Globespan, Inc. IPO v. Fleetboston
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-10741
District Judge Shira A. Scheindlin, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 10, 2019 at 11:42 PM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Collegeware Asset Management, LP, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Howard Barry Sirota +1 212 425 9055 +1 212 425 9055 howard.sirota@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Sandy A Liebhard +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 liebhard@bernlieb.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Menachem E. Lifshitz +1 212 779 1414 lifshitz@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Meiselman, Packman, Nealon, Scialabba & Baker, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY ROBERT J. BERG +1 914 920 7400 +1 914 761 1900 rberg@denleacarton.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Ariana J. Tadler +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 atadler@milberg.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Strull Strull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Frederick Taylor Isquith, Sr +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653 isquith@whafh.com
No Logo Sannaka Wettimuny, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
v.
No Logo Armando Geday, Defendant
No Logo Bancboston Robertson Stephens Inc., Defendant
No Logo Credit Suisse First Boston Corp., Defendant
No Logo DLJDirect, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Donaldson, Lufkin & Jenrette Securities Corporation, Defendant
E*TRADE Group, Inc. E*TRADE Group, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelley Drye & Warren, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/12/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert Emmet Crotty +1 212 808 7847 +1 212 808 7897 rcrotty@kelleydrye.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Michele Athena Coffey +1 212 309 6000 mcoffey@morganlewis.com
No Logo Fleetboston Robertson Stephens Inc., Defendant
No Logo James Coulter, Defendant
No Logo Jeffries & Company, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Michele Athena Coffey +1 212 309 6000 mcoffey@morganlewis.com
No Logo John Marren, Defendant
No Logo Keith Geeslin, Defendant
Lehman Brothers, Inc. Lehman Brothers, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Lehman Abs Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Moses Silverman +1 212 315 3082

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Debra Lee Bogo-Ernst

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew Emanuel Tauber +1 202 263 3324 +1 202 263 5324 atauber@mayerbrown.com
Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc. Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated"
Officer/Director, Cumulus Media Inc.
Officer/Director, Chart Industries, Inc.
Officer/Director, Lodgian, Inc.
Officer/Director, Mlgpe Ltd
Merrill Lynch GP Inc. Officer/Director, Merrill Lynch GP Inc.
Officer/Director, Merrill Lynch & Co Inc
Officer/Director, Merrill Lynch Group, Inc
Hertz Global Holdings Inc Officer/Director, Hertz Global Holdings Inc
Merrill Lynch International Officer/Director, Merrill Lynch International
Officer/Director, Merrill Lynch Trust Co Fsb
Officer/Director, Infospace.com, Inc.
Officer/Director, Fund Asset Management Lp
Officer/Director, New BlackRock, Inc.
Officer/Director, Princeton Administrators Lp
Officer/Director, NATIONSBANK CORP
Bank of America, NA Officer/Director, Bank of America, NA
Officer/Director, Blue Ridge Investments, LLC
Officer/Director, Gabelli Utility Fund
Officer/Director, Pimco High Income Fund
Officer/Director, Koll Real Estate Group Inc
Officer/Director, Uslife Income Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Muniholdings Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Munienhanced Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Muniyield Quality Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Munivest Fund II Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Mark Holland +1 212 813 8800 +1 212 355 3333 mholland@goodwinlaw.com
No Logo Morgan Stanley Dean Witter & Co., Incorporated, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Steven G. Bradbury +1 202 879 5000
No Logo Prudential Securities Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Prudential Securities Incorporated"

Toggle Switch Represented by Proskauer Rose LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Sarah S. Gold +1 212 969 3000 +1 212 969 2900 sgold@proskauer.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen Leonard Ratner +1 212 969 3000 +1 212 969 2900 sratner@proskauer.com
No Logo Robert McMullan, Defendant
No Logo Robertson Stephens, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Brendan Joseph Dowd +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 bdowd@omm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew Jay Frackman +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 afrackman@omm.com
No Logo Sg Cowen Securities Corp, Defendant
Officially listed as "SG Cowen Securities Corporation"

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Jay B. Kasner , +1 212 735 2628 +1 917 777 2628 Jay.Kasner@skadden.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY SCOTT DAVID MUSOFF +1 212 735 7852 +1 917 777 7852 scott.musoff@skadden.com
No Logo SoundView Technology, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Michele Athena Coffey +1 212 309 6000 mcoffey@morganlewis.com
No Logo Thomas Epley, Defendant
No Logo Thomas Weisel Partners, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Jeffrey A. Rosenthal +1 212 225 2000 +1 212 225 3499 jrosenthal@cgsh.com
UBS Warburg LLC UBS Warburg LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Jeffrey A. Rosenthal +1 212 225 2000 +1 212 225 3499 jrosenthal@cgsh.com
No Logo Brenda Abbruzzino, Intervenor Plaintiff
No Logo Salvatore Abbruzzino, Lead Plaintiff
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 78m(a)
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (60) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/4/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT settling action. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/24/09) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Right to Appeal)(dt) (Entered: 12/04/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    STIPULATION AND ORDER that the Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement with defendant Issuers and Individuals submitted to the Court on 6/10/4, is hereby terminated purs to Paragraph 39 of the Proposed Partial Settlement. However, purs to paragraph 40 of the Proposed Partial Settlement, that paragraph, and the paragraphs referred to therein, shall survive the termination of the Proposed Partial Settlement. This Stipulation resolves (5527) Motion to Approve of Class action settlement. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this motion. This document relates to: All cases listed on Schedule I. (orig fld in 21mc92, #5620). (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/25/07) (cd)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    MOTION TO REMOVE MILBERG WEISS AND BERSHAD AS LEAD COUNSEL IN THE IPO SECURITIES LITIGATION. Document filed by Theodore A. Bechtold, Esq.. This Document Relates to the following Actions: 01-242, 01-2261, 01-2359, 01-2712, 01-3358, 01-3910, 01-3975, 01-4779, 01-4942, 01-5072, 01-5269, 01-5332, 01-5427, 01-5575, 01-5613, 01-5644, 01-5739, 01-5911, 01-6000, 01-6001, 01-6004, 01-6084, 01-6090, 01-6120, 01-6143, 01-6277, 01-6288, 01-6322, 01-6339, 01-6365, 01-6542, 01-6613, 01-6661, 01-6768, 01-6820, 01-6890, 01-6892, 01-7000, 01-7032, 01-7033, 01-7048, 01-7055, 01-7467, 01-8401, 01-9417, 01-9504, 01-9561, 01-9604, 01-9747, 01-9883, 01-9917, 01-9975, 01-10000, 01-10121, 01-10598, 01-10639, 01-10684, 01-10740, 01-10741, 01-10813, 01-10822, 01-10831, 01-10898, 01-10899, 01-10903, 01-10943, 01-11202, 01-11219, 01-11239... Original Document filed in 21-mc-92, Doc#5588.(sac)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF OMNIBUS MOTION FOR INTERVENTION; the Class members listed on Exhibit 1 to this Notice hereby withdraw, without prejudice to renewal, their Omnibus Motion for Intervention (Doc. No. 5191 on Dkt. 21 MC 92) that was filed on 9/2/03. This Document Relates to: 01cv5902; 01cv2359; 01cv10901; 01cv3360; 01cv6890; 01cv5446; 01cv2858; 01cv10827; 01cv9883; 01cv6397; 01cv6613; 01cv6271; 01cv10839; 01cv5937; 01cv6222; 01cv7669; 01cv10971; 01cv5575; 01cv7044; 01cv10943; 01cv10686; 01cv10105; 01cv5834; 01cv6542; 01cv7000; 01cv10944; 01cv3792; 01cv4942; 01cv11231; 01cv6887; 01cv5948; 01cv6242; 01cv7467; 01cv9411; 01cv9414; 01cv6775; 01cv5911; 01cv11246; 01cv7055; 01cv6948; 01cv10164; 01cv10813; 01cv7048; 01cv10738; 01cv10640; 01cv10884; 01cv10741; 01cv6339; 01cv6771; 01cv9743; 01cv6272; 01cv6842; 01cv6277; 01cv9922; 01cv10969; 01cv6084; 01cv3975; 01cv7654; 01cv9917; 01cv9349; 01cv7974; 01cv9417; 01cv10740; 01;cv9442; 01cv4147; 01cv6661; 01cv3483; 01cv6757; 01cv10990; 01cv6627; 01cv7726; 01cv9651; 01cv4183; 01cv3910; 01cv7028; 01cv5332; 01cv9798; 01cv11239; 01cv6089; 01cv6004; 01cv10823; 01cv10945; 01cv7280; 01cv10775; 01cv5354; 01cv7032; 01cv9744; 01cv9904; 01cv11217; 01cv10185; 01cv7279; 01cv2261; 01cv6082; 01cv10867; 01cv10160; 01cv10898; 01cv10683; 01cv2712; 01cv6090; 01cv10942; 01cv10120; 01cv11245; 01cv5225; 01cv6950; 01cv9746; 01cv7415; 01cv4941; 01cv10831; 01cv5600; 01cv10941; 01cv9921; 01cv4186; 01cv6846; 01cv6821; 01cv7474; 01cv5267; 01cv6288; 01cv7247; 01cv6110; 01cv10822; 01cv6008; 01cv5269; 01cv9563; 01cv9348; 01cv9604; 01cv5739; 01cv10999; 01cv3450; 01cv5241; 01cv9720; 01cv10040; 01cv6906; 01cv9514; 01cv10833; 01cv10092; 01cv10053; 01cv6768; 01cv10830; 01cv10638; 01cv4779; 01cv5074. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 9/30/04)... Original Document filed in 21-mc-92, Doc#5367.(sac, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: MOTION, Doc#5191, (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) to Intervene. Original Document filed in 21mc92, Doc#5279. (sac, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/1/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          STIPULATION AND ORDER; that Arnold & Porter is substituted in place of Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP, as counsel for defendants E Trade Group, Inc. in this action. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/24/03)... Original Document filed in 21MC92, Doc#5237. (sac, )
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/4/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) to Intervene. Document filed by Brenda Abbruzzino. Original Document filed in 21 MC 92, Doc#5195. (sac, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/4/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              NOTICE OF OMNIBUS MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) to Intervene EACH CLASS MEMBER named on Exhibit 1 attached to Memorandum of Law in Support, as class plaintiffs in those coordinated actions. This Document Relates to: 01cv5902; 01cv2359; 01cv10901; 01cv3360; 01cv6890; 01cv5446; 01cv2858; 01cv10827; 01cv9883; 01cv6397; 01cv6613; 01cv6271; 01cv10839; 01cv5937; 01cv6222; 01cv7669; 01cv10971; 01cv5575; 01cv7044; 01cv10943; 01cv10686; 01cv10105; 01cv5834; 01cv6542; 01cv7000; 01cv10944; 01cv3792; 01cv4942; 01cv11231; 01cv6887; 01cv6242; 01cv7467; 01cv9411; 01cv9414; 01cv6775; 01cv5911; 01cv11246; 01cv7055; 01cv6948; 01cv10164; 01cv10813; 01cv7084; 01cv10738; 01cv10640; 01cv10884; 01cv10741; 01cv6339; 01cv6771; 01cv9743; 01cv62672; 01cv6842; 01cv6277; 01cv9922; 01cv10969; 01cv6084; 01cv3975; 01cv7654; 01cv9917; 01cv9349; 01cv 7974; 01cv9417; 01cv 10740; 01cv992; 01cv4147; 01cv6661; 01cv3483; 01cv6757; 01cv10990; 01cv6627; 01cv7726; 01cv9651; 01cv4183; 01cv3910; 01cv7028; 01cv5332; 01cv9798; 01cv11239; 01cv6089; 01cv6004; 01cv10823; 01cv10945; 01cv7280; 01cv10775; 01cv5354; 01cv7032; 01cv9744; 01cv9904; 01cv11217; 01cv10185; 01cv7279; 01cv2261; 01cv6082; 01cv10867; 01cv10160; 01cv10898; 01cv10683; 01cv2712; 01cv6090; 01cv10942; 01cv10120; 01cv11245; 01cv5225; 01cv6950; 01cv9746; 01cv7415; 01cv4941; 01cv10831; 01cv5600; 01cv10941; 01cv9921; 01cv4186; 01cv6846; 01cv6821; 01cv7474; 01cv5267; 01cv6288; 01cv7247; 01cv6110; 01cv10822; 01cv6008; 01cv5269; 01cv9563; 01cv9348; 01cv9604; 01cv5739; 01cv10999; 01cv3450; 01cv5241; 01cv9720; 01cv10040; 01cv6906; 01cv9514; 01cv10833; 01cv10092; 01cv10053; 01cv6768; 01cv10830; 01cv10638; 01cv4779; 01cv5074. Origianl Document filed in 21MC92, Doc#5191. Document filed by Salvatore Abbruzzino, Brenda Abbruzzino. (sac, )
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ANSWER to Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by DLJDirect, Inc.. Related document: 27 Amended Complaint filed by Sannaka Wettimuny.(sac, ) (Entered: 04/01/2004)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  ANSWER to Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Credit Suisse First Boston Corp.. Related document: 27 Amended Complaint filed by Sannaka Wettimuny.(sac, ) (Entered: 03/31/2004)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/29/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    ANSWER by Morgan Stanley Dean to [27-1] amended complaint . (Attorney Steven G. Bradbury from the Firm: Kirkland & Ellis). (moc) (Entered: 11/22/2003)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/29/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      ANSWER by Prudential to [27-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Sarah S. Gold from the Firm: Proskauer Ross, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 10/09/2003)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/23/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        ANSWER by SoundView Technology to [27-1] amended complaint . (Attorney Michele A. Coffey from the Firm: Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 09/19/2003)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/23/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          ANSWER by Jeffries & Company to [27-1] amended complaint . (Attorney Michele A. Coffey from the Firm: Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 09/19/2003)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/23/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            ANSWER by E-Trade Group, Inc. to [27-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Michele A. Coffey from the Firm: Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 09/19/2003)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              ANSWER by Merrill Lynch to [27-1] amended complaint . (Attorney Mark Holland from the Firm: Clifford Chance US, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 09/16/2003)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                ANSWER by SG Cowen Securities to [27-1] amended complaint . (Attorney Scott D. Musoff from the Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 08/22/2003)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  ANSWER by Robertson Stephens to [27-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Brendan Joseph Dowd from the O'Melveny & Myers, LLP)... rec'd in the night deposit box on 7/21/03 at 7:27 p.m. (sac) (Entered: 08/19/2003)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    ANSWER by UBS Warburg LLC to [27-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Jeffrey A. Rosenthal from the Cleary, Gottlieb, Steen & Hamilton)... rec'd in the night deposit box on 7/21/03 at 7:47 p.m. (sac) (Entered: 08/12/2003)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      ANSWER by Thomas Weisel to [27-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Jeffrey A. Rosenthal from the Cleary, Gottlieb, Steen & Hamilton)... rec'd in the night deposit box on 7/21/03 at 7:43 p.m. (sac) (Entered: 08/08/2003)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        ANSWER by Lehman Bros., Inc. to [27-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Moses Silverman from the Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 08/07/2003)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/4/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          NOTICE of Firm Registration as an LLP and Name Change by Lehman Brothers, Inc. (sac) (Entered: 04/07/2003)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/5/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER, substituting Proskauer Rose LLP in place of Katten Muchin Zavis Rosenman as counsel for deft Prudential Securities Inc. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ) (sac) (Entered: 03/03/2003)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/23/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              Order admitting Edwards M. Posner & Kristofor T. Henning to appear as attorney pro hac vice for Armando Geday, Robert McMullan, James Coulter, Thomas Epley, Keith Geeslin & John Marren. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed (sac) (Entered: 07/30/2002)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/28/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Amended Complaint & Master Allegations List as to Armando Geday, Robert McMullan, James Coulter, Thomas Epley, Keith Geeslin, John Marren by mail on 5/24/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/24/2002)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to UBS Warburg LLC by Cynthia M. Walshe, director legal & external affairs, on 1/17/02. Answer due on 2/6/02 for UBS Warburg LLC. (sac) (Entered: 12/03/2002)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Lehman Bros., Inc. by Donna Keating, Administrative Asst., on 1/18/02. Answer due on 2/7/02 for Lehman Bros., Inc. (sac) (Entered: 12/03/2002)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/3/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Prudential by Linda F. Albuja, Legal Asst., on 1/18/02. Answer due on 2/7/02 for Prudential. (sac) (Entered: 12/03/2002)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/25/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of summons and complaint as to James Coulter by Regina McGrade on 4/19/02 . Answer due on 5/9/02 for James Coulter . (db) (Entered: 04/29/2002)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/25/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of summons and complaint as to Thomas Epley by Regina McGade on 4/19/02. Answer due on 5/9/02 for Thomas Epley. (db) (Entered: 04/29/2002)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/25/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of summons and complaint as to Robert McMullan by Regina McGrade on 4/19/02 . Answer due on 5/9/02 for Robert McMullan . (db) (Entered: 04/29/2002)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/25/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of summons and complaint as to Keith Geeslin by Regina McGrade on 4/19/02 . Answer due on 5/9/02 for Keith Geeslin . (db) (Entered: 04/29/2002)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/25/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of summons and complaint as to Armando Geday by Regina McGrade on 4/19/02. Answer due on 5/9/02 for Armando Geday. (db) (Entered: 04/29/2002)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/25/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of summons and complaint as to John Marren by Regina McGrade on 4/19/02. Answer due on 5/9/02 for John Marren. (db) (Entered: 04/29/2002)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/23/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint as to E-Trade Group, Inc. by Jennifer Lee-Ueyama on 4/22/02. Answer due on 5/13/02 for E-Trade Group, Inc. (jco) (Entered: 04/25/2002)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      MASTER ALLEGATIONS by Sannaka Wettimuny RE: Amended Complaint, doc.# 27, Filed on April 19, 2002. (ac)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT by Sannaka Wettimuny amending [1-1] complaint ; Summons issued. (ac) (Entered: 07/17/2002)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          OMNIBUS ORDER, granting [15-1] motion for an order, appointing Movant as Lead Pltff, granting [15-2] motion for an order, approving Movant's selection of the IPO Securities Litigation Pltffs' Executive Committee to serve as Lead Counsel. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (orig. doc. filed in 21 mc 92, doc. #4319) (sac)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/17/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to E-Trade Group, Inc. by Sarah Devore, agent, on 1/30/02. (sac) (Entered: 05/08/2002)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/12/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              STIPULATION AND ORDER, substituting Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP in place of Kelley Drye & Warren LLP as attys for deft E*Trade Group, Inc. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ). (orig. doc. filed in 21 mc 92, #4074) (sac) Modified on 05/07/2002
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/15/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by E-Trade Group, Inc. (orig. filed in 01 Civ. 10186) (sac)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/15/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  NOTICE of attorney appearance for E-Trade Group, Inc. by Robert E. Crotty. (sac) (Entered: 03/07/2002)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/28/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    DECLARATION of Ian T. Stoll by Sannaka Wettimuny in support Re: [15-1] motion for an order, appointing Movant as Lead Pltff, [15-2] motion for an order, approving Movant's selection of the IPO Securities Litigation Pltffs' Executive Committee to serve as Lead Counsel. (sac) (Entered: 02/26/2002)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/28/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Sannaka Wettimuny in support of [15-1] motion for an order, appointing Movant as Lead Pltff, [15-2] motion for an order, approving Movant's selection of the IPO Securities Litigation Pltffs' Executive Committee to serve as Lead Counsel. (sac) (Entered: 02/26/2002)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/28/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION by Sannaka Wettimuny for an order, appointing Movant as Lead Pltff ; for an order, approving Movant's selection of the IPO Securities Litigation Pltffs' Executive Committee to serve as Lead Counsel ; Return date not indicated. (rec'd in the night deposit box on 1/28/02 at 5:05 p.m.) (sac) (Entered: 02/26/2002)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by UBS Warburg LLC. (rec'd in the night deposit box on 1/18/02 at 5:26 p.m.) (sac) (Entered: 02/15/2002)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Thomas Weisel Partners, LLC. (rec'd in the night deposit box on 1/18/02 at 5:26 p.m.) (sac) (Entered: 02/15/2002)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint as to Thomas Weisel by Charlotte Gaither, an agent, on 1/21/01. (sac) (Entered: 02/13/2002)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint as to SG Cowen Securities by John P. Bardakjy, an Analyst in the Legal Dept., on 1/10/02. Answer due on 1/30/02 for SG Cowen Securities. (sac) (Entered: 02/13/2002)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/11/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint as to Jeffries & Company by David Rich, Sr. V.P., on 1/10/02. Answer due on 1/30/02 for Jeffries & Company. (sac) (Entered: 02/13/2002)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/8/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint as to Fleetboston by Andrew J. Frackman on 1/7/02. (sac) (Entered: 02/08/2002)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/8/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint as to Merrill Lynch by Ethel Lambert, receptionist on 1/7/02. (sac) (Entered: 02/08/2002)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/8/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint as to Donaldson, Lufkin by Susan M. Steffen, Asst. Vice President/Legal & Complaince Dept. on 1/7/02. (sac) (Entered: 02/08/2002)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/8/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Complaint as to Morgan Stanley Dean by Steven Bradbury on 1/8/02. (sac) (Entered: 02/08/2002)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Robertson Stephens. (sac) (Entered: 02/07/2002)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              AMENDED RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Jeffries & Company. (ph) (Entered: 01/24/2002)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Morgan Stanley Dean . (gmo) (Entered: 01/21/2002)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Collegeware Asset . (moc) (Entered: 11/30/2001)
                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. (moc)
                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/28/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 423960. (moc) (Entered: 11/30/2001)
                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 12 times.

                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?