iBasis, Inc. IPO v. iBasis, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-06272
District Judge Shira A. Scheindlin, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 11, 2019 at 2:08 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ken Thomason, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Lieb Merkin, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Robin Kwalbrun, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Menachem E. Lifshitz +1 212 779 1414 lifshitz@bernlieb.com
No Logo Sharon Merkin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Solomon Merkin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Steven E. Smith, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
v.
No Logo Bancboston Robertson Stephens Inc., Defendant
No Logo Charles N. Corfield, Defendant
No Logo Charles S. Houser, Defendant
No Logo Chase Securities Inc., Defendant
No Logo Gordon J. Vanderbrug, Defendant
No Logo Hambrecht & Quist, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Ibasis Inc., Defendant
No Logo Izhar Armony, Defendant
No Logo J.P. Morgan Sec., Defendant
No Logo John Jarve, Defendant
No Logo Michael J. Hughes, Defendant
No Logo Ofer Gneezy, Defendant
RBC Dain Rauscher Corporation RBC Dain Rauscher Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Robert Maginn, Defendant
U.S. Bancorp Piper Jaffray, Inc. U.S. Bancorp Piper Jaffray, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Foley & Lardner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Dean M. Jeske +1 312 832 4500 +1 312 832 4700 djeske@foley.com
No Logo Antoine Porges, Intervenor Plaintiff
No Logo Marek Bartula, Intervenor Plaintiff
No Logo Arthur Bloom, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Frederick W. Gerkens, III +1 212 382 2221 +1 212 382 3944 fgerkens.esq@verizon.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Harwood Feffer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert Ira Harwood +1 212 935 7400 +1 212 753 3630 rharwood@whesq.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Jeffrey Michael Norton +1 212 619 5400 +1 212 619 3090 jnorton@nfllp.com
No Logo Bartula Marek, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Strull Strull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stull, Stull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Tzivia Brody +1 212 687 7230

Toggle Switch Represented by WeissLaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph Harry Weiss +1 212 682 3025 +1 212 682 3010 jweiss@weisslawllp.com
No Logo David M. Mehalick, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Gustavo Fabian Bruckner +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 gfBruckner@pomlaw.com
No Logo Jimmy Chin, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Gregory Mark Nespole +1 212 545 4657 +1 212 545 4693 nespole@whafh.com
No Logo Joan Manzione, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Robinson & Cole LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Soo Hyun Im +1 212 451 2916 +1 212 451 2999 sim@rc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf, Popper, Ross, Wolf & Jones, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert Craig Finkel +1 212 759 4600 +1 212 486 2093 rfinkel@wolfpopper.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert M. Kornreich +1 212 759 4600 +1 212 486 2093 rkornreich@wolfpopper.com
No Logo Lori Will, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo James Stevens, Movant
No Logo Jane A. Helling, Movant
No Logo Midge Lipkin, Movant
No Logo One Focus, Inc., Movant
No Logo Rockwell Schnabel, Movant
No Logo Steven D. Helling, Movant
No Logo Steven Lazrove, Movant
No Logo Robertson Stephens, Inc., Consolidated Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Brendan Joseph Dowd +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 bdowd@omm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew Jay Frackman +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 afrackman@omm.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 77
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (46) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/9/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT, Settling action. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/24/09) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Right to Appeal)(dt) (Entered: 12/09/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    STIPULATION AND ORDER that the Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement with defendant Issuers and Individuals submitted to the Court on 6/10/4, is hereby terminated purs to Paragraph 39 of the Proposed Partial Settlement. However, purs to paragraph 40 of the Proposed Partial Settlement, that paragraph, and the paragraphs referred to therein, shall survive the termination of the Proposed Partial Settlement. This Stipulation resolves (5527) Motion to Approve of Class action settlement. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this motion. This document relates to: All cases listed on Schedule I. (orig fld in 21mc92, #5620). (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/25/07) (cd)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF OMNIBUS MOTION FOR INTERVENTION; the Class members listed on Exhibit 1 to this Notice hereby withdraw, without prejudice to renewal, their Omnibus Motion for Intervention (Doc. No. 5191 on Dkt. 21 MC 92) that was filed on 9/2/03. This Document Relates to: 01cv5902; 01cv2359; 01cv10901; 01cv3360; 01cv6890; 01cv5446; 01cv2858; 01cv10827; 01cv9883; 01cv6397; 01cv6613; 01cv6271; 01cv10839; 01cv5937; 01cv6222; 01cv7669; 01cv10971; 01cv5575; 01cv7044; 01cv10943; 01cv10686; 01cv10105; 01cv5834; 01cv6542; 01cv7000; 01cv10944; 01cv3792; 01cv4942; 01cv11231; 01cv6887; 01cv5948; 01cv6242; 01cv7467; 01cv9411; 01cv9414; 01cv6775; 01cv5911; 01cv11246; 01cv7055; 01cv6948; 01cv10164; 01cv10813; 01cv7048; 01cv10738; 01cv10640; 01cv10884; 01cv10741; 01cv6339; 01cv6771; 01cv9743; 01cv6272; 01cv6842; 01cv6277; 01cv9922; 01cv10969; 01cv6084; 01cv3975; 01cv7654; 01cv9917; 01cv9349; 01cv7974; 01cv9417; 01cv10740; 01;cv9442; 01cv4147; 01cv6661; 01cv3483; 01cv6757; 01cv10990; 01cv6627; 01cv7726; 01cv9651; 01cv4183; 01cv3910; 01cv7028; 01cv5332; 01cv9798; 01cv11239; 01cv6089; 01cv6004; 01cv10823; 01cv10945; 01cv7280; 01cv10775; 01cv5354; 01cv7032; 01cv9744; 01cv9904; 01cv11217; 01cv10185; 01cv7279; 01cv2261; 01cv6082; 01cv10867; 01cv10160; 01cv10898; 01cv10683; 01cv2712; 01cv6090; 01cv10942; 01cv10120; 01cv11245; 01cv5225; 01cv6950; 01cv9746; 01cv7415; 01cv4941; 01cv10831; 01cv5600; 01cv10941; 01cv9921; 01cv4186; 01cv6846; 01cv6821; 01cv7474; 01cv5267; 01cv6288; 01cv7247; 01cv6110; 01cv10822; 01cv6008; 01cv5269; 01cv9563; 01cv9348; 01cv9604; 01cv5739; 01cv10999; 01cv3450; 01cv5241; 01cv9720; 01cv10040; 01cv6906; 01cv9514; 01cv10833; 01cv10092; 01cv10053; 01cv6768; 01cv10830; 01cv10638; 01cv4779; 01cv5074. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 9/30/04)... Original Document filed in 21-mc-92, Doc#5367.(sac, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: MOTION, Doc#5191, (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) to Intervene. Original Document filed in 21mc92, Doc#5279. (sac, )
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/4/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) to Intervene. Document filed by Marek Bartula. Original Document filed in 21 MC 92, Doc#5195.(sac, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/4/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          NOTICE OF OMNIBUS MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) to Intervene EACH CLASS MEMBER named on Exhibit 1 attached to Memorandum of Law in Support, as class plaintiffs in those coordinated actions. This Document Relates to: 01cv5902; 01cv2359; 01cv10901; 01cv3360; 01cv6890; 01cv5446; 01cv2858; 01cv10827; 01cv9883; 01cv6397; 01cv6613; 01cv6271; 01cv10839; 01cv5937; 01cv6222; 01cv7669; 01cv10971; 01cv5575; 01cv7044; 01cv10943; 01cv10686; 01cv10105; 01cv5834; 01cv6542; 01cv7000; 01cv10944; 01cv3792; 01cv4942; 01cv11231; 01cv6887; 01cv6242; 01cv7467; 01cv9411; 01cv9414; 01cv6775; 01cv5911; 01cv11246; 01cv7055; 01cv6948; 01cv10164; 01cv10813; 01cv7084; 01cv10738; 01cv10640; 01cv10884; 01cv10741; 01cv6339; 01cv6771; 01cv9743; 01cv62672; 01cv6842; 01cv6277; 01cv9922; 01cv10969; 01cv6084; 01cv3975; 01cv7654; 01cv9917; 01cv9349; 01cv 7974; 01cv9417; 01cv 10740; 01cv992; 01cv4147; 01cv6661; 01cv3483; 01cv6757; 01cv10990; 01cv6627; 01cv7726; 01cv9651; 01cv4183; 01cv3910; 01cv7028; 01cv5332; 01cv9798; 01cv11239; 01cv6089; 01cv6004; 01cv10823; 01cv10945; 01cv7280; 01cv10775; 01cv5354; 01cv7032; 01cv9744; 01cv9904; 01cv11217; 01cv10185; 01cv7279; 01cv2261; 01cv6082; 01cv10867; 01cv10160; 01cv10898; 01cv10683; 01cv2712; 01cv6090; 01cv10942; 01cv10120; 01cv11245; 01cv5225; 01cv6950; 01cv9746; 01cv7415; 01cv4941; 01cv10831; 01cv5600; 01cv10941; 01cv9921; 01cv4186; 01cv6846; 01cv6821; 01cv7474; 01cv5267; 01cv6288; 01cv7247; 01cv6110; 01cv10822; 01cv6008; 01cv5269; 01cv9563; 01cv9348; 01cv9604; 01cv5739; 01cv10999; 01cv3450; 01cv5241; 01cv9720; 01cv10040; 01cv6906; 01cv9514; 01cv10833; 01cv10092; 01cv10053; 01cv6768; 01cv10830; 01cv10638; 01cv4779; 01cv5074. Origianl Document filed in 21MC92, Doc#5191. Document filed by Marek Bartula, Antoine Porges. (sac, )
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/23/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ANSWER by U.S. Bancorp Piper to [29-1] amended complaint . (Attorney Dean M. Jeske from the Firm: Foley & Lardner). (sac) (Entered: 09/22/2003)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              ANSWER by Robertson Stephens to [29-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Brendan Joseph Dowd from the O'Melveny & Myers, LLP)... rec'd in the night deposit box on 7/21/03 at 7:27 p.m. (sac) (Entered: 08/20/2003)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                (UNSIGNED) STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL; this action purs. to Stipulation and Order entered in 21 mc 92, doc. #5059, hereby dismisses without prejudice and without costs as to defts John Jarve, Robert Maginn, Ishar Amony, Ofer Gneezy, Charles Houser, Gordon VanderBrug, Michael Hughes and Charles Corfield. (Orig. filed and signed by Judge Scheindlin in 21 mc 92.) (sac)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Amended Complaint as to Dain Rauscher by John Orenstein, Managing Agent on 4/3/02. (gf) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Amended Complaint as to U.S. Bancorp Piper by Patrice Blaeser, Managing Agent on 4/3/02. (gf) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Supplemental Summons & Amended Complaint as to Dain Rauscher by John Orenstein, managing agent, on 4/3/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        MASTER ALLEGATIONS by Lieb Merkin, Inc., Sharon Merkin, Solomon Merkin RE: Amended Complaint, doc.# 29, Filed on April 19, 2002. (ac)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          AMENDED COMPLAINT by Lieb Merkin, Inc., Sharon Merkin, Solomon Merkin amending [22-1] amended complaint, [1-1] complaint ; Summons issued. (ac) (Entered: 06/24/2002)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            OMNIBUS ORDER, Leib Merkin, Sharon Merkin and Solomon Merkin are hereby appointed as lead pltffs and their selection of the Executive Committee to serve as Lead Counsel is approved. All other motions to be appointed lead pltff and for approval of lead counsel are hereby denied. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (orig. filed in 21 mc 92, doc. #4319) (sac) Modified on 05/29/2002
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Amended Complaint as to Chase Securities by Rosa A. Laraque, managing agent, on 3/28/02. (sac) (Entered: 05/17/2002)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Amended Complaint as to Chase Securities by Rosa A. Laraque, managing agent, on 3/28/02. (sac) (Entered: 05/17/2002)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/4/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE of S&C returned executed as to Hambrecht & Quist, Chase Securities mailed on 3/14/02. Answer due on 5/13/02 for Hambrecht & Quist, for Chase Securities. (sac) (Entered: 04/10/2002)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/27/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    WAIVER OF SERVICE of S&C returned as to David W. Ichel executed mailed on 3/14/02 (sac) (Entered: 04/08/2002)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/27/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE of S&C as to Brendan J. Dowd returned executed mailed on 3/14/02. (sac) (Entered: 04/08/2002)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Robertson Stephens. (sac) (Entered: 02/07/2002)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/6/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by Robin Kwalbrun, Ken Thomason, Steven E. Smith (Answer due 12/19/01 for iBasis, Inc., for BancBoston, for Hambrecht & Quist, for U.S. Bancorp Piper, for Michael J. Hughes, for Gordon J. Vanderbrug) amending [1-1] complaint against Chase Securities, Dain Rauscher, Ofer Gneezy; Summons issued. (sac) (Entered: 12/17/2001)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/28/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Lieb Merkin, Inc., Sharon Merkin, Solomon Merkin, Rockwell Schnabel, Midge Lipkin, Steven Lazrove in further support of [11-2] motion for an Order appointing Movant as Lead Plaintiffs, [11-3] motion for an order to approve Movants selection of Lead Counsel; in opposition to: [14-2] motion for an order appointing Movants a lead plaintiffs, [14-3] motion for an order to approve movants selection of a lead counsel, [6-2] motion for an order appointing Movant as Lead plaintiff, [6-3] motion for an Order to approve movants selection as Lead Counsel. (rec'd in the night deposit box on 9/28/01 at 7:04 p.m.) (sac) (Entered: 10/17/2001)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW by James Stevens in further support of [6-1] motion for an order to consolidate case 01-CV-6272 (Lead case) with member cases: 01-CV-6876; 01-CV-7088; 01-CV-7225; 01-CV-7250; 01-CV-7726; 01-CV-7729, [6-2] motion for an order appointing Movant as Lead plaintiff, [6-3] motion for an Order to approve movants selection as Lead Counsel . (received through the night deposit box on 9/26/01 at 7:14 pm) (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/11/2001)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                NOTICE OF MOTION by iBasis, Inc., Ofer Gneezy, Michael J. Hughes, Gordon J. Vanderbrug, Robert Maginn, Charles S. Houser, Izhar Armony, John Jarve, Charles N. Corfield for to appear pro hac vice by attorney Steven W. Hansen . Return date not indicated. (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/11/2001)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Hambrecht & Quist . (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/11/2001)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by J.P. Morgan Chase . (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/11/2001)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      DECLARATION of Jonathan M. Stein by Steven D. Helling, Jane A. Helling, One Focus, Inc. in support Re: [14-1] motion for an Order to consolidate cases, [14-2] motion for an order appointing Movants a lead plaintiffs, [14-3] motion for an order to approve movants selection of a lead counsel . (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/11/2001)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Steven D. Helling, Jane A. Helling, One Focus, Inc. in support of [14-1] motion for an Order to consolidate cases, [14-2] motion for an order appointing Movants a lead plaintiffs, [14-3] motion for an order to approve movants selection of a lead counsel . (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/11/2001)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          NOTICE OF MOTION by Steven D. Helling, Jane A. Helling, One Focus, Inc. for an Order to consolidate cases, for an order appointing Movants a lead plaintiffs, for an order to approve movants selection of a lead counsel . Return date . (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/11/2001)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            DECLARATION of Aaron Brody by Lieb Merkin, Inc., Sharon Merkin, Solomon Merkin, Rockwell Schnabel, Midge Lipkin, Steven Lazrove in support Re: [11-1] motion for an Order to consolidate case 01-CV-6272 with memeber cases 01-CV-6876; 01-CV-7088; 01-CV7225; 01-CV-7250; 01-CV-7726; 01-CV-7729, [11-2] motion for an Order appointing Movant as Lead Plaintiffs, [11-3] motion for an order to approve Movants selection of Lead Counsel . (Received in the night deposit box on 9/10/01 at 11:09 pm) (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/11/2001)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Lieb Merkin, Inc., Sharon Merkin, Solomon Merkin, Rockwell Schnabel, Midge Lipkin, Steven Lazrove in support of [11-1] motion for an Order to consolidate case 01-CV-6272 with memeber cases 01-CV-6876; 01-CV-7088; 01-CV7225; 01-CV-7250; 01-CV-7726; 01-CV-7729, [11-2] motion for an Order appointing Movant as Lead Plaintiffs, [11-3] motion for an order to approve Movants selection of Lead Counsel . (Received in the night deposit box on 9/10/01 at 11:03 pm) (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/11/2001)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION by Lieb Merkin, Inc., Sharon Merkin, Solomon Merkin, Rockwell Schnabel, Midge Lipkin, Steven Lazrove, (The Merkin Lead Plantiffs" for an Order to consolidate case 01-CV-6272 with memeber cases 01-CV-6876; 01-CV-7088; 01-CV7225; 01-CV-7250; 01-CV-7726; 01-CV-7729, for an Order appointing Movant as Lead Plaintiffs, for an order to approve Movants selection of Lead Counsel . Return date not indicated. (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/11/2001)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  DECLARATION of Samuel H. Rudman by James Stevens in support Re: [6-1] motion for an order to consolidate case 01-CV-6272 (Lead case) with member cases: 01-CV-6876; 01-CV-7088; 01-CV-7225; 01-CV-7250; 01-CV-7726; 01-CV-7729, [6-2] motion for an order appointing Movant as Lead plaintiff, [6-3] motion for an Order to approve movants selection as Lead Counsel . (received through the night deposit box on 9/10/01 at 10:30 pm) (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/11/2001)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW by James Stevens in support of [6-1] motion for an order to consolidate case 01-CV-6272 (Lead case) with member cases: 01-CV-6876; 01-CV-7088; 01-CV-7225; 01-CV-7250; 01-CV-7726; 01-CV-7729, [6-2] motion for an order appointing Movant as Lead plaintiff, [6-3] motion for an Order to approve movants selection as Lead Counsel . (Received through the night deposit box on 9/10/01 at 10:30 pm) (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/11/2001)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION by James Stevens for an order to consolidate case 01-CV-6272 (Lead case) with member cases: 01-CV-6876; 01-CV-7088; 01-CV-7225; 01-CV-7250; 01-CV-7726; 01-CV-7729, for an order appointing Movant as Lead plaintiff, for an Order to approve movants selection as Lead Counsel . Return date not indicated. (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/11/2001)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER granting [19-1] motion for to appear pro hac vice by attorney Steven W. Hansen . ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/11/2001)
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Robin Kwalbrun . (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/11/2001)
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER; that the time for defts FleetBoston Robertson Stephens, Inc. and J.P. Morgan Chase to answer, move against or otherwise respond to the complaint in this action is extended until after the Court appoints lead pltff(s) and lead counsel purs. to a schedule agreed upon by the parties. That within 14 days after the Court has appointed a lead pltff and lead counsel, the parties will confer and submit to the Court a schedule for the filing of a consolidated or amended complaint, if any, and defts' responses thereto. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ) rec'd in the night deposit box on 8/31/01 at 5:12 p.m. (sac) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Consolidated Lead Case. (dcap)
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER,... that all cases involving Ibasis in this IPO Securities Litigation, as set forth in the attached Rider (1:01-cv-06784, 1:01-cv-06876, 1:01-cv-07088, 1:01-cv-07225, 1:01-cv-07250, 1:01-cv-07726 and 1:01-cv-07729), shall be consolidated into case number 01 Civ. 6272. The Clerk of Court is hereby ordered to consolidate any future cases that are designated as related to 01 Civ. 6272,... the Clerk of Court is further ordered to close all cases that have been consolidated, subject to re-opening at a later date on proper application by a party ... ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. [Original filed in 1:01-cv-06272 Document No. 4. Document Docketed in 1:01-cv-06784; 1:01-cv-06876; 1:01-cv-07088; 1:01-cv-07225; 1:01-cv-07250; 1:01-cv-07726; 1:01-cv-07729] (dcap) (Entered: 10/02/2001)
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/4/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by iBasis, Inc. (sac) (Entered: 09/07/2001)
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Pretrial Conference set at 4:30 9/7/01 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (dcap)
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                      Notice of Case Reassignment to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Copy of notice mailed to Attorney(s) of record. Pursuant to the Order of Chief Judge Mukasey dated August 8, 2001, the above entitled action is reassigned to the calendar of Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for inclusion in the coordinated pretrial proceedings being conducted by that judge. Two originals of all future documents submitted in this action are to be presented in the Clerk's Office for filing. One original is to be filed in this docket number and one original is to be filed in the miscellaneous case number 21mc92 (SAS). Each shall bear the original assigned judge's ( ) initials after the original docket number. Attached is a copy of Judge Mukasey's ORDER re: coordinating the proceedings before Judge Scheindlin. Also attached is a copy of Judge Scheindlin's ORDER re: set initial PTC 09/07/01 and directing all counsel to comply with Judge Scheindlin's requirements. [Original Orders docketed in 21mc92 (SAS) as documents numbers 1 and 2] (dcap) (Entered: 08/10/2001)
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/11/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. (jco)
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/11/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 411378. (jco) (Entered: 07/12/2001)
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                            This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                            Space
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                             
                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                            Need Password Help?