Integrated Syst. IPO v. Integrated Systems
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-06120
District Judge Shira A. Scheindlin, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 10, 2019 at 6:59 AM ST (2.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Aliza Brody, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by WeissLaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph Harry Weiss +1 212 682 3025 +1 212 682 3010 jweiss@weisslawllp.com
No Logo Carole Groux, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Daniel J. Field, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Donald Ormond, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Herry Kurniawan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Piyush Bhargava, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Suzanne Privette, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
v.
No Logo Alan Hald, Defendant
No Logo Daniel Foreman, Defendant
No Logo Daniel Roche, Defendant
No Logo David Wirthlin, Defendant
No Logo DB Alex. Brown, Defendant
No Logo Fleetboston Robertson Stephens Inc., Defendant
No Logo Hambrecht & Quist, Defendant
No Logo Integrated Information Systems, Inc., Defendant
No Logo James G. Garvey, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Keith Walz, Defendant
No Logo Legg Mason Wood Walker, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Legg Mason Wood Walker, Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Dionna K. Litvin +1 215 751 2590 +1 215 751 2205
No Logo Robert Baird, Defendant
No Logo Robert W Baird & Co Inc, Defendant
Officially listed as "Robert W. Baird & Co. Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison Cohen LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Yehuda David Scharf +1 212 735 8604 +1 212 735 8708 dscharf@morrisoncohen.com
No Logo Robertson Stephens, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Brendan Joseph Dowd +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 bdowd@omm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew Jay Frackman +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 afrackman@omm.com
No Logo Stephen Lindstrom, Defendant
U.S. Bancorp Piper Jaffray, Inc. U.S. Bancorp Piper Jaffray, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Dean M. Jeske +1 312 832 4500 +1 312 832 4700 djeske@foley.com
No Logo Anthony Peri, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY David Avi Rosenfeld +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 drosenfeld@rgrdlaw.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SEEGER WEISS LP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY David R. Buchanan +1 212 584 0700 +1 212 584 0799 DBuchanan@SeegerWeiss.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen A. Weiss +1 212 584 0700 +1 212 584 0799 sweiss@seegerweiss.com
No Logo Bruce Reynolds, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Menachem E. Lifshitz +1 212 779 1414 lifshitz@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Egleston Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Gregory Michael Egleston +1 212 683 3400 +1 212 683 3402 greg.egleston@gmail.com
No Logo Jimmy K.V. Chin, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Gustavo Fabian Bruckner +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 gfBruckner@pomlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Frederick Taylor Isquith, Sr +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653 isquith@whafh.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Gregory Mark Nespole +1 212 545 4657 +1 212 545 4693 nespole@whafh.com
No Logo Robert M. Thacker, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Strull Strull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stull, Stull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Tzivia Brody +1 212 687 7230

Toggle Switch Represented by WeissLaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph Harry Weiss +1 212 682 3025 +1 212 682 3010 jweiss@weisslawllp.com
No Logo Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Consolidated Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker Botts, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Douglas W. Henkin +1 212 408 2520 +1 212 259 2520 douglas.henkin@bakerbotts.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Mitchell Silberberg & Knupp LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY David B. Gordon +1 917 546 7701 +1 917 546 7671 dbg@msk.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Joel M. Mitnick +1 212 839 5300 +1 212 839 5599 jmitnick@sidley.com
No Logo J.P. Morgan Sec., Consolidated Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph M. McLaughlin +1 212 455 2000 jmclaughlin@stblaw.com
No Logo Lehman Brothers, Consolidated Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Moses Silverman +1 212 315 3082

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Debra Lee Bogo-Ernst

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew Emanuel Tauber +1 202 263 3324 +1 202 263 5324 atauber@mayerbrown.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 77
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT settling action. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/24/09) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Right to Appeal)(dt) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL; The following related actions are dismissed without prejudice as to the individual defendants listed on Schedule 1, and dismissed pursuant to the Opinion and Order dated 2/19/03, as the individual defendants listed on Schedule 2. The dismissal of the related actions is without costs to the individual defendants listed on Schedules 1 and 2. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 1/22/09) This Document Relates to: 01cv2359, 01cv3225, 01cv3360, 01cv3910, 01cv5143, 01cv5644, 01cv5838, 01cv6000, 01cv6008, 01cv6120, 01cv6271, 01cv6277, 01cv6322, 01cv6747, 01cv6846, 01cv6870, 01cv7002, 01cv7046, 01cv7247, 01cv7344, 01cv9618, 01cv9651, 01cv9797, 01cv9799, 01cv9800, 01cv10040, 01cv10051, 01cv10075, 01cv10092, 01cv10108, 01cv10140, 01cv10161, 01cv10738, 01cv10753, 01cv10838, 01cv10867, 01cv10884, 01cv11230, 01cv11234.(sac) (sac) (Entered: 01/27/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      STIPULATION AND ORDER that the Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement with defendant Issuers and Individuals submitted to the Court on 6/10/4, is hereby terminated purs to Paragraph 39 of the Proposed Partial Settlement. However, purs to paragraph 40 of the Proposed Partial Settlement, that paragraph, and the paragraphs referred to therein, shall survive the termination of the Proposed Partial Settlement. This Stipulation resolves (5527) Motion to Approve of Class action settlement. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this motion. This document relates to: All cases listed on Schedule I. (orig fld in 21mc92, #5620). (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/25/07) (cd)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      MOTION TO REMOVE MILBERG WEISS AND BERSHAD AS LEAD COUNSEL IN THE IPO SECURITIES LITIGATION. Document filed by Theodore A. Bechtold, Esq.. This Document Relates to the following Actions: 01-242, 01-2261, 01-2359, 01-2712, 01-3358, 01-3910, 01-3975, 01-4779, 01-4942, 01-5072, 01-5269, 01-5332, 01-5427, 01-5575, 01-5613, 01-5644, 01-5739, 01-5911, 01-6000, 01-6001, 01-6004, 01-6084, 01-6090, 01-6120, 01-6143, 01-6277, 01-6288, 01-6322, 01-6339, 01-6365, 01-6542, 01-6613, 01-6661, 01-6768, 01-6820, 01-6890, 01-6892, 01-7000, 01-7032, 01-7033, 01-7048, 01-7055, 01-7467, 01-8401, 01-9417, 01-9504, 01-9561, 01-9604, 01-9747, 01-9883, 01-9917, 01-9975, 01-10000, 01-10121, 01-10598, 01-10639, 01-10684, 01-10740, 01-10741, 01-10813, 01-10822, 01-10831, 01-10898, 01-10899, 01-10903, 01-10943, 01-11202, 01-11219, 01-11239... Original Document filed in 21-mc-92, Doc#5588.(sac)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/8/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ANSWER to Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint for violations of The Federal Security Laws. Document filed by Robert W. Baird & Co. Incorporated. This Document Relates to 01Civ.6120, Doc#5208 Related document: 14 Amended Complaint filed by Carole Groux, Piyush Bhargava, Donald Ormond, Suzanne Privette, Herry Kurniawan, Daniel J. Field.(sac, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/4/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ORDER ADMITTING ATTORNEY David Smith, Theresa E.Loscalzo and Dionna K. Litvin to appear PRO HAC VICE as counsel for Legg Mason Wood Walker, Inc. This Document Relates to: 01cv5227; 01cv6120; 01cv9348. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 7/31/03). Original Document filed in 21mc92, Doc#5174. (sac, )
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/23/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ANSWER by U.S. Bancorp Piper to [14-1] amended complaint . (Attorney Dean M. Jeske from the Firm: Foley & Lardner). (sac) (Entered: 09/22/2003)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              ANSWER by Deutsche Bank to [14-1] amended complaint . (Attorney Joel M. Mitnick from the Sidley, Austin, Brown & Wood, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 09/19/2003)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ANSWER by Robertson Stephens to [14-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Brendan Joseph Dowd from the O'Melveny & Myers, LLP)... rec'd in the night deposit box on 7/21/03 at 7:28 p.m. (sac) (Entered: 08/21/2003)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  ANSWER by J.P. Morgan Sec. to [14-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Joseph M. McLaughlin from the Simpson, Thacher & Bartlett, LLP)... rec'd in the night deposit box on 7/21/03 at 6:43 p.m. (sac) (Entered: 08/14/2003)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    ANSWER by Lehman Brothers to [14-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Moses Silverman from the Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 08/07/2003)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      ANSWER by Legg Mason Wood to [14-1] amended complaint . (Attorney Dionna K. Litvin from the Firm: Schnader, Harrison, Segal & Lewis, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 07/25/2003)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        NOTICE of Firm Registration as an LLP and Name Change by Lehman Brothers, Inc. (sac) (Entered: 04/07/2003)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          (UNSIGNED) STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL; this action purs. to Stipulation and Order entered in 21 mc 92, doc. #5059, hereby dismisses without prejudice and without costs as to defts James G. Garvey, Jr., David Wirthlin, Alan Hald, Daniel Foreman, Stephen Lindstrom, Daniel Roche, and Keith Walz. (Orig. filed and signed by Judge Scheindlin in 21 mc 92.) (sac)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            MASTER ALLEGATIONS by Piyush Bhargava, Carole Groux, Donald Ormond, Suzanne Privette, Herry Kurniawan, Daniel J. Field RE: Amended Complaint, doc.# 14, Filed on April 19, 2002. (ac)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              AMENDED COMPLAINT by Piyush Bhargava, Carole Groux, Donald Ormond, Suzanne Privette, Herry Kurniawan, Daniel J. Field amending [1-1] complaint ; Summons issued. (ac) (Entered: 06/21/2002)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                OMNIBUS ORDER, Carole Groux is hereby appointed as lead pltff and her selection of the Executive Committee to serve as Lead Counsel is approved. All other motions to be appointed lead pltff and for approval of lead counsel are hereby denied. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (orig. doc. filed in 21 mc 92, doc. #4319) (sac)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Robertson Stephens. (sac) (Entered: 02/07/2002)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    REVISED LIST OF CASES BY COUNSEL; purs. to Item I(A) of this Court's Order dated 8/8/01, Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & McCloy LLP and Sidley Austin Brown & Wood LLP to appear as counsel for Deutsche Banc Alex. Brown, Inc. (sac) (Entered: 02/04/2002)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/1/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Robert W. Baird. (Filed date stamped 11/1/01) (sac)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/3/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        NOTICE of attorney appearance for Baird & Co. by Yehuda David Scharf. (sac) (Entered: 10/17/2001)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by J.P. Morgan Inc. (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Aliza Brody . (ICMSUSER) Modified on 10/11/2001 (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/6/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Lehman Brothers . (received through the night deposit box on 9/6/01 at 9:18 pm) (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/6/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Integrated Systems . (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/6/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Deutsche Banc Alex. (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/6/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    INITIAL CONFERENCE SUBMISSION of Legg Mason Wood Walker, Incorporated. (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Consolidated Lead Case. (dcap)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER,... that all cases involving Integrated in this IPO Securities Litigation, as set forth in the attached Rider (1:01-cv-06648, 1:01-cv-06777, 1:01-cv-07125 and 1:01-cv-07419) shall be consolidated into case number 01 Civ. 6120. The Clerk of Court is hereby ordered to consolidate any future cases that are designated as related to 01 Civ. 6120,... the Clerk of Court is further ordered to close all cases that have been consolidated, subject to re-opening at a later date on proper application by a party ... ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. [Original filed in 1:01-cv-06120 Document No. 4. Document Docketed in 1:01-cv-06648; 1:01-cv-06777; 1:01-cv-07125; 1:01-cv-07419] (dcap) (Entered: 10/02/2001)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/31/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER; the time for deft FleetBoston Robertson Stephens, Inc. to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this action is extended through and including the later of 45 days after (i) the assignment of lead pltffs' counsel; or (ii) the filing of an amended complaint. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ) (sac) (Entered: 09/05/2001)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Pretrial Conference set at 4:30 9/7/01 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (dcap)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              Notice of Case Reassignment to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Copy of notice mailed to Attorney(s) of record. Pursuant to the Order of Chief Judge Mukasey dated August 8, 2001, the above entitled action is reassigned to the calendar of Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for inclusion in the coordinated pretrial proceedings being conducted by that judge. Two originals of all future documents submitted in this action are to be presented in the Clerk's Office for filing. One original is to be filed in this docket number and one original is to be filed in the miscellaneous case number 21mc92 (SAS). Each shall bear the original assigned judge's ( ) initials after the original docket number. Attached is a copy of Judge Mukasey's ORDER re: coordinating the proceedings before Judge Scheindlin. Also attached is a copy of Judge Scheindlin's ORDER re: set initial PTC 09/07/01 and directing all counsel to comply with Judge Scheindlin's requirements. [Original Orders docketed in 21mc92 (SAS) as documents numbers 1 and 2] (dcap) (Entered: 08/10/2001)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/19/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Case Management Conference set at 10:00 a.m. on 9/7/01 before Judge Marrero. (kw)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/6/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Peck is so designated. (db)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/6/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 410994. (db) (Entered: 07/09/2001)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?