Intersil Holding IPO v. Intersil Holding
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-05144
District Judge Shira A. Scheindlin, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 10, 2019 at 11:06 PM EST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Donald E. Benjamin, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Sandy A Liebhard +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 liebhard@bernlieb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph R. Seidman +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 seidman@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrei V. Rado +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1299

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo John Buescher, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo Murowa Financial, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Menachem E. Lifshitz +1 212 779 1414 lifshitz@bernlieb.com
No Logo Robert P. Jordan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Strull Strull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stull, Stull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Tzivia Brody +1 212 687 7230

Toggle Switch Represented by WeissLaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph Harry Weiss +1 212 682 3025 +1 212 682 3010 jweiss@weisslawllp.com
v.
No Logo Arnold Chase, Defendant
Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Daniel J. Heneghan, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/15/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/15/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY William K Dodds +1 212 698 3500 +1 212 698 3599 william.dodds@dechert.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/15/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/15/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Najma Q. Rana +1 212 698 3500
No Logo Fleetboston Robertson Stephens Inc., Defendant
No Logo Gregory L. Williams, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/15/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/15/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY William K Dodds +1 212 698 3500 +1 212 698 3599 william.dodds@dechert.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/15/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/15/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Najma Q. Rana +1 212 698 3500
No Logo Intersil Holding Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/15/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/15/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY William K Dodds +1 212 698 3500 +1 212 698 3599 william.dodds@dechert.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/15/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 10/15/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Najma Q. Rana +1 212 698 3500
No Logo J.P. Morgan Sec., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph M. McLaughlin +1 212 455 2000 jmclaughlin@stblaw.com
No Logo Julie B. Forbes, Defendant
No Logo Larry W. Sims, Defendant
No Logo Lawrence J. Ciaccia, Defendant
Lehman Brothers, Inc. Lehman Brothers, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Lehman Abs Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Moses Silverman +1 212 315 3082

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Debra Lee Bogo-Ernst

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew Emanuel Tauber +1 202 263 3324 +1 202 263 5324 atauber@mayerbrown.com
Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc. Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith Incorporated"
Officer/Director, Cumulus Media Inc.
Officer/Director, Chart Industries, Inc.
Officer/Director, Lodgian, Inc.
Officer/Director, Mlgpe Ltd
Merrill Lynch GP Inc. Officer/Director, Merrill Lynch GP Inc.
Officer/Director, Merrill Lynch & Co Inc
Officer/Director, Merrill Lynch Group, Inc
Hertz Global Holdings Inc Officer/Director, Hertz Global Holdings Inc
Merrill Lynch International Officer/Director, Merrill Lynch International
Officer/Director, Merrill Lynch Trust Co Fsb
Officer/Director, Infospace.com, Inc.
Officer/Director, Fund Asset Management Lp
Officer/Director, New BlackRock, Inc.
Officer/Director, Princeton Administrators Lp
Officer/Director, NATIONSBANK CORP
Bank of America, NA Officer/Director, Bank of America, NA
Officer/Director, Blue Ridge Investments, LLC
Officer/Director, Gabelli Utility Fund
Officer/Director, Pimco High Income Fund
Officer/Director, Koll Real Estate Group Inc
Officer/Director, Uslife Income Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Muniholdings Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Munienhanced Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Muniyield Quality Fund Inc
Officer/Director, Munivest Fund II Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Mark Holland +1 212 813 8800 +1 212 355 3333 mholland@goodwinlaw.com
No Logo Robertson Stephens, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Brendan Joseph Dowd +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 bdowd@omm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew Jay Frackman +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 afrackman@omm.com
No Logo Russell W. Morcom, Defendant
No Logo Sg Cowen Securities Corp, Defendant
Officially listed as "SG Cowen Securities Corporation"

Toggle Switch Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY SCOTT DAVID MUSOFF +1 212 735 7852 +1 917 777 7852 scott.musoff@skadden.com
No Logo Smith Barney Inc., Defendant
No Logo Aaron Brody, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Strull Strull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stull, Stull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Tzivia Brody +1 212 687 7230

Toggle Switch Represented by WeissLaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph Harry Weiss +1 212 682 3025 +1 212 682 3010 jweiss@weisslawllp.com
No Logo Aniko Heller Nagy, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Sandy A Liebhard +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 liebhard@bernlieb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph R. Seidman +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 seidman@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrei V. Rado +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1299

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo James Robert Richey, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Sandy A Liebhard +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 liebhard@bernlieb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph R. Seidman +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 seidman@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrei V. Rado +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1299

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Patrick O'Shea, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Sandy A Liebhard +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 liebhard@bernlieb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph R. Seidman +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 seidman@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrei V. Rado +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1299

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Sanat Shankardass, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Sandy A Liebhard +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 liebhard@bernlieb.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph R. Seidman +1 212 779 1414 +1 212 779 3218 seidman@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg Tadler Phillips Grossman LLP (NYC)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrei V. Rado +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1299

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com
No Logo Yehuda Toiv, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Strull Strull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Aaron Lee Brody +1 212 687 7230 +1 212 490 2022 ssbny@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Stull, Stull & Brody

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Tzivia Brody +1 212 687 7230

Toggle Switch Represented by WeissLaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph Harry Weiss +1 212 682 3025 +1 212 682 3010 jweiss@weisslawllp.com
Citigroup Global Markets, Inc. Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Consolidated Defendant
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 77
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (69) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 12/14/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT settling action. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/24/09) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Right to Appeal)(dt) (Entered: 12/14/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    STIPULATION AND ORDER that the Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement with defendant Issuers and Individuals submitted to the Court on 6/10/4, is hereby terminated purs to Paragraph 39 of the Proposed Partial Settlement. However, purs to paragraph 40 of the Proposed Partial Settlement, that paragraph, and the paragraphs referred to therein, shall survive the termination of the Proposed Partial Settlement. This Stipulation resolves (5527) Motion to Approve of Class action settlement. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this motion. This document relates to: All cases listed on Schedule I. (orig fld in 21mc92, #5620). (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/25/07) (cd)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ANSWER to Corrected Consolidate Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Citigroup Global Markets, Inc.. Related document: 43 Amended Complaint filed by Donald E. Benjamin, Patrick O'Shea, James Robert Richey, Robert P. Jordan, John Buescher.(sac, ) (Entered: 03/29/2004)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      ANSWER to Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. Related document: 43 Amended Complaint filed by Donald E. Benjamin, Patrick O'Shea, James Robert Richey, Robert P. Jordan, John Buescher.(sac, ) (Entered: 03/29/2004)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ANSWER by Merrill Lynch, to [43-1] amended complaint . (Attorney Mark Holland from the Firm: Clifford Chance US, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 09/16/2003)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ANSWER by SG Cowen Securities to [43-1] amended complaint . (Attorney Scott D. Musoff from the Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 08/25/2003)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ANSWER by Robertson Stephens to [43-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Brendan Joseph Dowd from the O'Melveny & Myers, LLP)... rec'd in the night deposit box on 7/21/03 at 7:28 p.m. (sac) (Entered: 08/20/2003)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              ANSWER by J.P. Morgan Sec. to [43-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Joseph M. McLaughlin from the Simpson, Thacher & Bartlett, LLP)... rec'd in the night deposit box on 7/21/03 at 6:41 p.m. (sac) (Entered: 08/14/2003)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ANSWER by Lehman Brothers Inc. to [43-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Moses Silverman from the Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 08/07/2003)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  (UNSIGNED) STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL; this action purs. to Stipulation and Order entered in 21 mc 92, doc. #5059, hereby dismisses without prejudice and without costs as to defts Gregory L. Williams, Daniel J. Heneghan, Larry W. Sims, Russell Morcom and Lawrence J. Ciaccia. (Orig. filed and signed by Judge Scheindlin in 21 mc 92.) (sac)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Amended Complaint as to Julie B. Forbes by Ming Gonzalez, co-worker, on 4/3/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/23/2002)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Amended Complaint as to Larry W. Sims by Ming Gonzalez, co-worker, on 4/3/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/23/2002)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Amended Complaint as to Intersil Holding by Ming Gonzalez, managing agent, on 4/3/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/23/2002)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Amended Complaint as to Lawrence J. Ciaccia by Ming Gonzalez, co-worker, on 4/3/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/23/2002)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to W. Russell Morcom by Ming Gonzalez, co-worker, on 4/3/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/23/2002)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Amended Complaint as to Gregory L. Williams by Ming Gonzalez, co-worker, on 4/3/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/23/2002)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/22/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Amended Complaint as to Daniel J. Heneghan by Ming Gonzalez, co-worker, on 4/3/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/23/2002)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/17/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to CIBC World Market by Peter M. Spett, managing agent, on 4/25/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/25/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Amended Complaint as to FleetBoston by Stephen Austin, managing agent, on 4/2/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/17/2002)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/24/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Amended Complaint as to Lehman Brothers Inc. by Collen Kinnon, managing agent, on 4/5/02. (sac) (Entered: 07/16/2002)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        MASTER ALLEGATIONS by Donald E. Benjamin, Robert P. Jordan, John Buescher, James Robert Richey, Patrick O'Shea RE: Amended Complaint, doc.# 43, Filed on April 19, 2002. (ac)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT by Donald E. Benjamin, Patrick O'Shea, James Robert Richey, Robert P. Jordan, John Buescher amending [22-1] amended complaint, [1-1] complaint ; Summons issued. (ac) (Entered: 07/11/2002)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            OMNIBUS ORDER, Donal E. Benjamin and Robert P. Jordan are hereby appointed as lead pltffs and their selection of the Executive Committee to serve as Lead Counsel is approved. All other motions to be appointed lead pltff and for approval of lead counsel are hereby denied. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (orig. doc. filed in 21 mc 92, doc. #4319) (sac)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to Smith Barney Inc. by Andrea Carty, V.P., on 3/28/02. (sac) (Entered: 05/13/2002)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons & Amended Complaint as to Chase Securities by Rosa A. Laraque, managing agent, on 3/28/02. (sac) (Entered: 05/13/2002)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&c as to SG Cowen Securities by John Bardakjy, managing agent, on 4/1/02. (01 Civ. 5144) (sac) (Entered: 05/13/2002)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/14/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of S&C as to SG Cowen Securities by John Bardakjy, managing agent, on 4/1/02. (01 Civ. 5144) (sac) (Entered: 05/13/2002)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/9/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE of S&C returned executed as to Intersil Holding mailed on 3/13/02. Answer due on 5/13/02 for Intersil Holding. (sac) (Entered: 05/06/2002)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/9/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE of S&C returned executed as to Gregory L. Williams mailed on 3/13/02. Answer due on 5/13/02 for Gregory L. Williams. (sac) (Entered: 05/06/2002)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/9/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE of S&C returned executed as to Daniel J. Heneghan mailed on 3/13/02. Answer due on 5/13/02 for Daniel J. Heneghan. (sac) (Entered: 05/06/2002)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/9/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE of S&C returned executed as to Larry W. Sims mailed on 3/13/02. Answer due on 5/13/02 for Larry W. Sims. (sac) (Entered: 05/06/2002)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/9/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE of S&C returned executed as to W. Russell Morcom mailed on 3/13/02. Answer due on 5/13/02 for W. Russell Morcom. (sac) (Entered: 05/06/2002)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/9/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                WAIVER OF SERVICE of S&C returned executed as to Lawrence J. Ciaccia mailed on 3/13/02. Answer due on 5/13/02 for Lawrence J. Ciaccia. (sac) (Entered: 05/06/2002)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/9/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  WAIVER OF SERVICE of S&C returned executed as to Julie B. Forbes mailed on 3/13/02. Answer due on 5/13/02 for Julie B. Forbes. (sac) (Entered: 05/06/2002)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/9/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint as to Credit Suisse First by Mary O'Riordan, Asst. V.P., on 4/1/02. (sac) (Entered: 05/06/2002)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/27/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      WAIVER OF SERVICE of S&C returned executed as to Salomon Smith Barney mailed on 3/13/02. Answer due on 5/13/02 for Salomon Smith Barney. (sac) (Entered: 04/08/2002)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/27/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE of S&C returned executed as to Credit Suisse First mailed on 3/13/02. Answer due on 5/13/02 for Credit Suisse First. (sac) (Entered: 04/08/2002)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/27/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          WAIVER OF SERVICE of S&C as to David W. Ichel returned executed mailed on 3/13/02. (sac) (Entered: 04/08/2002)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/27/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            WAIVER OF SERVICE of S&C returned executed as to Lehman Brothers Inc. mailed on 3/13/02. Answer due on 5/13/02 for Lehman Brothers Inc. (sac) (Entered: 04/08/2002)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/27/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE of S&C as to Bredan J. Dowd, Esq. returned executed mailed on 3/13/02. (sac) (Entered: 04/08/2002)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                CORRECTED CONSOLIDATION ORDER,... that all cases involving the Retek, Inc., initial public offering in this IPO Securities Litigation, including case numbers 01-CV-5270, 01-CV-5832, 01-CV-5854, 01-CV-6102, and 01-CV-6262, shall be consolidaed into case number 01-CV-5225. The Clerk of the Court is hereby Ordered to consolidate any future cases that are designated as related to 01-CV-5225,... the Clerk of the Court is Ordered to close all cases that have been so consolidated, subject to re-oepning at a later date on proper application by a party... This Order corrects and Supersedes the prior consolidation order dated September 10, 2001 issued in connection with the Retek initial public offering securities litigation in this IPO Securities Litigation and filed in the dockets for case numbers 01-CV-5225 and 21 MC 92,... Williams v. Credit Suisse First Boston Corp. et al. 01-CV-5745, was improperly consolidated with lead case number 01-CV-5225. The Clerk of the Court is hereby Ordered to consolidate and close 01-CV-5745 as a consolidated member case under lead case Murowa Financial v. Intersil Holding Corp. et al. 01-CV-5144 ... ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. [Original filed in 1:01-cv-05225 Document No. 14. Document Docketed in 1:01-cv-05270; 1:01-cv-05832; 1:01-cv-05854; 1:01-cv-06102; 1:01-cv-06262; 1:01-cv-05745; 1:01-cv-05144] (dcap)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/14/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  NOTICE of attorney appearance for Lehman Brothers Inc. by Andrew Tauber. (sac) (Entered: 02/15/2002)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Robertson Stephens. (sac) (Entered: 02/07/2002)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Chase Securities Inc. . (bai) (Entered: 01/07/2002)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/6/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT by Murowa Financial, Donald E. Benjamin (Answer due 12/19/01 for Daniel J. Heneghan, for Gregory L. Williams, for Credit Suisse First, for Intersil Holding) amending [1-1] complaint against Smith Barney Inc., Merrill Lynch,, FleetBoston, SG Cowen Securities, Lehman Brothers Inc., Larry W. Sims, W. Russell Morcom, Lawrence J. Ciaccia, Julie B. Forbes; Summons issued. (sac) (Entered: 12/17/2001)
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/20/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Credit Suisse First. (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/18/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            Order admitting Steven B. Feirson as attorney pro hac vice representing defts in this action. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (orig. forwarded to the Atty Admissions Clerk). (sac) (Entered: 10/18/2001)
                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Salomon Smith Barney. (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/6/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Intersil Holding. (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/04/2001)
                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  Consolidated Lead Case. (dcap)
                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER,... that all cases involving Intersil in this IPO Securities Litigation, as set forth in the attached Rider, (1:01-cv-05257) shall be consolidated into case number 01 Civ. 5144. The Clerk of Court is hereby ordered to consolidate any future cases that are designated as related to 01 Civ. 5144,... that the Clerk of Court is further ordered to close all cases that have been consolidated, subject to re-opening at a later date on proper application by a party ... ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. [Original filed in 1:01-cv-05144 Document No. 17. Document Docketed in 1:01-cv-05257] (dcap) Modified on 09/27/2001 (Entered: 09/27/2001)
                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/24/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Donald E. Benjamin, Patrick O'Shea, Aniko Heller Nagy, Sanat Shankardass, James Robert Richey in further support of [8-1] motion for an order consolidating actions 01 cv 5144; 01 cv 5257; and 01 cv 5746, [8-2] motion appointing movants at Lead Pltff, [8-3] motion approving movants' selection of the law firms of Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP and Bernstein Liebhard & Lifshitz, LLP to serve as Lead Counsel; in opposition to [12-1] motion for an order consolidating cases 01 civ. 5144, 01 civ. 5257, and 01 civ. 5745, [12-2] motion for an order appointing Robert P. Jordan to serve as lead plaintiff in the actions pursuant to Section 21D(a)(3)(B) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934, [12-3] motion for an order approving Robert P. Jordan's choice of Co-Lead Counsel. (rec'd in the night deposit box on 8/24/01 at 6:07 p.m.) (sac) (Entered: 08/29/2001)
                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/22/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Robert P. Jordan in opposition to [8-1] motion for an order consolidating actions 01 cv 5144; 01 cv 5257; and 01 cv 5746, [8-2] motion appointing movants at Lead Pltff, [8-3] motion approving movants' selection of the law firms of Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP and Bernstein Liebhard & Lifshitz, LLP to serve as Lead Counsel. (sac) (Entered: 08/28/2001)
                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          Pretrial Conference set at 4:30 9/7/01 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (dcap)
                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                            Notice of Case Reassignment to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Copy of notice mailed to Attorney(s) of record. Pursuant to the Order of Chief Judge Mukasey dated August 8, 2001, the above entitled action is reassinged to the calendar of Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for inclusion in the coordinated pretrial proceedings being conducted by that judge. Two originals of all future documents submitted in this action are to be presented in the Clerk's Office for filing. One original is to be filed in this docket number and one original is to be filed in the miscellaneous case number 21mc92 (SAS). Each shall bear the original assigned judge's ( ) initials after the original docket number. Attached is a copy of Judge Mukasey's ORDER re: coordinating the proceedings before Judge Scheindlin. Also attached is a copy of Judge Scheindlin's ORDER re: set initial PTC 09/07/01 and directing all counsel to comply with Judge Scheindlin's requirements. [Original Orders docketed in 21mc92 (SAS) as documents numbers 1 and 2] (dcap) Modified on 10/31/2001 (Entered: 08/10/2001)
                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in support of [12-1] motion for an order consolidating cases 01 civ. 5144, 01 civ. 5257, and 01 civ. 5745, [12-2] motion for an order appointing Robert P. Jordan to serve as lead plaintiff in the actions pursuant to Section 21D(a)(3)(B) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934, [12-3] motion for an order approving Robert P. Jordan's choice of Co-Lead Counsel. (Received in the night deposit box on 8/7/01 at 10:07 p.m.) (kw) (Entered: 08/14/2001)
                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                DECLARATION of Tzivia Brody in support Re: [12-1] motion for an order consolidating cases 01 civ. 5144, 01 civ. 5257, and 01 civ. 5745, [12-2] motion for an order appointing Robert P. Jordan to serve as lead plaintiff in the actions pursuant to Section 21D(a)(3)(B) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934, [12-3] motion for an order approving Robert P. Jordan's choice of Co-Lead Counsel. (Received in the night deposit box on 8/7/01 at 10:08 p.m.) (kw) (Entered: 08/14/2001)
                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) by Robert P. Jordan, for an order consolidating cases 01 civ. 5144, 01 civ. 5257, and 01 civ. 5745 ; for an order appointing Robert P. Jordan to serve as lead plaintiff in the actions pursuant to Section 21D(a)(3)(B) of the Securities Exchange Act of 1934 ; for an order approving Robert P. Jordan's choice of Co-Lead Counsel . No return date. (Received in the night deposit box on 8/7/01 at 10:07 p.m.) (kw) (Entered: 08/14/2001)
                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Donald E. Benjamin, Patrick O'Shea, Aniko Heller Nagy, Sanat Shankardass, James Robert Richey in support of [8-1] motion for an order consolidating actions 01 cv 5144; 01 cv 5257; and 01 cv 5746, [8-2] motion appointing movants at Lead Pltff, [8-3] motion approving movants' selection of the law firms of Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP and Bernstein Liebhard & Lifshitz, LLP to serve as Lead Counsel. (Rec'd in night deposit box 8/7/01 11:41 PM) (sn) (Entered: 08/09/2001)
                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      DECLARATION of Samuel H. Rudman by Donald E. Benjamin, Patrick O'Shea, Aniko Heller Nagy, Sanat Shankardass, James Robert Richey in support Re: [8-1] motion for an order consolidating actions 01 cv 5144; 01 cv 5257; and 01 cv 5746, [8-2] motion appointing movants at Lead Pltff, [8-3] motion approving movants' selection of the law firms of Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP and Bernstein Liebhard & Lifshitz, LLP to serve as Lead Counsel. (Rec'd in night deposit box 8/7/01 11:41 PM) (sn) (Entered: 08/09/2001)
                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION by Donald E. Benjamin, Patrick O'Shea, Aniko Heller Nagy, Sanat Shankardass, James Robert Richey for an order consolidating actions 01 cv 5144; 01 cv 5257; and 01 cv 5746 ; appointing movants at Lead Pltff ; and approving movants' selection of the law firms of Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP and Bernstein Liebhard & Lifshitz, LLP to serve as Lead Counsel . No return date indicated. Proposed order attached. (Rec'd in night deposit box 8/7/01 11:41 PM) (sn) (Entered: 08/09/2001)
                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          STIPULATION AND ORDER; the time for deft Credit Suisse to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this action is exnteded through and including the later of 30 days after (i) the assignment of lead pltffs' counsel; or (ii) the filing of an amended complaint in this action. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ) (sac) (Entered: 08/08/2001)
                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/7/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            STIPULATION AND ORDER; the time for defts Intersil Holding Corp., Gregory L. Williams and Daniel J. Heneghan to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this action is extended through and including the later of 30 days after (i) the assignment of lead pltffs' counsel; or (ii) the filing of an amended complaint in this action. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ) (sac) (Entered: 08/08/2001)
                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/18/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              WAIVER OF SERVICE of summons and complaint returned executed as to Credit Suisse First mailed on 7/12/01 . Answer due on 9/10/01 for Credit Suisse First . (djc) (Entered: 07/20/2001)
                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/29/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                Notice of Case Reassignment to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein . Copy of notice and judge's rules mailed to Attorney(s) of record: Najma Q. Rana, William K. Dodds, Mel E. Lifshitz . (gmo) (Entered: 07/02/2001)
                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/18/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of attorney appearance for Intersil Holding, Gregory L. Williams, Daniel J. Heneghan by William K. Dodds, Najma Q. Rana. (Rec'd in night deposit box 6/18/01 5:55 PM) (sn) (Entered: 06/21/2001)
                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/8/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Murowa Financial. (db) (Entered: 06/11/2001)
                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/8/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger is so designated. (db)
                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/8/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 408357. (db) (Entered: 06/11/2001)
                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 3 times.

                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?