iManage, Inc. IPO v. iManage, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-06277
District Judge Shira A. Scheindlin, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 10, 2019 at 3:46 AM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Kuo-Chi Feng, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Moshe Deutsche, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Menachem E. Lifshitz +1 212 779 1414 lifshitz@bernlieb.com
No Logo Wang Li Yen, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
v.
No Logo Bancboston Robertson Stephens Inc., Defendant
No Logo C.E. Unterberg, Towbin, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Michele Athena Coffey +1 212 309 6000 mcoffey@morganlewis.com
No Logo Imanage, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Mahmood Panjwani, Defendant
No Logo Mark Culhane, Defendant
No Logo Mark Perry, Defendant
No Logo Moez Virani, Defendant
No Logo Rafiq Mohammadi, Defendant
U.S. Bancorp Piper Jaffray, Inc. U.S. Bancorp Piper Jaffray, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Dean M. Jeske +1 312 832 4500 +1 312 832 4700 djeske@foley.com
No Logo Andrew Echman, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrei V. Rado +1 212 946 9474 +1 212 868 1229 arado@milberg.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SEEGER WEISS LP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY David R. Buchanan +1 212 584 0700 +1 212 584 0799 DBuchanan@SeegerWeiss.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen A. Weiss +1 212 584 0700 +1 212 584 0799 sweiss@seegerweiss.com
No Logo Chi Ming Cheung, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Edwin Juskiewicz, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrei V. Rado +1 212 946 9474 +1 212 868 1229 arado@milberg.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Herman D. Miller, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Hing Shuen Chan, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Hung Szeto, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo James Brainard, Consolidated Plaintiff
No Logo Long Wan, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrei V. Rado +1 212 946 9474 +1 212 868 1229 arado@milberg.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SEEGER WEISS LP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY David R. Buchanan +1 212 584 0700 +1 212 584 0799 DBuchanan@SeegerWeiss.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen A. Weiss +1 212 584 0700 +1 212 584 0799 sweiss@seegerweiss.com
No Logo Manawendra Roy, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Gustavo Fabian Bruckner +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 gfBruckner@pomlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Frederick Taylor Isquith, Sr +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653 isquith@whafh.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Gregory Mark Nespole +1 212 545 4657 +1 212 545 4693 nespole@whafh.com
No Logo Antoine Porges, Intervenor Plaintiff
No Logo Robertson Stephens, Inc., Consolidated Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Brendan Joseph Dowd +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 bdowd@omm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew Jay Frackman +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 afrackman@omm.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 77
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (74) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER APPROVING REISSUE OF EXPIRED DISTRIBUTION DRAFTS AND AUTHORIZING DONATION TO CHARITY: It is hereby ORDERED that the claims administrator Garden City Group LLC shall reissue the thirty-nine (39) distribution drafts referenced in Stanley D. Bernstein's letter to the Court dated June 15, 2015; and it is further ORDERED that no claims or requests for reissues received after seven days after the date of this Order will be accepted or paid; and it is further ORDERED that whatever funds remain after authorized reissue distribution drafts are cashed or expire shall be donated to the following 501(c)(3) charities in the specified proportion: 1) New York Lawyers for the Public Interest (30%) 2) The Southern Poverty Law Center (10%) 3) MFY Legal Services (30%) 4) Sharsheret (30%). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/23/2015) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(ajs) (Entered: 06/24/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin: Status Conference held on 6/17/2015. Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER RE: CLAIMANTS SEEKING COURT REVIEW OF THE REJECTION OF THEIR PROOFS OF CLAIM: The POCs submitted by the following claimants who have requested this Court's review, are hereby finally REJECTED: Joan Rodriguez, 5165197; Charles E. Herbert, P.E., 1765520; Sumana S. Rockich IRA, 30012298; Sumana S. Rockich & Michael Rockich, JT, 30012244. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 10/23/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(ft) (Entered: 11/07/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      DECLARATION of Stephen J Cirami in Opposition re: responses receied on plaintiffs' motion to approve rejection of certain claimants who have disputed the rejection of their claims. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(cd) (Entered: 10/19/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/17/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        DECLARATION of George A Bauer in Opposition to answering submission from Charles A Herbert, P.E. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(cd) (Entered: 10/19/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support OF Charles A. Herbert, P.E. re: (25 in 1:06-cv-14287-SAS) MOTION to Approve FOR AN ORDER APPROVING PROOF OF CLAIM WHERE THE CLAIMANT DISPUTES THE REJECTION AND HAS REQUESTED THE COURT'S REVIEW OF SUCH REJECTION.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(pl) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/12/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            MOTION FOR AN ORDER APPROVING PROOF OF CLAIM WHERE THE CLAIMANT DISPUTES THE REJECTION AND HAS REQUESTED THE COURT'S REVIEW OF SUCH REJECTION. Document filed by Stanley E. O'Neal.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(pl) (Entered: 10/15/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              DECLARATION of Stephen J. Cirami in Support re: (58 in 1:01-cv-11249-SAS, 60 in 1:01-cv-10753-SAS, 41 in 1:01-cv-10988-SAS, 39 in 1:01-cv-09883-SAS, 58 in 1:01-cv-06873-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-12881-SAS, 37 in 1:01-cv-10799-SAS, 97 in 1:01-cv-06001-SAS, 66 in 1:01-cv-08404-SAS, 45 in 1:01-cv-10901-SAS, 22 in 1:01-cv-09190-SAS, 26 in 1:06-cv-10230-SAS, 37 in 1:01-cv-11219-SAS, 38 in 1:01-cv-10942-SAS, 61 in 1:01-cv-10838-SAS, 49 in 1:01-cv-10576-SAS, 43 in 1:01-cv-10683-SAS, 39 in 1:01-cv-10105-SAS, 28 in 1:01-cv-06780-SAS, 57 in 1:01-cv-09748-SAS, 74 in 1:01-cv-00242-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-14287-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-14202-SAS, 78 in 1:01-cv-03857-SAS, 33 in 1:01-cv-09619-SAS, 55 in 1:01-cv-02359-SAS, 54 in 1:01-cv-06288-SAS, 36 in 1:01-cv-10800-SAS, 64 in 1:01-cv-07048-SAS, 51 in 1:01-cv-06277-SAS, 61 in 1:01-cv-09417-SAS, 46 in 1:01-cv-10053-SAS, 48 in 1:01-cv-09504-SAS, 51 in 1:01-cv-06820-SAS, 36 in 1:01-cv-10108-SAS, 41 in 1:01-cv-09411-SAS, 22 in 1:01-cv-09191-SAS, 37 in 1:01-cv-10839-SAS, 58 in 1:01-cv-05258-SAS, 72 in 1:01-cv-02261-SAS, 68 in 1:01-cv-03020-SAS, 38 in 1:01-cv-11220-SAS, 60 in 1:01-cv-02858-SAS, 6319 in 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP, 37 in 1:01-cv-09741-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-14286-SAS) MOTION iohkjm.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(pl) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                JOINT DECLARATION of Stanley D. Bernstein and Ariana J. Tadler in Support re: (58 in 1:01-cv-11249-SAS, 60 in 1:01-cv-10753-SAS, 41 in 1:01-cv-10988-SAS, 39 in 1:01-cv-09883-SAS, 58 in 1:01-cv-06873-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-12881-SAS, 37 in 1:01-cv-10799-SAS, 97 in 1:01-cv-06001-SAS, 66 in 1:01-cv-08404-SAS, 45 in 1:01-cv-10901-SAS, 22 in 1:01-cv-09190-SAS, 26 in 1:06-cv-10230-SAS, 37 in 1:01-cv-11219-SAS, 38 in 1:01-cv-10942-SAS, 61 in 1:01-cv-10838-SAS, 49 in 1:01-cv-10576-SAS, 43 in 1:01-cv-10683-SAS, 39 in 1:01-cv-10105-SAS, 28 in 1:01-cv-06780-SAS, 57 in 1:01-cv-09748-SAS, 74 in 1:01-cv-00242-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-14287-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-14202-SAS, 78 in 1:01-cv-03857-SAS, 33 in 1:01-cv-09619-SAS, 55 in 1:01-cv-02359-SAS, 54 in 1:01-cv-06288-SAS, 36 in 1:01-cv-10800-SAS, 64 in 1:01-cv-07048-SAS, 51 in 1:01-cv-06277-SAS, 61 in 1:01-cv-09417-SAS, 46 in 1:01-cv-10053-SAS, 48 in 1:01-cv-09504-SAS, 51 in 1:01-cv-06820-SAS, 36 in 1:01-cv-10108-SAS, 41 in 1:01-cv-09411-SAS, 22 in 1:01-cv-09191-SAS, 37 in 1:01-cv-10839-SAS, 58 in 1:01-cv-05258-SAS, 72 in 1:01-cv-02261-SAS, 68 in 1:01-cv-03020-SAS, 38 in 1:01-cv-11220-SAS, 60 in 1:01-cv-02858-SAS, 6319 in 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP, 37 in 1:01-cv-09741-SAS, 27 in 1:06-cv-14286-SAS) MOTION iohkjm.. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(pl) (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support by Members of Plaintiffs' Executive Committee: re: MOTION ENTRY OF THE PROPOSED CLASS DISTRIBUTION ORDER. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(pl) Modified on 10/16/2012 (pl). (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/10/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ENTRY OF THE PROPOSED CLASS DISTRIBUTION ORDER BY Members of Plaintiffs' Executive Committee: Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(pl) Modified on 10/16/2012 (pl). (Entered: 10/16/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ORDER GRANTING PERMISSION TO SUBMIT CD-ROM COPY OF EXHIBIT B TO THE DECLARATION OF STEPHEN J. CIRAMI: It is hereby ORDERED, that the Clerk of Court is directed to accept for filing and docket a CD-ROM or other digital storage device that contains a digital copy of Exhibits B-1 (Authorized Claimants) and B-2 (Rejected Claimants) to the Declaration of Stephen J. Cirami, Senior Vice President, Operations, of The Garden City Group, Inc. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 10/5/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(lmb) (Entered: 10/09/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/12/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        ORDER FOR RELEASE OF FUNDS POSTED TO SATISFY RULE 7 BOND TO SETTLING OBJECTIONS granting (6302) Motion for Release of Funds in case 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that within ten (10) calendar days of this order the clerk shall release to Jeffrey Weinstein, on behalf of the Movants, the $25,000 deposited with the cashier's office under Objectors Receipt Number 909152. The clerk's check for $25,000 should be made payable to "Jeffrey Weinstein" and mailed to Jeffrey Weinstein, 518 East Tyler Street, Athens, Texas, 75751. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Movants are hereby relieved of their joint and several obligation to post a bond. Movants are to pay their own fees and costs in the action. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this motion [Docket No. 6302]. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 4/12/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(mro) Modified on 4/13/2012 (mro). (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 2/9/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER AUTHORIZING CLAIMS ADMINISTRATOR TO PROCESS CLAIMS SUBMITTED PRIOR TO ENTRY OF THIS ORDER AND TO STOP PROCESSING ANY NEW PROOFS OF CLAIM: The Claims Administrator is authorized to process all Proofs of Claim it received on or before entry of this Order; and it is further ORDERED, that any Proofs of Claim received by the Claims Administrator after entry of this Order shall not be processed, may not be accepted and shall be returned by the Claims Administrator to the sender together with a notice stating that "The Court has entered an Order providing that no Proof of Claim submitted after the date of entry of this Order may be accepted for any reason whatsoever" and it is further ORDERED, that the Claims Administrator is directed to include a notice on the www.iposecuritieslitigationsettlement.com website stating that no Proof of Claim submitted after the date ofentry of this Order may be accepted for any reason whatsoever; and it is further ORDERED, that the Claims Administrator is directed to promptly conclude the processing of all Proofs of Claim received on or before entry of this Order; and it is further ORDERED, that, upon the Claims Administrator's conclusion of the processing of the Proofs of Claim submitted or before entry of this Order, Plaintiffs' Executive Committee shall move for the Class Distribution Order contemplated in paragraph 14 of the Stipulation; and it is further ORDERED, that this Court retain jurisdiction over any further application or matter which may arise in connection with the administration an Settlement of this litigation. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/9/2012) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(ft) (Entered: 02/09/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/8/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            NOTICE OF MOTION for Administrative Order Allowing the Claims Administrator to Process the Proofs of Claim Submitted Through Entry of the Requested Proposed Order and Directing that Claims Submitted Thereafter shall not be processed and may not be Accepted. Document filed by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al. Original filed under case no. 12-mc-92, document #6306. (tro)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/8/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              AFFIDAVIT of Stephen J. Cirami in Support of Motion for an Administrative Order Allowing the Claims Administrator to Process the Proofs of Claim Submitted through the date of entry of that Order, and Directing that any Claims submitted thereafter shall not be Processed and May Not be Accepted. Document filed by Plaintiffs' Executive Committee. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al. Original Document filed under 21-mc-92, document #6305.(tro)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 8/16/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO PRO SE OBJECTOR JAMES J. HAYES'S AUGUST 8, 2011 SUBMISSION. Document filed by the plaintiffs. (Received in the night deposit box on 8/16/11 at 11:18 pm) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(mro) (Entered: 08/17/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  DECLARATION of Christian Siebott in Support of Plaintiffs' Response to this Court's July 20, 2011 Order addressing whether Pro Se objector James J. Hayes is a class member. Document filed by the plaintiffs. (Received in the night deposit box on 8/5/11 at 11:13pm) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(mro) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/5/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO THIS COURT'S JULY 20, 2011 ORDER ADDRESSING WHETHER PRO SE OBJECTOR JAMES J. HAYES IS A CLASS MEMBER. Document filed by the plaintiffs. (Received in the night deposit box on 8/5/11 at 11:13pm)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(mro) (Entered: 08/08/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/20/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      ORDER: If Hayes is directed to submit any further support he wishes to be considered on the question of whether he is a class member, i.e., a "person...[who] purchased or otherwise acquired the securities of [Specific Issuer] during the Class Period and [was] damaged thereby," by the close of business on July 29, 2011. If Hayes makes any further submissions he shall simultaneously serve Plaintiffs' Executive Committee by email or by overnight express mail. Any party who wises to respond to Hayes's submissions to date or in response to this Order shall do so by the close of business on August 5, 2011. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 7/20/2011) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(tro) (Entered: 07/21/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        OPINION AND ORDER #100514. For the foregoing reasons, total fees shall be allocated according to the methodology described herein and in the amounts included in the attached Spreadsheet. Expenses and interest shall be allocated according to Exhibit A of the Proposal. The Objectors are directed to file their Objections and any responses thereto. The Clerk of the Court is then directed to close these motions. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 7/8/11) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(djc) (Entered: 07/12/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/15/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          ORDER Plaintiffs' Executive Committee ("EC") is hereby ordered to prepare a spreadsheet showing the allocation of total fees of $170,084,950.00 based on the "revised adjusted lodestars" of both the EC and non-EC law firms. This spreadsheet must be submitted to the Court by close of business Monday, June 20, 2011. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/15/11); Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(djc) (Entered: 06/15/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/13/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Fred Taylor Isquith dated 12/17/10 re: We respectfully request a pre-motion conference for an Order directing Piven not to bring claims relating to his entitlement to fees in the IPO Litigation other than before Your Honor. ENDORSEMENT: To the extent that the law firm of Brower Piven, P.C. is directly seeking attorney's fees related to its work in the IPO litigation, such claim will be heard by Judge Scheindlin. But any disputes between Brower Piven and Wolf Haldenstein arising out of any alleged contract or agreement between those parties will be heard by Judge Sullivan. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 12/23/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(rjm) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/7/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Fred Taylor Isquith dated 12/17/2010 re: Requesting a pre-motion conference for an Order directing Piven not to bring claims relating to his entitlement to fees in the IPO Litigation other than before Your Honor. ENDORSEMENT: To the extent that the law firm of Brower Piven P.C. is directly seeking attorneys fees related to its work in the IPO litigation, such claims will be heard by Judge Scheindlin. But any disputes between Brower Piven and Wolf Haldenstein arriving out of any alleged contract or agreement between those parties will be heard by Judge Sullivan. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 12/23/2010) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(jpo) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/23/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                ENDORSED LETTER addressed to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin from Fred Taylor Isquith dated 12/17/10 re: Request for a pre-motion conference for an Order directing Piven not to bring claims relating to his entitlement to fees in the IPQ Litigation other than before Your Honor. ENDORSEMENT: To the extent that the law firm Brower Piven PC is directly seeking attorneys' fees related to its work in the IPO litigation, such caim will be heard by Judge Sheindlin. But only disputes between Brower Piven and Wolf Halderstein arising out of any alleged contract or agreement between those parties will be heard by Judge Sullivan. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 12/23/10) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(db) Modified on 1/13/2011 (db). (Entered: 12/28/2010)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  RESPONSE to Discovery Request from Baum.Document filed by Lester Baum.Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(Greene, Leland) (Entered: 04/14/2010)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/14/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Leland L. Greene on behalf of Lester Baum Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS-HBP et al.(Greene, Leland) (Entered: 04/14/2010)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT, settling ation. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/24/09) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Right to Appeal)(dt) (Entered: 12/10/2009)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/9/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER; on 5/13/08, the court issued and filed an Opinion and order granting in part and denying in part the motion of the underwriters to strike class allegations from the complaints in twenty-six non-focus cases pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 23(d)(1)(D). The court directed that withing 21 days of the Opinion and Order, "plaintiffs shall notify defendants and the Court of the identity of the putative class representatives for each proposed class in each of the 18 cases and the basis for each putative representative's claim, and shall indicate whether these putative representatives are members of the proposed classes." Plaintiffs' time to disclose the required information is extended through and including 3/6/09. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 2/11/09) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS et al.(sac) (Entered: 02/13/2009)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/23/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL; The following related actions are dismissed without prejudice as to the individual defendants listed on Schedule 1, and dismissed pursuant to the Opinion and Order dated 2/19/03, as the individual defendants listed on Schedule 2. The dismissal of the related actions is without costs to the individual defendants listed on Schedules 1 and 2. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 1/22/09) This Document Relates to: 01cv2359, 01cv3225, 01cv3360, 01cv3910, 01cv5143, 01cv5644, 01cv5838, 01cv6000, 01cv6008, 01cv6120, 01cv6271, 01cv6277, 01cv6322, 01cv6747, 01cv6846, 01cv6870, 01cv7002, 01cv7046, 01cv7247, 01cv7344, 01cv9618, 01cv9651, 01cv9797, 01cv9799, 01cv9800, 01cv10040, 01cv10051, 01cv10075, 01cv10092, 01cv10108, 01cv10140, 01cv10161, 01cv10738, 01cv10753, 01cv10838, 01cv10867, 01cv10884, 01cv11230, 01cv11234.(sac) (sac) (Entered: 01/27/2009)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/28/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER; on 5/13/08, the court issued and filed an Opinion and Order granting in part and denying in part the motion of the underwriters to strike class allegations from the complaints in twenty-six non-focus cases. The court directed that within twenty-one days of the Opinion and Order, "plaintiffs shall notify defendants and the Court of the identity of the putative class representatives for each proposed class in each of the eighteen cases and the basis for each putative representative's claim, and shall indicate whether these putative representatives are members of the proposed classes." Plaintiffs' time to disclose the required information is extended through and including 1/30/09. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 10/28/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS et al.(sac) (Entered: 10/29/2008)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER; on 5/13/08, the Court issued and filed an Opinion and Order granting in part and denying in part the motion of the underwriters to strike class allegations from the complaints in 26 non-focus cases. The Court directed that within 21 days of the Opinion and Order, "plaintiffs shall notify defendants and the Court of the identity of the putative class representatives for each proposed class in each of the 18 cases and the basis for each putative representative's claim, and shall indicate whether putative representatives are members of the proposed classes." Plaintiffs' time to disclose the required information is extended through and including 10/30/08. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 8/25/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS et al.(sac) (Entered: 08/25/2008)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                STIPULATION AND ORDER; on 5/13/08, the Court issued and filed an Opinion and Order granting in part and denying in part the motion of the underwriters to strike class allegations from the complaints in 26 non-focus cases. The Court directed that within 21 days of the Opinion and Order, "plaintiffs shall notify defendants and the Court of the identity of the putative class representatives for each proposed class in each of the 18 cases and the basis for each putative representative's claim, and shall indicate whether putative representatives are members of the proposed classes." The Plaintiffs' time to disclose the required information is extended through and including 8/22/08. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 7/16/08) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-mc-00092-SAS et al.(sac) (Entered: 07/17/2008)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  STIPULATION AND ORDER; on 5/13/08, the Court issued and filed an Opinion and Order granting in part and denying in part the motion of the underwriters to strike class allegations from the complaints in twenty-six non-focus cases. Plaintiffs' time to disclose the required information is extended through and including 7/15/08. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/4/08) This Document Relates to: 01cv3020; 01cv5258; 01cv6277; 01cv6820; 01cv6873; 01cv9411; 01cv9504; 01cv9741; 01cv9748; 01cv9619; 01cv9883; 01cv10053; 01cv10105; 01cv10108; 01cv10576; 01cv10683; 01cv10753; 01cv10799; 01cv10838; 01cv10839; 01cv10901; 01cv10942; 01cv10988; 01cv11219; 01cv11220; 01cv11249. (sac) (Entered: 06/05/2008)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    STIPULATION AND ORDER that the Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement with defendant Issuers and Individuals submitted to the Court on 6/10/4, is hereby terminated purs to Paragraph 39 of the Proposed Partial Settlement. However, purs to paragraph 40 of the Proposed Partial Settlement, that paragraph, and the paragraphs referred to therein, shall survive the termination of the Proposed Partial Settlement. This Stipulation resolves (5527) Motion to Approve of Class action settlement. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this motion. This document relates to: All cases listed on Schedule I. (orig fld in 21mc92, #5620). (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/25/07) (cd)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      MOTION TO REMOVE MILBERG WEISS AND BERSHAD AS LEAD COUNSEL IN THE IPO SECURITIES LITIGATION. Document filed by Theodore A. Bechtold, Esq.. This Document Relates to the following Actions: 01-242, 01-2261, 01-2359, 01-2712, 01-3358, 01-3910, 01-3975, 01-4779, 01-4942, 01-5072, 01-5269, 01-5332, 01-5427, 01-5575, 01-5613, 01-5644, 01-5739, 01-5911, 01-6000, 01-6001, 01-6004, 01-6084, 01-6090, 01-6120, 01-6143, 01-6277, 01-6288, 01-6322, 01-6339, 01-6365, 01-6542, 01-6613, 01-6661, 01-6768, 01-6820, 01-6890, 01-6892, 01-7000, 01-7032, 01-7033, 01-7048, 01-7055, 01-7467, 01-8401, 01-9417, 01-9504, 01-9561, 01-9604, 01-9747, 01-9883, 01-9917, 01-9975, 01-10000, 01-10121, 01-10598, 01-10639, 01-10684, 01-10740, 01-10741, 01-10813, 01-10822, 01-10831, 01-10898, 01-10899, 01-10903, 01-10943, 01-11202, 01-11219, 01-11239... Original Document filed in 21-mc-92, Doc#5588.(sac)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF OMNIBUS MOTION FOR INTERVENTION; the Class members listed on Exhibit 1 to this Notice hereby withdraw, without prejudice to renewal, their Omnibus Motion for Intervention (Doc. No. 5191 on Dkt. 21 MC 92) that was filed on 9/2/03. This Document Relates to: 01cv5902; 01cv2359; 01cv10901; 01cv3360; 01cv6890; 01cv5446; 01cv2858; 01cv10827; 01cv9883; 01cv6397; 01cv6613; 01cv6271; 01cv10839; 01cv5937; 01cv6222; 01cv7669; 01cv10971; 01cv5575; 01cv7044; 01cv10943; 01cv10686; 01cv10105; 01cv5834; 01cv6542; 01cv7000; 01cv10944; 01cv3792; 01cv4942; 01cv11231; 01cv6887; 01cv5948; 01cv6242; 01cv7467; 01cv9411; 01cv9414; 01cv6775; 01cv5911; 01cv11246; 01cv7055; 01cv6948; 01cv10164; 01cv10813; 01cv7048; 01cv10738; 01cv10640; 01cv10884; 01cv10741; 01cv6339; 01cv6771; 01cv9743; 01cv6272; 01cv6842; 01cv6277; 01cv9922; 01cv10969; 01cv6084; 01cv3975; 01cv7654; 01cv9917; 01cv9349; 01cv7974; 01cv9417; 01cv10740; 01;cv9442; 01cv4147; 01cv6661; 01cv3483; 01cv6757; 01cv10990; 01cv6627; 01cv7726; 01cv9651; 01cv4183; 01cv3910; 01cv7028; 01cv5332; 01cv9798; 01cv11239; 01cv6089; 01cv6004; 01cv10823; 01cv10945; 01cv7280; 01cv10775; 01cv5354; 01cv7032; 01cv9744; 01cv9904; 01cv11217; 01cv10185; 01cv7279; 01cv2261; 01cv6082; 01cv10867; 01cv10160; 01cv10898; 01cv10683; 01cv2712; 01cv6090; 01cv10942; 01cv10120; 01cv11245; 01cv5225; 01cv6950; 01cv9746; 01cv7415; 01cv4941; 01cv10831; 01cv5600; 01cv10941; 01cv9921; 01cv4186; 01cv6846; 01cv6821; 01cv7474; 01cv5267; 01cv6288; 01cv7247; 01cv6110; 01cv10822; 01cv6008; 01cv5269; 01cv9563; 01cv9348; 01cv9604; 01cv5739; 01cv10999; 01cv3450; 01cv5241; 01cv9720; 01cv10040; 01cv6906; 01cv9514; 01cv10833; 01cv10092; 01cv10053; 01cv6768; 01cv10830; 01cv10638; 01cv4779; 01cv5074. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 9/30/04)... Original Document filed in 21-mc-92, Doc#5367.(sac, )
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: MOTION, Doc#5191, (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) to Intervene. Original Document filed in 21mc92, Doc#5279. (sac, )
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/4/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) to Intervene.. Document filed by Antoine Porges. Original Document filed in 21 MC 92, Doc#5195. (sac, )
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/4/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              NOTICE OF OMNIBUS MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) to Intervene EACH CLASS MEMBER named on Exhibit 1 attached to Memorandum of Law in Support, as class plaintiffs in those coordinated actions. This Document Relates to: 01cv5902; 01cv2359; 01cv10901; 01cv3360; 01cv6890; 01cv5446; 01cv2858; 01cv10827; 01cv9883; 01cv6397; 01cv6613; 01cv6271; 01cv10839; 01cv5937; 01cv6222; 01cv7669; 01cv10971; 01cv5575; 01cv7044; 01cv10943; 01cv10686; 01cv10105; 01cv5834; 01cv6542; 01cv7000; 01cv10944; 01cv3792; 01cv4942; 01cv11231; 01cv6887; 01cv6242; 01cv7467; 01cv9411; 01cv9414; 01cv6775; 01cv5911; 01cv11246; 01cv7055; 01cv6948; 01cv10164; 01cv10813; 01cv7084; 01cv10738; 01cv10640; 01cv10884; 01cv10741; 01cv6339; 01cv6771; 01cv9743; 01cv62672; 01cv6842; 01cv6277; 01cv9922; 01cv10969; 01cv6084; 01cv3975; 01cv7654; 01cv9917; 01cv9349; 01cv 7974; 01cv9417; 01cv 10740; 01cv992; 01cv4147; 01cv6661; 01cv3483; 01cv6757; 01cv10990; 01cv6627; 01cv7726; 01cv9651; 01cv4183; 01cv3910; 01cv7028; 01cv5332; 01cv9798; 01cv11239; 01cv6089; 01cv6004; 01cv10823; 01cv10945; 01cv7280; 01cv10775; 01cv5354; 01cv7032; 01cv9744; 01cv9904; 01cv11217; 01cv10185; 01cv7279; 01cv2261; 01cv6082; 01cv10867; 01cv10160; 01cv10898; 01cv10683; 01cv2712; 01cv6090; 01cv10942; 01cv10120; 01cv11245; 01cv5225; 01cv6950; 01cv9746; 01cv7415; 01cv4941; 01cv10831; 01cv5600; 01cv10941; 01cv9921; 01cv4186; 01cv6846; 01cv6821; 01cv7474; 01cv5267; 01cv6288; 01cv7247; 01cv6110; 01cv10822; 01cv6008; 01cv5269; 01cv9563; 01cv9348; 01cv9604; 01cv5739; 01cv10999; 01cv3450; 01cv5241; 01cv9720; 01cv10040; 01cv6906; 01cv9514; 01cv10833; 01cv10092; 01cv10053; 01cv6768; 01cv10830; 01cv10638; 01cv4779; 01cv5074. Origianl Document filed in 21MC92, Doc#5191. Document filed by Antoine Porges. (sac, )
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/23/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                ANSWER by U.S. Bancorp Piper to [18-1] amended complaint . (Attorney Dean M. Jeske from the Firm: Foley & Lardner). (sac) (Entered: 09/22/2003)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/23/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  ANSWER by C.E. Unterberg to [18-1] amended complaint . (Attorney Michele A. Coffey from the Firm: Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 09/19/2003)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    ANSWER by Robertson Stephens to [18-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Brendan Joseph Dowd from the O'Melveny & Myers, LLP)... rec'd in the night deposit box on 7/21/03 at 7:27 p.m. (sac) (Entered: 08/21/2003)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      (UNSIGNED) STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL; this action purs. to Stipulation and Order entered in 21 mc 92, doc. #5059, hereby dismisses without prejudice and without costs as to defts Mahmood Panjwani, Mark A. Culhane, Rafiq Mohammadi, Mark Perry and Moez Virani. (Orig. filed and signed by Judge Scheindlin in 21 mc 92.) (sac)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/30/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to iManage, Inc. by Jashmin Milan, managing agent, on 4/26/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/25/2002)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/30/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Mahmood Panjwani by Jashmin Milan, co-worker, on 4/26/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/25/2002)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/30/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Rafiq Mohammadi by Jashmin Milan, co-worker, on 4/26/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/25/2002)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/30/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Moez Virani by Jashmin Milan, co-worker, on 4/26/02. (sac) Modified on 07/25/2002 (Entered: 07/25/2002)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to U.S. Bancorp Piper by Patrice Blaeser, managing agent, on 4/29/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/23/2002)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to C.E. Unterberg by Catherine Mahoney, Managing Agent on 4/26/02. (gf) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    MASTER ALLEGATIONS by Manawendra Roy, Wang Li Yen, Kuo-Chi Feng RE: Amended Complaint, doc.# 18, Filed on April 19, 2002. (ac)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT by Manawendra Roy, Wang Li Yen, Kuo-Chi Feng amending [1-1] complaint ; Summons issued. (ac) (Entered: 06/24/2002)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        OMNIBUS ORDER, Wang Li Yen is hereby appointed as lead pltff and his selection of the Executive Committee to serve as Lead Counsel is approved. All other motions to be appointed lead pltff and for approval of lead counsel are hereby denied. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (orig. doc. filed in 21 mc 92, doc. #4319) (sac)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Robertson Stephens. (sac) (Entered: 02/07/2002)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            AMENDED RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by C.E. Unterberg. (ph) (Entered: 01/24/2002)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/27/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Herman D. Miller in further support of [8-2] motion for an order, appointing Movant to serve as lead pltf., [8-3] motion for an order, approving Movant's selection of counsel for the Class; in opposition to: [5-2] motion for an order, appointing the Movants as Lead Pltfs., [5-3] motion for an order, approving the Movants selection of lead counsel, [12-1] motion for an order, appointing Wang Li Yen and Kuo-Chi Feng to serve as Lead Pltffs, [12-2] motion for an order, approving the Lead Pltffs' selection of Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP as Lead Counsel. (rec'd in the night deposit box on 9/27/01 at 5:27 p.m.) (sac) (Entered: 10/18/2001)
                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/27/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Wang Li Yen, Kuo-Chi Feng in further support of [12-1] motion for an order, appointing Wang Li Yen and Kuo-Chi Feng to serve as Lead Pltffs, [12-2] motion for an order, approving the Lead Pltffs' selection of Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP as Lead Counsel. (rec'd in the night deposit box on 9/27/01 at 7:32 p.m.) (sac) (Entered: 10/17/2001)
                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  REPLY MEMORANDUM by James Brainard, Hing Shuen Chan, Chi Ming Cheung, Hung Szeto re: [5-1] motion for an order, consolidating this action with the following Mem. Cases: 01-cv-6889, 01-cv-6994, 01-cv-7477, 01-cv-8184, [5-2] motion for an order, appointing the Movants as Lead Pltfs., [5-3] motion for an order, approving the Movants selection of lead counsel (rec'd in the night deposit box on 9/26/01 at 7:12pm) (ICMSUSER) Modified on 10/24/2001 (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Wang Li Yen, Kuo-Chi Feng in support of [11-1] motion for an order, appointing Wang Li Yen and Kuo-Chi Feng to serve as Lead Pltffs, [11-2] motion for an order, approving the Lead Pltffs' selection of Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP as Lead Counsel. (rec'd in the night deposit box on 9/10/01 at 11:44 p.m.) (sac) Modified on 10/24/2001 (Entered: 10/17/2001)
                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION by Wang Li Yen, Kuo-Chi Feng for an order, appointing Wang Li Yen and Kuo-Chi Feng to serve as Lead Pltffs ; for an order, approving the Lead Pltffs' selection of Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP as Lead Counsel ; Return date 10/9/01. (rec'd in the night deposit box on 9/10/01 at 11:44 p.m.) (sac) Modified on 10/24/2001 (Entered: 10/17/2001)
                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Herman D. Miller in support of [8-1] motion for an order, consolidating this action 01-cv-6277 (Lead Case) with the following Mem. Cases: 01-cv-6889, 01-cv-7249, 01-cv-7477, 01-cv-8184, [8-2] motion for an order, appointing Movant to serve as lead pltf., [8-3] motion for an order, approving Movant's selection of counsel for the Class. (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          DECLARATION of Michael S. Egan, Esq. by Herman D. Miller in support Re: [8-1] motion for an order, consolidating this action 01-cv-6277 (Lead Case) with the following Mem. Cases: 01-cv-6889, 01-cv-7249, 01-cv-7477, 01-cv-8184, [8-2] motion for an order, appointing Movant to serve as lead pltf., [8-3] motion for an order, approving Movant's selection of counsel for the Class. (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION by Herman D. Miller for an order, consolidating this action 01-cv-6277 (Lead Case) with the following Mem. Cases: 01-cv-6889, 01-cv-7249, 01-cv-7477, 01-cv-8184, for an order, appointing Movant to serve as lead pltf., for an order, approving Movant's selection of counsel for the Class . Return date not indicated. (rec'd in the night deposit box on 9/10/01 at 5:07pm) (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW by James Brainard, Hing Shuen Chan, Chi Ming Cheung, Hung Szeto in support of [5-1] motion for an order, consolidating this action with the following Mem. Cases: 01-cv-6889, 01-cv-6994, 01-cv-7477, 01-cv-8184, [5-2] motion for an order, appointing the Movants as Lead Pltfs., [5-3] motion for an order, approving the Movants selection of lead counsel. (rec'd in the night box deposit box on 9/10/01 at 10:21pm) (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Samuel H. Rudman by James Brainard, Hing Shuen Chan, Chi Ming Cheung, Hung Szeto in support Re: [5-1] motion for an order, consolidating this action with the following Mem. Cases: 01-cv-6889, 01-cv-6994, 01-cv-7477, 01-cv-8184, [5-2] motion for an order, appointing the Movants as Lead Pltfs., [5-3] motion for an order, approving the Movants selection of lead counsel. (rec'd in the night deposit box on 9/10/01 at 10:21pm) (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION by James Brainard, Hing Shuen Chan, Chi Ming Cheung, Hung Szeto for an order, consolidating this action with the following Mem. Cases: 01-cv-6889, 01-cv-6994, 01-cv-7477, 01-cv-8184, for an order, appointing the Movants as Lead Pltfs., for an order, approving the Movants selection of lead counsel . Return date not indicated. (rec'd in the night deposit box 9/10/01 at 10:21pm) (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Moshe Deutsche, Long Wan, Manawendra Roy, Andrew Echman, Edwin Juskiewicz (ICMSUSER) Modified on 10/11/2001 (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:21-mc-00092-SAS.. (sac)
                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        Consolidated Lead Case. (dcap)
                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER,... that all cases involving Imanage in this IPO Securities Litigation, as set forth in the attached Rider (1:01-cv-06889, 1:01-cv-07249, 1:01-cv-07477 and 1:01-cv-08184), shall be consolidated into case number 01 Civ. 6277. The Clerk of Court is hereby ordered to consolidate any future cases that are designated as related to 01 Civ. 6277,... the Clerk of Court is further ordered to close all cases that have been consolidated, subject to re-opening at a later date on proper application by a party ... ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. [Original filed in 1:01-cv-06277 Document No. 3. Document Docketed in 1:01-cv-06889; 1:01-cv-07249; 1:01-cv-07477; 1:01-cv-08184] (dcap) (Entered: 10/02/2001)
                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            Pretrial Conference set at 4:30 9/7/01 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (dcap)
                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              Notice of Case Reassignment to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Copy of notice mailed to Attorney(s) of record. Pursuant to the Order of Chief Judge Mukasey dated August 8, 2001, the above entitled action is reassigned to the calendar of Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for inclusion in the coordinated pretrial proceedings being conducted by that judge. Two originals of all future documents submitted in this action are to be presented in the Clerk's Office for filing. One original is to be filed in this docket number and one original is to be filed in the miscellaneous case number 21mc92 (SAS). Each shall bear the original assigned judge's ( ) initials after the original docket number. Attached is a copy of Judge Mukasey's ORDER re: coordinating the proceedings before Judge Scheindlin. Also attached is a copy of Judge Scheindlin's ORDER re: set initial PTC 09/07/01 and directing all counsel to comply with Judge Scheindlin's requirements. [Original Orders docketed in 21mc92 (SAS) as documents numbers 1 and 2] (dcap) (Entered: 08/10/2001)
                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/11/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. (jco)
                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/11/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 411304. (jco) (Entered: 07/12/2001)
                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 9 times.

                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?