United States v. Kenny-Greenwood
Federal Civil Lawsuit Montana District Court, Case No. 9:17-cv-00159
District Judge Dana L. Christensen, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 10, 2019 at 12:07 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Casey S. Smith +1 202 307 0715 +1 202 514 6770 Casey.S.Smith@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Joshua Kenny-Greenwood, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Joshua Kenny-Greenwood

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua Kenny-Greenwood
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7402
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 10/1/2018. (ASG) Modified on 10/1/2018 to indicate mailed to Kenny-Greenwood. (ASG).
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER: Respondent shall comply with the IRS summons as directed by the IRS.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing scheduled for February 15, 2018, is VACATED. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 2/13/2018. Copy mailed to Kenny-Greenwood. (ASG) (Entered: 02/13/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Defense in opposition to Reply to Response to Petition by Joshua Kenny-Greenwood re 9 . (ASG) Modified on 2/8/2018 to reflect that a thumb drive was also received and sent to chambers. (ASG). (Entered: 02/08/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Reply to Response to Petition re 1 Petition to Enforce IRS Summons filed by United States of America. (Smith, Casey) (Modified to amend docket text.) (NOS) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Brief in Response to Order re 6 Order Setting by Joshua Kenny-Greenwood. (Attachments: # 1 Ex A - Church Establishment Aff, # 2 Ex B - Mail Receipts, # 3 Ex C - Church Freedom, # 4 Ex D - Atheist Lawsuit, # 5 Ex E - Presidential Executive Order, # 6 Ex F - NSA Article, # 7 Ex G - Judicial Watch Article, # 8 Ex H - IRS manual detail, # 9 Ex I - Idaho article, # 10 Ex J - Time article, # 11 Ex K - Govt claims power, # 12 Ex L - Lerner email, # 13 Ex M - FBI texts, # 14 Ex N - White evangelicals, # 15 Ex O - Part 1 - 1986 Code, # 16 Ex P - The New Thought Police, # 17 Ex Q - SkyNet, # 18 Ex R - Behind the Curtain, # 19 Ex S - The Computers are Listening, # 20 Ex T - Source Code, # 21 Ex U - Spies) **A thumb drive was also received by the Clerk's Office and sent to chambers. (ASG) (Entered: 01/08/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            USM 285: Order and docs 1-4 USM Return Executed on 12/26/2017. (ASG) (Entered: 12/28/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              Order Setting: Show Cause Hearing set for 2/15/2018 at 01:30 PM in Missoula, MT before Judge Dana L. Christensen. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 12/4/2017. Copies provided to USM with 285. (ASG) (Entered: 12/04/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Submission of Proposed Order to Show Cause re: 1 Petition to Enforce IRS Summons. (Smith, Casey) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION re 1 Petition to Enforce IRS Summons of IRS Revenue Officer Aspen Cruise by United States of America. (Smith, Casey) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION re 1 Petition to Enforce IRS Summons of IRS Revenue Agent William Young by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - IRS Summons dated July 18, 2017, to Joshua Kenny-Greenwood) (Smith, Casey) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Brief/Memorandum in Support re 1 Petition to Enforce IRS Summons filed by United States of America. (Smith, Casey) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        PETITION to Enforce IRS Summons, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (APP) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 6 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?