United States v. GRANT
Criminal Case New Jersey District Court, Case No. 2:18-cr-00179

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 16, 2021 at 12:41 PM DT (1.8 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (57) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 3/16/2021, Entered: None Brief in Opposition
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 2/12/2021, Entered: None Letter
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 2/12/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 12/3/2020, Entered: None Brief in Opposition
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 8/12/2020, Entered: None Satisfaction of Judgment
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 2/7/2020, Entered: None Transcript
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Disclosure
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 2/6/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 2/5/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 1/31/2020, Entered: None Judgment
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 1/28/2020, Entered: None Sentencing
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Unseal Document
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: None Response in Opposition
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 1/27/2020, Entered: None Unseal Document
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 1/23/2020, Entered: None Telephone Conference
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/15/2020, Entered: None Submission Notice re Sentencing Materials
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/14/2020, Entered: None Submission Notice re Sentencing Materials
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                      SCHEDULING ORDER as to JERMAINE GRANT, LINCOLN WARRINGTON. Signed by Judge William J. Martini on 12/21/18. (gh, )
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None letter
                                        Letter re [47] Proposed Jury Instructions (LEVITT, RICHARD)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None proposed jury instructions
                                          Proposed Jury Instructions by USA as to JERMAINE GRANT, LINCOLN WARRINGTON (HONIG, RACHAEL)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None proposed voir dire
                                            Proposed Voir Dire by JERMAINE GRANT, LINCOLN WARRINGTON (LEVITT, RICHARD)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None proposed voir dire
                                              Proposed Voir Dire by USA as to JERMAINE GRANT, LINCOLN WARRINGTON (Attachments: # (1) Letter)(HONIG, RACHAEL)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Brief
                                                BRIEF by JERMAINE GRANT, LINCOLN WARRINGTON re [42] Joint Omnibus MOTION to Dismiss Indictment or Alternatively, to Suppress Evidence and Statements or, alternatively, to Order the Government to prepare a Redacted Indictment for use at Trial MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Suppress, [43] Appendix in Support to Motion,,, (LEVITT, RICHARD)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Appendix in Support to Motion
                                                  APPENDIX in Support by JERMAINE GRANT, LINCOLN WARRINGTON re [42] Joint Omnibus MOTION to Dismiss Indictment or Alternatively, to Suppress Evidence and Statements or, alternatively, to Order the Government to prepare a Redacted Indictment for use at Trial MOTION to Dismiss MOTION to Suppress (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Jermaine Grant, # (2) Affidavit of Lincoln Warrington, # (3) Exhibit Transcript Excerpt 11-15-2018, # (4) Exhibit Search Warrant, # (5) Affidavit Affidavit in support of Search Warrants, # (6) Exhibit Attachment A-1 & B-1 to Search Warrant, # (7) Exhibit Receipt for Property Seized, # (8) Exhibit Letter dated August 2, 2018 to Government, # (9) Exhibit Email Correspondence dated November, 2016, # (10) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(LEVITT, RICHARD)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Omnibus Motion
                                                    Joint Omnibus MOTION to Dismiss Indictment or Alternatively, to Suppress Evidence and Statements or, alternatively, to Order the Government to prepare a Redacted Indictment for use at Trial, MOTION to Dismiss, MOTION to Suppress by JERMAINE GRANT, LINCOLN WARRINGTON. (LEVITT, RICHARD)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William J. Martini:Status Conference as to JERMAINE GRANT, LINCOLN WARRINGTON held on 11/15/2018 (Court Reporter/Recorder Laurie Engemann.) (gh, )
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to TravelCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER granting [38] Motion to Travel as to LINCOLN WARRINGTON (2) and JERMAINE GRANT provided they provide their Pre-Trial Officers their itinerary prior to the travel. Signed by Judge William J. Martini on 11/13/18. (gh, )
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None letter
                                                          Letter from Gerald B. Lefcourt (LEFCOURT, GERALD)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Notice of hearing
                                                            NOTICE OF HEARING as to JERMAINE GRANT, LINCOLN WARRINGTON set for 11/15/2018 12:30 PM before Judge William J. Martini. (gh, ) Modified on 11/2/2018 (gh).
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None transcriptCourt Filing
                                                              Transcript of Status Conference as to JERMAINE GRANT, LINCOLN WARRINGTON held on October 18, 2018, before Judge William J. Martini. Court Reporter: Joanne Sekella (908-310-1177). Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter only. (jml, )
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None letter
                                                                Letter from Gerald B. Lefcourt and Richard Levitt re [35] Letter (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(LEFCOURT, GERALD)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None letter
                                                                  Letter from Goverment re Proposed Trial Schedule Order (Attachments: # (1) attachment)(MAHONEY, MARGARET)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/18/2018, Entered: None Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William J. Martini:Status Conference as to JERMAINE GRANT, LINCOLN WARRINGTON held on 10/18/2018 (Court Reporter/Recorder Joanne Sekella.) (gh, )
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None letter
                                                                      Letter from Gerald B. Lefcourt and Richard Levitt (LEFCOURT, GERALD)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Notice of hearing
                                                                        NOTICE OF HEARING as to JERMAINE GRANT, LINCOLN WARRINGTON Status Conference re-scheduled for 10/18/2018 11:30 AM before Judge William J. Martini. (gh, )
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER scheduling discovery as to JERMAINE GRANT, LINCOLN WARRINGTON, ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice - Time excluded from 8/15/18 until 10/17/18; Status Conference scheduled for 10/17/18 at 10AM. Signed by Judge William J. Martini on 8/15/18. (gh, )
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: None Order to Continue - Ends of JusticeCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to JERMAINE GRANT, LINCOLN WARRINGTON Time excluded from 7/17/18 until 10/17/18. Signed by Judge William J. Martini on 7/17/18. (gh, )
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William J. Martini:Status Conference as to JERMAINE GRANT, LINCOLN WARRINGTON held on 7/17/2018 (Court Reporter/Recorder Jackie Kashmer.) (gh, )
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER waiving the appearance of JERMAINE GRANT and LINCOLN WARRINGTON at the Status Conference scheduled for 7/17/18. Signed by Judge William J. Martini on 7/16/18. (gh, )
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None letter
                                                                                  Letter from Gerald Lefcourt and Richard Levitt (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Order [proposed])(FRIEDMAN, FAITH)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/22/2018, Entered: None order setting conditions of releaseCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER MODIFYING Conditions of Release as to JERMAINE GRANT. All previously imposed conditions remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 5/22/18. (jl, )
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None notice of attorney appearance - defendant
                                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: FAITH A. FRIEDMAN appearing for JERMAINE GRANT, LINCOLN WARRINGTON (FRIEDMAN, FAITH)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None letter
                                                                                        Letter from Gerald B. Lefcourt (LEFCOURT, GERALD)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None motion to modify conditions of release
                                                                                          MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release (granting additional time to post security) by JERMAINE GRANT, LINCOLN WARRINGTON. (LEVITT, RICHARD)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER TO DISCLOSE TAX RETURN INFORMATION. Signed by Judge William J. Martini on 5/8/18. (gh, )
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                              PROTECTIVE ORDER ON CONSENT as to JERMAINE GRANT, LINCOLN WARRINGTON. Signed by Judge William J. Martini on 5/8/18. (gh, )
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                COMPLEX CASE ORDER as to JERMAINE GRANT, LINCOLN WARRINGTON. Signed by Judge William J. Martini on 5/8/18. (gh, )
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None arraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William J. Martini:Arraignments as to JERMAINE GRANT (1) Count 1,2,3,4,5,6 and LINCOLN WARRINGTON (2) Count 1 held on 5/8/2018, Pleas of Not Guilty to all counts of the Indictment entered by both defendants. (Court Reporter/Recorder Joanne Sekella.) (gh, )
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None bond
                                                                                                    Appearance Bond entered as to JERMAINE GRANT in amount of $2,000,000. (LM, )
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None order setting conditions of releaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                      ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to JERMAINE GRANT (1) $2,000,000 Appearance Bond secured by property; defendant has two weeks to secure property approved by Pretrial Services, etc. (Finance notified) Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark Falk on 4/25/18. (LM, )
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None initial appearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mark Falk:Initial Appearance as to JERMAINE GRANT held on 4/25/2018, defendant advised of rights; Bond Hearing as to JERMAINE GRANT held on 4/25/2018, Bond set as to JERMAINE GRANT (1) $2,000,000 Appearance Bond secured by property, etc. (CD #ECR.) (LM, )
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Case Unsealed
                                                                                                          Case unsealed as to JERMAINE GRANT, LINCOLN WARRINGTON. (LM, )
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None arrest
                                                                                                            Arrest of JERMAINE GRANT, LINCOLN WARRINGTON. (LM, )
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Order to Seal CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                              Order to Seal Case as to JERMAINE GRANT, LINCOLN WARRINGTON.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Mannion on 4/5/18. (dc, )
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Indictment (Sealed)
                                                                                                                SEALED INDICTMENT as to JERMAINE GRANT (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, LINCOLN WARRINGTON (2) count(s) 1. (dc, )
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Notice of Allocation and Assignment
                                                                                                                  Notice of Allocation and Assignment as to JERMAINE GRANT, LINCOLN WARRINGTON (Newark - Judge William J. Martini). (dc, )
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?