COHEN v. GOLDIN, et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:94-cv-03726-SSB
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo STEVE COHEN, Plaintiff

Represented by Barrack, Rodos & Bacine

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space SAMUEL ROBBINS SIMON +1 856 354 0707
v.
No Logo KENNETH GOLDIN, Defendant

Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ROBERT ALAN WHITE +1 609 919 6600 rwhite@morganlewis.com
No Logo PAUL GOLDIN, Defendant

Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ROBERT ALAN WHITE +1 609 919 6600 rwhite@morganlewis.com
No Logo THE SCORE BOARD, INC., Defendant

Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ROBERT ALAN WHITE +1 609 919 6600 rwhite@morganlewis.com
Attributes
Office Camden
Filed 8/3/1994
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause Unknown
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Camden
Terminated 11/8/1995
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BG, CLOSED, RULE16
Timeline
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 11/8/1995, Entered: 11/8/1995 Terminated Case
Case closed (bf)
LREF
Blank 7 Filed: 11/6/1995, Entered: 11/8/1995 Order
FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER, dismissing action with prejudice ( signed by Magistrate Joel B. Rosen ) (bf)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 10/11/1994, Entered: 10/11/1994 Set/Clear Flags
Consolidated Member Case . Lead Case Number: 1:cv94-3719 (mgr)
LREF
Blank 6 Filed: 10/3/1994, Entered: 10/11/1994 Order
PRETRIAL ORDER (Copy) NO. 1: Designating 94cv3719 as the MASTER FILE AND DOCKET with the new title "In re The Score Board Inc. Securities Litigation", directing the consolidation of this case with the LEAD CASE 94cv3719; and directing documents captioned "All Actions" to be docketed under Master Docket, etc. ( signed by Magistrate Joel B. Rosen ) (See 94cv3719 for original order). (mgr)
LREF
Blank 5 Filed: 8/31/1994, Entered: 8/31/1994 Order
ORDER, set scheduling conference for 10:00 10/18/94 ( signed by Magistrate Robert B. Kugler ) (bf)
LREF
Blank 4 Filed: 8/23/1994, Entered: 8/30/1994 Application and Clerk's Order to extend time to an
APPLICATION by KENNETH GOLDIN, PAUL GOLDIN, THE SCORE BOARD, INC and Clerk's Order extending time to answer. Answer due 9/26/94 for THE SCORE BOARD, INC, for PAUL GOLDIN, for KENNETH GOLDIN (bf)
LREF
Blank 3 Filed: 8/16/1994, Entered: 8/17/1994 Letter
LETTER by pltf. requesting issuance of summons (bf)
LREF
Blank -- Filed: 8/16/1994, Entered: 8/17/1994 Summons Issued
SUMMONS(ES) issued for KENNETH GOLDIN, PAUL GOLDIN, THE SCORE BOARD, INC ( 20 Days) (Mailed to Counsel) (bf)
LREF
Blank 2 Filed: 8/3/1994, Entered: 8/4/1994 Case Assigned/Reassigned
NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate ROBERT B. KUGLER (ar1)
LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 8/3/1994, Entered: 8/4/1994 Complaint
COMPLAINT filed; jury demand FILING FEE $ 120.00 RECEIPT # 192993 (ar1)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 55 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?