partial Settlement. However, pursuant to Paragraph 40 of the Proposed Partial Settlement, that paragraph, and the paragraphs referred to therein, shall survive the termination of the Proposed Partial Settlement. This Stipulation resolves 5527 MOTION to Approve of Class action settlement. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this motion. This Document Relates to: All cases listed on Schedule 1. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/25/07)... Document Relates to: 01-5333, 01-5644, 01-10050, 01-5570, 01-5902, 01-9413, 01-10639, 01-10161, 01-6747, 01-6000, 01-11235, 01-9742, 01-9741, 01-9982, 01-2359, 01-6275, 01-10901, 01-9422, 01-5258, 01-6825, 01-3360, 01-6890, 01-9618, 01-5446, 01-3363, 01-10000, 01-10827, 01-6241, 01-9883, 01-6824, 01-10629, 01-6397, 01-6613, 01-6216, 01-6323, 01-5143, 01-6271, 01-2601, 01-5072, 01-11220, 01-10940, 01-10988, 01-5937, 01-10576, 01-6222, 016322, 01-10971, 01-5575, 01-6828, 01-10943, 01-10686, 01-3857, 01-10105, 01-5834, 01-6542, 01-7000, 01-10944, 01-10107, 01-11219, 01-7180, 01-5425, 01-9747, 01-3792, 01-4942, 01-11231, 01-6887, 01-7355, 01-9619, 01-5948, 02-9699, 01-3980, 01-5838, 01-7467, 01-6158, 01-9411, 01-9414, 01-5089, 01-6775, 01-8404, 01-7002, 01-5911, 01-9800, 01-9516, 01-10684, 01-4973, 01-11246, 01-6143, 01-7055, 01-6948, 01-10164, 01-10813, 01-7048, 01-10738, 01-10111, 01-10640, 01-7039, 01-5039, 01-10884, 01-7023, 01-10741, 01-6339, 01-6771, 01-9748, 01-7033, 01-9743, 01-10122, 01-6272, 01-6842, 01-6277, 01-9975, 01-9710, 01-9922, 01-10834, 01-10836, 01-10800,01-10969,01-6120,01-10108,01-6084, 01-3975, 01-10974, 01-5144, 01-4187, 01-10598, 01-9917, 01-9349, 01-5365, 01-6892, 01-4974, 01-9417, 01-10983, 01-10740, 01-10899, 01-6822, 01-6822, 01-7666, 01-9442, 01-7046, 01-10121, 01-9440, 01-4147, 01-6770, 01-6661, 01-6872, 01-11000, 01-3483, 01-3225, 01-10900, 01-7053, 01-6757, 01-10990, 01-7034, 01-6627, 01-11230, 01-6301, 01-7726, 01-9651, 01-9799, 01-6823, 01-7201, 01-4183, 01-3910, 01-5374, 01-6689, 01-9675, 01-5227, 01-7028, 01-5332, 01-9798, 01-7035, 01-7281, 01-11239, 01-10894, 01-6089, 01-3358, 01-5822, 01-6004, 01-10823, 01-10945, 01-7280, 01-9561, 01-7344, 01-6660, 01-10775, 01-6114, 01-7842, 01-5354, 01-9560, 01-7032, 01-9744, 01-9904, 01-10051, 01-9918, 01-10799, 01-10575, 01-4778, 01-6873, 01-11217, 01-11202, 01-10185, 01-5613, 01-10797, 01-10828, 01-6820, 01-2621, 01-6160, 01-10059, 01-7279, 01-2261, 01-11201, 01-9504, 01-6082, 01-8401, 01-10867, 01-10745, 01-9503, 01-10160, 01-9978, 01-10898, 01-10683, 01-5427, 01-2712, 01-6090, 01-10942, 01-10120, 01-10140, 01-11245, 01-5225, 01-6128, 01-6950, 01-10754, 01-9746, 01-7415, 01-4941, 01-10831, 01-10903, 01-11218, 01-5600, 01-10596, 01-6870, 01-10838, 01-10941, 01-9921, 01-10753, 01-4186, 01-6846, 01-7181, 01-6821, 01-10756, 01-10595, 01-6001, 01-7474, 01-5267, 01-9500, 01-11249, 01-9797, 01-6288, 01-7247, 01-10970, 01-6110, 01-10822, 01-6008, 01-10976, 01-5269, 01-6492, 01-10115, 01-9981, 01-9563, 01-9719, 01-10744, 01-9348, 01-9604, 01-242, 01-10889, 01-9745, 01-5739, 01-10999, 01-3450, 01-9558, 01-5241, 01-9720, 01-10040, 01-6403, 01-6906, 01-9514, 01-7866, 01-10092, 01-10053, 01-6768, 01-10830, 01-6365, 01-10638, 01-4779, 01-10866, 01-10972, 01-10075, 01-10984, 01-5074, 01-7669... (Original Document filed in 21-mc-92, Doc#5620).(sac)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF OMNIBUS MOTION FOR INTERVENTION; the Class members listed on Exhibit 1 to this Notice hereby withdraw, without prejudice to renewal, their Omnibus Motion for Intervention (Doc. No. 5191 on Dkt. 21 MC 92) that was filed on 9/2/03. This Document Relates to: 01cv5902; 01cv2359; 01cv10901; 01cv3360; 01cv6890; 01cv5446; 01cv2858; 01cv10827; 01cv9883; 01cv6397; 01cv6613; 01cv6271; 01cv10839; 01cv5937; 01cv6222; 01cv7669; 01cv10971; 01cv5575; 01cv7044; 01cv10943; 01cv10686; 01cv10105; 01cv5834; 01cv6542; 01cv7000; 01cv10944; 01cv3792; 01cv4942; 01cv11231; 01cv6887; 01cv5948; 01cv6242; 01cv7467; 01cv9411; 01cv9414; 01cv6775; 01cv5911; 01cv11246; 01cv7055; 01cv6948; 01cv10164; 01cv10813; 01cv7048; 01cv10738; 01cv10640; 01cv10884; 01cv10741; 01cv6339; 01cv6771; 01cv9743; 01cv6272; 01cv6842; 01cv6277; 01cv9922; 01cv10969; 01cv6084; 01cv3975; 01cv7654; 01cv9917; 01cv9349; 01cv7974; 01cv9417; 01cv10740; 01;cv9442; 01cv4147; 01cv6661; 01cv3483; 01cv6757; 01cv10990; 01cv6627; 01cv7726; 01cv9651; 01cv4183; 01cv3910; 01cv7028; 01cv5332; 01cv9798; 01cv11239; 01cv6089; 01cv6004; 01cv10823; 01cv10945; 01cv7280; 01cv10775; 01cv5354; 01cv7032; 01cv9744; 01cv9904; 01cv11217; 01cv10185; 01cv7279; 01cv2261; 01cv6082; 01cv10867; 01cv10160; 01cv10898; 01cv10683; 01cv2712; 01cv6090; 01cv10942; 01cv10120; 01cv11245; 01cv5225; 01cv6950; 01cv9746; 01cv7415; 01cv4941; 01cv10831; 01cv5600; 01cv10941; 01cv9921; 01cv4186; 01cv6846; 01cv6821; 01cv7474; 01cv5267; 01cv6288; 01cv7247; 01cv6110; 01cv10822; 01cv6008; 01cv5269; 01cv9563; 01cv9348; 01cv9604; 01cv5739; 01cv10999; 01cv3450; 01cv5241; 01cv9720; 01cv10040; 01cv6906; 01cv9514; 01cv10833; 01cv10092; 01cv10053; 01cv6768; 01cv10830; 01cv10638; 01cv4779; 01cv5074. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 9/30/04)... Original Document filed in 21-mc-92, Doc#5367. (sac, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/9/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Notice of firm name change, effective 6/1/04, Hale and Dorr merged with Wilmer, Cutler, Pickering, L.L.P.. The new name of the firm is Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP our mailing addresses, telephone numbers and facsimile numbers remain the same. Our e-mails addresses have changed to jeffrey.rudman@wilmerhale.com; michell.miller@wilmerhale.com; john.batter@wilmerhale com; william.paine@wilmerhale.com and joanne.monteavaro@wilmerhale.com. (Entered: 06/10/2004)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: MOTION, Doc#5191, (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) to Intervene. Original Document filed in 21mc92, Doc#5279. (sac, )
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/4/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) to Intervene. Document filed by Marek Bartula. Original Document filed in 21 MC 92, Doc#5195. (sac, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/4/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              NOTICE OF OMNIBUS MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) to Intervene EACH CLASS MEMBER named on Exhibit 1 attached to Memorandum of Law in Support, as class plaintiffs in those coordinated actions. This Document Relates to: 01cv5902; 01cv2359; 01cv10901; 01cv3360; 01cv6890; 01cv5446; 01cv2858; 01cv10827; 01cv9883; 01cv6397; 01cv6613; 01cv6271; 01cv10839; 01cv5937; 01cv6222; 01cv7669; 01cv10971; 01cv5575; 01cv7044; 01cv10943; 01cv10686; 01cv10105; 01cv5834; 01cv6542; 01cv7000; 01cv10944; 01cv3792; 01cv4942; 01cv11231; 01cv6887; 01cv6242; 01cv7467; 01cv9411; 01cv9414; 01cv6775; 01cv5911; 01cv11246; 01cv7055; 01cv6948; 01cv10164; 01cv10813; 01cv7084; 01cv10738; 01cv10640; 01cv10884; 01cv10741; 01cv6339; 01cv6771; 01cv9743; 01cv62672; 01cv6842; 01cv6277; 01cv9922; 01cv10969; 01cv6084; 01cv3975; 01cv7654; 01cv9917; 01cv9349; 01cv 7974; 01cv9417; 01cv 10740; 01cv992; 01cv4147; 01cv6661; 01cv3483; 01cv6757; 01cv10990; 01cv6627; 01cv7726; 01cv9651; 01cv4183; 01cv3910; 01cv7028; 01cv5332; 01cv9798; 01cv11239; 01cv6089; 01cv6004; 01cv10823; 01cv10945; 01cv7280; 01cv10775; 01cv5354; 01cv7032; 01cv9744; 01cv9904; 01cv11217; 01cv10185; 01cv7279; 01cv2261; 01cv6082; 01cv10867; 01cv10160; 01cv10898; 01cv10683; 01cv2712; 01cv6090; 01cv10942; 01cv10120; 01cv11245; 01cv5225; 01cv6950; 01cv9746; 01cv7415; 01cv4941; 01cv10831; 01cv5600; 01cv10941; 01cv9921; 01cv4186; 01cv6846; 01cv6821; 01cv7474; 01cv5267; 01cv6288; 01cv7247; 01cv6110; 01cv10822; 01cv6008; 01cv5269; 01cv9563; 01cv9348; 01cv9604; 01cv5739; 01cv10999; 01cv3450; 01cv5241; 01cv9720; 01cv10040; 01cv6906; 01cv9514; 01cv10833; 01cv10092; 01cv10053; 01cv6768; 01cv10830; 01cv10638; 01cv4779; 01cv5074. Origianl Document filed in 21MC92, Doc#5191. Document filed by Marek Bartula. (sac, )
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/29/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ANSWER by Morgan Stanley & Co. to [19-1] amended complaint . (Attorney Andrew B. Clubok Firm of Kirkland & Ellis, LLP) (sac) (Entered: 10/20/2003)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  ANSWER by Deutsche Banc, Deutsche Bank Alex B to [19-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Joel M. Mitnick from the Sidley, Austin, Brown & Wood, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 09/16/2003)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    ANSWER by Lehman Brothers Inc. to [19-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Moses Silverman from the Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 08/07/2003)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      NOTICE of Firm Registration as an LLP and Name Change by Lehman Brothers, Inc. (sac) (Entered: 04/07/2003)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/31/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        NOTICE OF JOINDER of plaintiffs John R. Longman, Leila M. Thompson, purs. to FRCP 20. (rec'd in the night deposit box on 7/31/02 at 11:33 p.m.) (sac) (Entered: 08/22/2002)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Deutsche Banc by Lars Stevens, managing agent, on 4/24/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            MASTER ALLEGATIONS by Jerry Loew, Tim Conners, Shamim Tariq, Mohammad Tariq RE: Amended Complaint, doc.# 19, Filed on April 19, 2002. (ac)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              AMENDED COMPLAINT by Jerry Loew, Tim Conners, Shamim Tariq, Mohammad Tariq amending [1-1] complaint ; Summons issued. (ac) (Entered: 06/25/2002)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                OMNIBUS ORDER, Jerry Loew is hereby appointed as lead pltff and his selection of the Executive Committee to serve as Lead Counsel is approved. All other motions to be appointed lead pltff and for approval of lead counsel are hereby denied. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (orig. doc. filed in 21 mc 92, doc. #4319) (sac)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Case reopened. (dcap)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Consolidated Lead Case. (dcap)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      *** Removed MEMBER flag. Case no longer consolidated with 1:01-cv-06001. (dcap)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        CORRECTED CONSOLIDATION ORDER,... that all cases involving the Sycamore Networks, Inc. initial public offering in this IPO Securities Litigation, including case numbers 01-CV-6091, 01-CV-6400, 01-CV-6414, 01-CV-6527, 01-CV-6614, 01-CV-6921, 01-CV_7494, 01-CV-7552, 01-CV-7777, 01-CV-8181, 01-CV-8191, shall be consolidated into case number 01-CV-6001, and CBZ, Inc. v. Breakaway Solutions, Inc., et al., 01-CV-6397, shall be removed from consolidation with 01-CV-6001 and shall remain consolidated with Platts v. Morgan Stanley & Co., et al, 01-CV-6827, and Longman v. Breakaway Solutions, Inc., et al., 01-CV-6995, as the lead case. The Clerk of Court is hereby ordered to consolidate any future cases that are designated as related to 01-CV-6001,... the Clerk of Court is further Ordered to close all cases that have been so consolidated, subject to re-opening at a later date on proper application by a party... This Order corrects and supersedes any previous consolidation order filed in the dockets for case numbers 01-CV-6001, 01-CV-6091, 01-CV-6400, 01-CV-6414, 01-CV-6527, 01-CV-6614, 01-CV-6921, 01-CV-7494, 01-CV_7552, 01-CV-7777, 01-CV-8181, 01-CV-8191 ... ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. [Original filed in 1:01-cv-06001 Document No. 36. Document Docketed in 1:01-cv-06091; 1:01-cv-06397; 1:01-cv-06400; 1:01-cv-06414; 1:01-cv-06527; 1:01-cv-06614; 1:01-cv-06921; 1:01-cv-07494; 1:01-cv-07552; 1:01-cv-07777; 1:01-cv-08181; 1:01-cv-08191] (dcap) Modified on 04/10/2002
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/16/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY by Breakaway Solutions (db) (Entered: 01/18/2002)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            REVISED LIST OF CASES BY COUNSEL; purs. to Item I(A) of this Court's Order dated 8/8/01, Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP and Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP to appear as counsel for Deutsche Banc Alex. Brown, Inc. (sac) (Entered: 01/31/2002)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/1/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW by The Pepe Group in further support of the motion the Pepe Group for appointment as Lead Pltff and approval of selection of lead counsel. (rec'd in the night depsoit box on 10/1/01 at 11:39 p.m.) (sac) (Entered: 10/16/2001)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/24/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Burkhard Adrian, Scott Levine, Leila M. Thompson, Gary L. Howell in support of [14-1] motion for an order, appointment as Lead Pltffs, purs. to Section 27(a)(3)(B) of the Securities Act of 1933 and Section 21D(a)(3)(B) of the Securities Exchange Act of as amended by the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act of 1995, [14-2] motion for an order, approval of Movants' selection of Lead Counsel. (ICMSUSER) Modified on 10/24/2001 (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/24/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION by Burkhard Adrian, Scott Levine, Leila M. Thompson, Gary L. Howell for an order, appointment as Lead Pltffs, purs. to Section 27(a)(3)(B) of the Securities Act of 1933 and Section 21D(a)(3)(B) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934, as amended by the Private Securities Litigation Reform Act of 1995, for an order, approval of Movants' selection of Lead Counsel . Return date not indicated. (ICMSUSER) Modified on 10/24/2001 (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by the deft on whose behalf Morgan Stanley & Co. (ICMSUSER) Modified on 10/24/2001 (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/20/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      AFFIDAVIT of Joseph R. Seidman, Jr, Esq on behalf of movants John Herron, and Jerry Loew in support of [10-1] motion for an order consolidating this action with related cases, [10-2] motion for an order appointing movants as Lead Pltfs, [10-3] for an order approving movant's selection of Lead Counsel (ICMSUSER) Modified on 10/24/2001 (Entered: 10/11/2001)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/20/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW by movants John Herron, and Jerry Loew in support of [10-1] motion for an order consolidating this action with related cases, [10-2] motion for an order appointing movants as Lead Pltfs, [10-3] motion for an order approving movant's selection of Lead Counsel. (ICMSUSER) Modified on 10/24/2001 (Entered: 10/11/2001)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/20/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION by movants John Herron, and Jerry Loew for an order consolidating this action with related cases, for an order appointing movants as Lead Pltfs, for an order approving movant's selection of Lead Counsel . Return date not indicated. (ICMSUSER) Modified on 10/24/2001 (Entered: 10/11/2001)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Case closed. (dcap)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Consolidated Member Case. Lead Case Number: 1:01cv6001. (dcap)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                *** Removed LEAD flag. Case no longer consolidated. (dcap)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  ORDER, that all cases involving Sycamore Networks in this IPO Securities Litigation, as set forth in the attached Rider (1:01-cv-06091, 1:01-cv-06397, 1:01-cv-06400, 1:01-cv-6414, 1:01-cv-06527, 1:01-cv-06614, 1:01-cv-06921, 1:01-cv-07494, 1:01-cv-07552, 1:01-cv-07777, 1:01-cv-08181 and 1:01-cv-08191) shall be consolidated into case number 01 Civ. 6001. The Clerk of the Court is hereby ordered to consolidate any future cases that are designated as related to 01 Civ. 6001,... the Clerk of the Court is further ordered to close all cases that have been consolidated, subject to re-opening at a later date on proper application by a party ... ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. [Original filed in 1:01-cv-06001 Document No. 17. Document Docketed in 1:01-cv-06091; 1:01-cv-06397; 1:01-cv-06400; 1:01-cv-06414; 1:01-cv-06527; 1:01-cv-06614; 1:01-cv-06921; 1:01-cv-07494; 1:01-cv-07552; 1:01-cv-07777; 1:01-cv-08181; 1:01-cv-08191] (dcap)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons returned executed as to Lehman Brothers Inc. mailed on 8/14/01. Answer due on 10/15/01 for Lehman Brothers Inc. (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons returned executed as to Morgan Stanley & Co. mailed on 8/14/01. Answer due on 10/15/01 for Morgan Stanley & Co. (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/6/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by the deft on whose behalf Deutsche Banc. (ICMSUSER) Modified on 10/24/2001 (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/6/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by the deft on whose behalf Lehman Brothers Inc. (Received in the night deposit box on 9/6/01 at 9:14 pm.) (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Breakaway Solutions . (bai) (Entered: 09/20/2001)
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/4/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Consolidated Lead Case. (sac)
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/4/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER, that all cases against Breakaway Solutions in this IPO Securities Litigation, as set forth in the attached Rider (1:01-cv- 6827, 1:01-cv-6995) shall be consolidated into case number 01 Civ. 6397. The Clerk of the Court is ordered to consolidate any future cases filed against Breakaway Solutions subsequent to the date of this Order into lead case number 01 Civ. 6397. The Clerk of the Court further ordered to close all cases that have been consolidated, subject to re-opening at a later date on proper application by a party. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (sac) (Entered: 09/20/2001)
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Pretrial Conference set at 4:30 9/7/01 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (dcap)
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    Notice of Case Reassignment to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Copy of notice mailed to Attorney(s) of record. Pursuant to the Order of Chief Judge Mukasey dated August 8, 2001, the above entitled action is reassigned to the calendar of Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for inclusion in the coordinated pretrial proceedings being conducted by that judge. Two originals of all future documents submitted in this action are to be presented in the Clerk's Office for filing. One original is to be filed in this docket number and one original is to be filed in the miscellaneous case number 21mc92 (SAS). Each shall bear the original assigned judge's ( ) initials after the original docket number. Attached is a copy of Judge Mukasey's ORDER re: coordinating the proceedings before Judge Scheindlin. Also attached is a copy of Judge Scheindlin's ORDER re: set initial PTC 09/07/01 and directing all counsel to comply with Judge Scheindlin's requirements. [Original Orders docketed in 21mc92 (SAS) as documents numbers 1 and 2] (dcap) (Entered: 08/10/2001)
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/16/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by CBZ, Inc. (jco) (Entered: 07/18/2001)
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/16/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. (jco)
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/16/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 411726. (jco) (Entered: 07/18/2001)
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                            This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                            Space
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                             
                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                            Need Password Help?