GoTo.com, Inc. IPO v. Goto.com, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:01-cv-06339
District Judge Shira A. Scheindlin, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 11, 2019 at 4:58 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Dante Monteverde, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Stanley D Bernstein , +1 212 779 1414 +7793 779 779 3218 bernstein@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com
No Logo The Family Rosenberg Foundation, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bernstein Liebhard LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Menachem E. Lifshitz +1 212 779 1414 lifshitz@bernlieb.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Egleston Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Gregory Michael Egleston +1 212 683 3400 +1 212 683 3402 greg.egleston@gmail.com
v.
No Logo Banc Of America Securities LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Francis S. Chlapowski +1 212 309 6000 + 212 309 6273 fchlapowski@morganlewis.com

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Brendan Joseph Dowd +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 bdowd@omm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew Jay Frackman +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 afrackman@omm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Jeehae Jennifer Koh +1 212 326 2194 +1 212 326 2061 jkoh@omm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY Matthew Joseph Merrick +1 212 326 4450 +1 212 326 2061 mmerrick@omm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2005 Jonathan D. Polkes +1 212 504 6021 +1 212 504 6666 jonathan.polkes@weil.com
Citigroup Global Markets, Inc. Citigroup Global Markets, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Credit Suisse First Boston, Defendant
No Logo Deutsche Bank Alex B, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Joel M. Mitnick +1 212 839 5300 +1 212 839 5599 jmitnick@sidley.com
No Logo DLJ Direct, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Donaldson, Lufkin & Jenrette Securities Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Goto.com, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Hambrecht & Quist, Defendant
No Logo Jeffrey S. Brewer, Defendant
No Logo Overture Services, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Robert Kavner, Defendant
No Logo Robertson Stephens, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by O'Melveny & Myers LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Brendan Joseph Dowd +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 bdowd@omm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew Jay Frackman +1 212 326 2000 +1 212 326 2061 afrackman@omm.com
No Logo Thomas Weisel Partners, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Jeffrey A. Rosenthal +1 212 225 2000 +1 212 225 3499 jrosenthal@cgsh.com
No Logo Todd Tappin, Defendant
No Logo Alicia Lopez, Movant
No Logo Christina V. Monteverde, Movant
No Logo Clifford Smith, Movant
No Logo Mark D. Sweeney, Movant
No Logo Monique C. Monteverde, Movant
No Logo Bancboston Robertson Stephens Inc., Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Bear Stearns & Co Inc., Consolidated Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY RANDY MICHAEL MASTRO +1 212 351 4000 +1 212 351 5219 rmastro@gibsondunn.com
Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Consolidated Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, LEAD ATTORNEY Joel M. Mitnick +1 212 839 5300 +1 212 839 5599 jmitnick@sidley.com
No Logo Fleetboston Robertson Stephens Inc., Consolidated Defendant
No Logo J.P. Morgan Securities Inc., Consolidated Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Simpson Thacher & Bartlett LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph M. McLaughlin +1 212 455 2000 jmclaughlin@stblaw.com
No Logo Lehman Brothers, Consolidated Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Moses Silverman +1 212 315 3082
No Logo Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner & Smith Inc, Consolidated Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goodwin Procter, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Mark Holland +1 212 813 8800 +1 212 355 3333 mholland@goodwinlaw.com
No Logo Ted Meisel, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo William Gross, Consolidated Defendant
No Logo David M. Mehalick, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pomerantz LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Gustavo Fabian Bruckner +1 212 661 1100 +1 212 661 8665 gfBruckner@pomlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Frederick Taylor Isquith, Sr +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653 isquith@whafh.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Gregory Mark Nespole +1 212 545 4657 +1 212 545 4693 nespole@whafh.com
No Logo Happy-Kat Inc., Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Frederick Taylor Isquith, Sr +1 212 545 4600 +1 212 545 4653 isquith@whafh.com
No Logo Isaac Kassin, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Lovell Stewart Halebian Jacobson, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Christopher Lovell +1 212 608 1900 +1 212 719 4677 clovell@lshllp.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Sirota & Sirota, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Saul Roffe +1 609 791 7007 +1 609 896 9060 saul@sirotalaw.com
No Logo Melissa Pludo, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Milberg LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen G Schulman , +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 sschulman@milbergweiss.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Melvyn I Weiss +1 212 594 5300 +1 212 868 1229 mweiss@milbergweiss.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Robbins Geller Rudman & Dowd LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY David Avi Rosenfeld +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 drosenfeld@rgrdlaw.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel Howard Rudman +1 631 367 7100 +1 631 367 1173 srudman@rgrdlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by SEEGER WEISS LP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY David R. Buchanan +1 212 584 0700 +1 212 584 0799 DBuchanan@SeegerWeiss.com
TERMINATED: 04/19/2002, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen A. Weiss +1 212 584 0700 +1 212 584 0799 sweiss@seegerweiss.com
No Logo Michael Atlas, Intervenor Plaintiff
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 77
Nature of Suit 850 - Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities/Exchange
  Entries (59) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/4/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT settling action. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 11/24/09) (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Right to Appeal)(dt) (Entered: 12/04/2009)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/26/2009, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL AND SIMULTANEOUS APPEARANCE OF SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, ORDER: the law firm of Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati, P.C., counsel for GoTo.com, Inc., hereby withdraws as counsel of record for GoTo.Com in this action. Morrison & Foerster LLP, hereby enteres its notice of appearance as attorney of record for GoTo.com, Inc. in place of Wilson Sonsini Goodrich & Rosati. Attorney Joel Charles Haims for Goto.com, Inc. added. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 3/26/09) (sac) (Entered: 03/26/2009)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      STIPULATION AND ORDER that the Stipulation and Agreement of Settlement with defendant Issuers and Individuals submitted to the Court on 6/10/4, is hereby terminated purs to Paragraph 39 of the Proposed Partial Settlement. However, purs to paragraph 40 of the Proposed Partial Settlement, that paragraph, and the paragraphs referred to therein, shall survive the termination of the Proposed Partial Settlement. This Stipulation resolves (5527) Motion to Approve of Class action settlement. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this motion. This document relates to: All cases listed on Schedule I. (orig fld in 21mc92, #5620). (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 6/25/07) (cd)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      MOTION TO REMOVE MILBERG WEISS AND BERSHAD AS LEAD COUNSEL IN THE IPO SECURITIES LITIGATION. Document filed by Theodore A. Bechtold, Esq.. This Document Relates to the following Actions: 01-242, 01-2261, 01-2359, 01-2712, 01-3358, 01-3910, 01-3975, 01-4779, 01-4942, 01-5072, 01-5269, 01-5332, 01-5427, 01-5575, 01-5613, 01-5644, 01-5739, 01-5911, 01-6000, 01-6001, 01-6004, 01-6084, 01-6090, 01-6120, 01-6143, 01-6277, 01-6288, 01-6322, 01-6339, 01-6365, 01-6542, 01-6613, 01-6661, 01-6768, 01-6820, 01-6890, 01-6892, 01-7000, 01-7032, 01-7033, 01-7048, 01-7055, 01-7467, 01-8401, 01-9417, 01-9504, 01-9561, 01-9604, 01-9747, 01-9883, 01-9917, 01-9975, 01-10000, 01-10121, 01-10598, 01-10639, 01-10684, 01-10740, 01-10741, 01-10813, 01-10822, 01-10831, 01-10898, 01-10899, 01-10903, 01-10943, 01-11202, 01-11219, 01-11239... Original Document filed in 21-mc-92, Doc#5588.(sac)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/30/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF OMNIBUS MOTION FOR INTERVENTION; the Class members listed on Exhibit 1 to this Notice hereby withdraw, without prejudice to renewal, their Omnibus Motion for Intervention (Doc. No. 5191 on Dkt. 21 MC 92) that was filed on 9/2/03. This Document Relates to: 01cv5902; 01cv2359; 01cv10901; 01cv3360; 01cv6890; 01cv5446; 01cv2858; 01cv10827; 01cv9883; 01cv6397; 01cv6613; 01cv6271; 01cv10839; 01cv5937; 01cv6222; 01cv7669; 01cv10971; 01cv5575; 01cv7044; 01cv10943; 01cv10686; 01cv10105; 01cv5834; 01cv6542; 01cv7000; 01cv10944; 01cv3792; 01cv4942; 01cv11231; 01cv6887; 01cv5948; 01cv6242; 01cv7467; 01cv9411; 01cv9414; 01cv6775; 01cv5911; 01cv11246; 01cv7055; 01cv6948; 01cv10164; 01cv10813; 01cv7048; 01cv10738; 01cv10640; 01cv10884; 01cv10741; 01cv6339; 01cv6771; 01cv9743; 01cv6272; 01cv6842; 01cv6277; 01cv9922; 01cv10969; 01cv6084; 01cv3975; 01cv7654; 01cv9917; 01cv9349; 01cv7974; 01cv9417; 01cv10740; 01;cv9442; 01cv4147; 01cv6661; 01cv3483; 01cv6757; 01cv10990; 01cv6627; 01cv7726; 01cv9651; 01cv4183; 01cv3910; 01cv7028; 01cv5332; 01cv9798; 01cv11239; 01cv6089; 01cv6004; 01cv10823; 01cv10945; 01cv7280; 01cv10775; 01cv5354; 01cv7032; 01cv9744; 01cv9904; 01cv11217; 01cv10185; 01cv7279; 01cv2261; 01cv6082; 01cv10867; 01cv10160; 01cv10898; 01cv10683; 01cv2712; 01cv6090; 01cv10942; 01cv10120; 01cv11245; 01cv5225; 01cv6950; 01cv9746; 01cv7415; 01cv4941; 01cv10831; 01cv5600; 01cv10941; 01cv9921; 01cv4186; 01cv6846; 01cv6821; 01cv7474; 01cv5267; 01cv6288; 01cv7247; 01cv6110; 01cv10822; 01cv6008; 01cv5269; 01cv9563; 01cv9348; 01cv9604; 01cv5739; 01cv10999; 01cv3450; 01cv5241; 01cv9720; 01cv10040; 01cv6906; 01cv9514; 01cv10833; 01cv10092; 01cv10053; 01cv6768; 01cv10830; 01cv10638; 01cv4779; 01cv5074. (Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin on 9/30/04)... Original Document filed in 21-mc-92, Doc#5367.(sac, )
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/21/2004, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: MOTION, Doc#5191, (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) to Intervene. Original Document filed in 21mc92, Doc#5279. (sac, )
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/4/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) to Intervene. Document filed by Michael Atlas. Original Document filed in 21 MC 92, Doc#5195. (sac, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/4/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              NOTICE OF OMNIBUS MOTION (FILED ON SERVICE DATE) to Intervene EACH CLASS MEMBER named on Exhibit 1 attached to Memorandum of Law in Support, as class plaintiffs in those coordinated actions. This Document Relates to: 01cv5902; 01cv2359; 01cv10901; 01cv3360; 01cv6890; 01cv5446; 01cv2858; 01cv10827; 01cv9883; 01cv6397; 01cv6613; 01cv6271; 01cv10839; 01cv5937; 01cv6222; 01cv7669; 01cv10971; 01cv5575; 01cv7044; 01cv10943; 01cv10686; 01cv10105; 01cv5834; 01cv6542; 01cv7000; 01cv10944; 01cv3792; 01cv4942; 01cv11231; 01cv6887; 01cv6242; 01cv7467; 01cv9411; 01cv9414; 01cv6775; 01cv5911; 01cv11246; 01cv7055; 01cv6948; 01cv10164; 01cv10813; 01cv7084; 01cv10738; 01cv10640; 01cv10884; 01cv10741; 01cv6339; 01cv6771; 01cv9743; 01cv62672; 01cv6842; 01cv6277; 01cv9922; 01cv10969; 01cv6084; 01cv3975; 01cv7654; 01cv9917; 01cv9349; 01cv 7974; 01cv9417; 01cv 10740; 01cv992; 01cv4147; 01cv6661; 01cv3483; 01cv6757; 01cv10990; 01cv6627; 01cv7726; 01cv9651; 01cv4183; 01cv3910; 01cv7028; 01cv5332; 01cv9798; 01cv11239; 01cv6089; 01cv6004; 01cv10823; 01cv10945; 01cv7280; 01cv10775; 01cv5354; 01cv7032; 01cv9744; 01cv9904; 01cv11217; 01cv10185; 01cv7279; 01cv2261; 01cv6082; 01cv10867; 01cv10160; 01cv10898; 01cv10683; 01cv2712; 01cv6090; 01cv10942; 01cv10120; 01cv11245; 01cv5225; 01cv6950; 01cv9746; 01cv7415; 01cv4941; 01cv10831; 01cv5600; 01cv10941; 01cv9921; 01cv4186; 01cv6846; 01cv6821; 01cv7474; 01cv5267; 01cv6288; 01cv7247; 01cv6110; 01cv10822; 01cv6008; 01cv5269; 01cv9563; 01cv9348; 01cv9604; 01cv5739; 01cv10999; 01cv3450; 01cv5241; 01cv9720; 01cv10040; 01cv6906; 01cv9514; 01cv10833; 01cv10092; 01cv10053; 01cv6768; 01cv10830; 01cv10638; 01cv4779; 01cv5074. Origianl Document filed in 21MC92, Doc#5191. Document filed by Michael Atlas. (sac, )
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ANSWER to Corrected Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Citigroup Global Markets, Inc.. Related document: 14 Amended Complaint filed by Dante Monteverde.(sac, ) (Entered: 03/30/2004)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  ANSWER to Corrected Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Credit Suisse First Boston. Related document: 14 Amended Complaint filed by Dante Monteverde.(sac, ) (Entered: 03/30/2004)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    ANSWER to Corrected Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. Related document: 14 Amended Complaint filed by Dante Monteverde.(sac, ) (Entered: 03/29/2004)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/13/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      ANSWER to Corrected Consolidated Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Credit Suisse First Boston Corporation. Related document: 14 Amended Complaint filed by Dante Monteverde.(sac, ) (Entered: 03/29/2004)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        ANSWER by Deutsche Bank, Deutsche Bank Alex B to [14-1] amended complaint . (Attorney Joel M. Mitnick from the Firm: Sidley, Austin, Brown & Wood, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 09/18/2003)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/22/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          ANSWER by Merrill Lynch to [14-1] amended complaint . (Attorney Mark Holland from the Clifford Chance US LLP). (sac) (Entered: 08/26/2003)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            ANSWER by Robertson Stephens to [14-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Brendan Joseph Dowd from the O'Melveny & Myers, LLP)... rec'd in the night deposit box on 7/21/03 at 7:27 p.m. (sac) (Entered: 08/20/2003)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              ANSWER by J.P. Morgan Sec. to [14-1] corrected amended complaint. (Attorney Joseph M. McLaughlin from the Simpson, Thacher & Bartlett, LLP)... rec'd in the night deposit box on 7/21/03 at 6:43 p.m. (sac) (Entered: 08/14/2003)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                ANSWER by Thomas Weisel, LLC to [14-1] corrected amended complaint. (Attorney Jeffrey A. Rosenthal from the Firm: Cleary, Gottlieb, Steen & Hamilton)... rec'd in the night deposit box on 7/21/03 at 7:43 p.m. (sac) (Entered: 08/11/2003)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  ANSWER by Lehman Brothers to [14-1] corrected amended complaint. (Attorney Moses Silverman from the Paul, Weiss, Rifkind, Wharton & Garrison, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 08/07/2003)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    ANSWER by Bear Stearns & Co. to [14-1] corrected amended complaint. (Attorney Randy M. Mastro from the Firm: Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 08/06/2003)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/21/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      ANSWER by Banc of America to [14-1] amended complaint. (Attorney Jonathan D. Polkes from the Firm: Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft, LLP). (sac) (Entered: 07/25/2003)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/28/2003, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SUBSTITUTION OF ATTY AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; substituting Cadwalader, Wickersham & Taft (Jonathan D. Polkes appearing) in place of Brobeck, Phleger & Harrison LLP (Kenneth J. King appearing) as attys for deft Banc of America Securities LLC in this action. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ) (sac) (Entered: 03/31/2003)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/15/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          (UNSIGNED) STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL; this action purs. to Stipulation and Order entered in 21 mc 92, doc. #5059, hereby dismisses without prejudice and without costs as to defts Jeffrey Brewer, William Gross, Robert Kavner, Ted Meisel and Todd Tappin. (Orig. filed and signed by Judge Scheindlin in 21 mc 92.) (sac)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/12/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            CORRECTED CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT by Dante Monteverde amending [1-1] complaint ; Summons issued. (rec'd in the night deposit box on 7/12/02 at 8:37 p.m.) (sac) (Entered: 07/30/2002)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/12/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              ERRATA to consolidated amended class action complaint for violations of The Federal Securities Laws by Dante Monteverde striking & adding paragraphs. (sac) (Entered: 07/30/2002)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                MASTER ALLEGATIONS by Dante Monteverde RE: Amended Complaint, doc.# 12, Filed on April 19, 2002. (ac)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT by Dante Monteverde amending [1-1] complaint ; Summons issued. (ac) (Entered: 06/25/2002)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/19/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    OMNIBUS ORDER, Dante Monteverde is hereby appointed as lead pltff and his selection of the Executive Committee to serve as Lead Counsel is approved. All other motions to be appointed lead pltff and for approval of lead counsel are hereby denied. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (orig. doc. filed in 21 mc 92, doc. #4319) (sac)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Consolidated Lead Case. (dcap)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        *** Removed MEMBER flag. Case no longer consolidated. (dcap)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Case reopened. (dcap)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            CORRECTED CONSOLIDATION ORDER,... that all cases involving the Goto.com, Inc. initial public offering in this IPO Securities Litigation, including case numbers 01-CV-6626, 01-CV-6951, 01-CV-07251, and 01-CV-7314, shall be consolidated into case number 01-CV-6339. The Clerk of the Court is hereby Ordered to consolidate any future cases that are designated as related to 01-CV-6339,... the Clerk of the Court is further Ordered to close all cases that have been so consolidated, subject to re-opening at a later date on proper application by a party... For those related cases listed above and future case related to 01-CV-6339 only, this order corrects and supersedes any previous consolidation order issued in connection with the Goto.com, Inc. initial public offering inthis IPO Securities Litigation and filed in the dockets for case numbers 01-CV-6626, 01-CV-06951, 01-CV-7251, and 01-CV-7314 ... ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. [Original filed in 1:01-cv-06339 Document No. 11. Document Docketed in 1:01-cv06626; 1:01-cv-06951; 1:01-cv-07251; 1:1-cv-07314] (dcap) (Entered: 02/28/2002)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/18/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              AMENDED RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Thomas Weisel, LLC. (rec'd in the night deposit box on 1/18/02 at 5:22 p.m.) (sac) (Entered: 02/19/2002)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/7/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Robertson Stephens. (sac) (Entered: 02/07/2002)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/4/2002, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Banc of America. (sac) (Entered: 01/24/2002)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/27/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Dante Monteverde, Dante A. Monteverde, Christina V. Monteverde, Monique C. Monteverde, Alicia Lopez, Clifford Smith, Mark D. Sweeney re: [0-1] motion for an order, consolidating these related actions, [0-2] motion for an order, for appointment of lead pltffs, [0-3] motion for an order, for approval of their selection of lead counsel. (Filed on 6/28/02) (sac)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/26/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Christopher Gunnel, H.L. Win in support of [0-1] motion for an order, consolidating these actions, [0-2] motion for an order, appointing them as Lead Pltff, [0-3] motion for an order, approving their selection of the law firm of Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP to serve as Lead Counsel. (Filed on 6/28/02) (sac)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Credit Suisse First. (01 Civ. 6339) (sac)
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/21/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by J.P. Morgan Chase. (Filed on 6/28/02) (sac)
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/20/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Credit Suisse First. (Filed on 6/28/02) (sac)
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              DECLARATION of Samuel H. Rudman by Christopher Gunnel, H.L. Win in support Re: [0-1] motion for an order, consolidating these actions, [0-2] motion for an order, appointing them as Lead Pltff, [0-3] motion for an order, approving their selection of the law firm of Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP to serve as Lead Counsel. (Filed on 6/28/02) (sac)
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Christopher Gunnel, H.L. Win in support of [0-1] motion for an order, consolidating these actions, [0-2] motion for an order, appointing them as Lead Pltff, [0-3] motion for an order, approving their selection of the law firm of Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP to serve as Lead Counsel. (Filed on 6/28/02) (sac)
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  NOTICE OF MOTION by Christopher Gunnel, H.L. Win for an order, consolidating these actions ; for an order, appointing them as Lead Pltff ; for an order, approving their selection of the law firm of Milberg Weiss Bershad Hynes & Lerach LLP to serve as Lead Counsel ; Return Date not indicated. (Filed on 6/28/02) (sac)
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Arab Financial in support of [0-1] motion for an order, consolidating all of the above actions into one action for all purposes, [0-2] motion for an order, appointing class members, [0-3] motion for an order, appointing Lovell & Stewart, LLP and Sirota & Sirota, LLP as co-lead counsel for the class. (Filed on 6/27/02) (sac)
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      NOTICE OF MOTION by Arab Financial Consultants Co., Issac Kassin, Saul Kassin, and the Eugene C. Nurrie Trust for an order, consolidating all of the above actions into one action for all purposes ; for an order, appointing class members ; for an order, appointing Lovell & Stewart, LLP and Sirota & Sirota, LLP as co-lead counsel for the class ; Return Date not indicated. (Filed on 6/27/02) (sac)
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT of Michael S. Egan by Dante Monteverde, Dante A. Monteverde, Christina V. Monteverde, Monique C. Monteverde, Alicia Lopez, Clifford Smith, Mark D. Sweeney in support of [0-1] motion for an order, consolidating these related actions, [0-2] motion for an order, for appointment of lead pltffs, [0-3] motion for an order, for approval of their selection of lead counsel. (Filed on 6/27/02) (sac)
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Dante Monteverde, Dante A. Monteverde, Christina V. Monteverde, Monique C. Monteverde, Alicia Lopez, Clifford Smith, Mark D. Sweeney in support of [0-1] motion for an order, consolidating these related actions, [0-2] motion for an order, for appointment of lead pltffs, [0-3] motion for an order, for approval of their selection of lead counsel. (Filed on 6/27/02) (sac)
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/10/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION by Dante Monteverde, Dante A. Monteverde, Christina V. Monteverde, Monique C. Monteverde, Alicia Lopez, Clifford Smith, Mark D. Sweeney for an order, consolidating these related actions ; for an order, for appointment of lead pltffs ; for an order, for approval of their selection of lead counsel ; Return Date not indicated. (sac)
                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/7/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Salomon Smith Barney . (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/11/2001)
                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/6/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Thomas Weisel, LLC . (ICMSUSER) (Entered: 10/11/2001)
                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  Case closed. (dcap)
                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    Consolidated Member Case. Lead Case Number: 1:01cv6626. (dcap)
                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/5/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      ORDER,... that all cases involving GOTO in this IPO Securities Litigation, as set forth in the attached Rider shall be consolidated into case number 01 Civ. 6626. The Clerk of the Court is hereby Ordered to consolidate any future cases that are designated as related to 01 Civ. 6626,... the Clerk of the Court is further Ordered to close all cases that have been so consolidated, subject to re-opening at a later date on proper application by a party ... ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. [Original filed in 1:01-cv-06626 Document No. 6. Document Docketed in 1:01-cv-06339; 1:01-cv-06951; 1:01-cv-07251; 1:01-cv-07314] (dcap)
                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/4/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        STIPULATION AND ORDER; the time for defts Credit Suisse First Boston Corp., Salomon Smith Barney, Inc., and Thomas Weisel Partners LLC to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this action is extended through and including the later tof 45 days after (i) the assingment of lead pltffs' counsel; or (ii) the filing of an amended complaint in this action. ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ) (sac) Modified on 10/02/2001 (Entered: 09/07/2001)
                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/30/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Goto.com, Inc., Jeffrey S. Brewer, Todd Tappin. (sac) Modified on 10/02/2001 (Entered: 09/05/2001)
                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Pretrial Conference set at 4:30 9/7/01 before Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. (dcap)
                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/9/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              Notice of Case Reassignment to Judge Shira A. Scheindlin. Copy of notice mailed to Attorney(s) of record. Pursuant to the Order of Chief Judge Mukasey dated August 8, 2001, the above entitled action is reassigned to the calendar of Judge Shira A. Scheindlin for inclusion in the coordinated pretrial proceedings being conducted by that judge. Two originals of all future documents submitted in this action are to be presented in the Clerk's Office for filing. One original is to be filed in this docket number and one original is to be filed in the miscellaneous case number 21mc92 (SAS). Each shall bear the original assigned judge's ( ) initials after the original docket number. Attached is a copy of Judge Mukasey's ORDER re: coordinating the proceedings before Judge Scheindlin. Also attached is a copy of Judge Scheindlin's ORDER re: set initial PTC 09/07/01 and directing all counsel to comply with Judge Scheindlin's requirements. [Original Orders docketed in 21mc92 (SAS) as documents numbers 1 and 2] (dcap) (Entered: 10/02/2001)
                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                RULE 1.9 CERTIFICATE filed by Family Rosenberg. (db) (Entered: 07/16/2001)
                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  Magistrate Judge Kevin N. Fox is so designated. (db)
                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/12/2001, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT filed. Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). FILING FEE $ 150.00 RECEIPT # 411535. (db) (Entered: 07/16/2001)
                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 10 times.

                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?